This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/06/2019 at 07:43:03 (UTC).

Narciso et al v. Walker et al

Case Summary

On 07/08/2019 Narciso filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Walker. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Corey L Maze. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01050

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Alabama Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Corey L Maze

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

H. N.

Sidney Jack Narciso

Oxford, AL 36203

Defendants

Highland Health Services

Stacy Jackson

Melody Brooks Walker

Marsha Busby

Sandria V Narciso

Heflin, AL 36264

LSA

Cleburne County Sheriff Department

Dr. Castro

Highland Health Center

Chris G McCary

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

Robert M Ronnlund

Attorney at SCOTT SULLIVAN STREETMAN & FOX PC

P.O. Box 380548

Birmingham, AL 35238

William A Scott, Jr

Attorney at SCOTT SULLIVAN STREETMAN & FOX PC

2450 Valleydale Road

Birmingham, AL 35244

Joshua J Lane

Attorney at STATE OF ALABAMA

P O Box 304000

Montgomery, AL 36130

Jonathan S Schlenker

Attorney at STATE OF ALABAMA

P O Box 13248, 50 Ripley Street, Ste. 2122

Birmingham, AL 35202

Benjamin H Albritton

Attorney at ALABAMA ATTORNEY GENERAL'S OFFICE

501 Washington Avenue

Montgomery, AL 36130

Joseph E Stott

Attorney at STOTT & HARRINGTON, P.C.

2637 Valleydale Road, Suite 100

Birmingham, AL 35244

C Richard Hill, Jr

Attorney at CAPELL & HOWARD PC

150 South Perry Street, Po Box 2069

Montgomery, AL 36102-2069

 

Court Documents

#47

(#47) ORDER granting #43 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff Sidney Narciso is ORDERED to send paper copies of every document he has filed in this case to Defendant Sandria Narciso. Plaintiff Sidney Narciso is NOT required to send copies to any other defendant. All defendants other than Sandria Narciso have been or will be served electronically. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 9/5/2019. (SRD) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

46 #1

Exhibit 1 - Walker's appointments

#46

(#46) REPLY to Response to Motion re #27 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Melody Brooks Walker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Walker's appointments)(Albritton, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

#43

(#43) MOTION to Compel by Sandria V Narciso. (JLC) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

#29

(#45) RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 #24 #25 #26 #27 #29 #38 #39 MOTIONS to Dismiss filed by Sidney Jack Narciso. (JLC) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

#27

(#40) Answer and Objection to #27 Defendant Walker's Motion to Dismiss filed by H. N., Sidney Jack Narciso. (KEK) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

#26

(#45) RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 #24 #25 #26 #27 #29 #38 #39 MOTIONS to Dismiss filed by Sidney Jack Narciso. (JLC) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

#25

(#45) RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 #24 #25 #26 #27 #29 #38 #39 MOTIONS to Dismiss filed by Sidney Jack Narciso. (JLC) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

#16

(#45) RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 #24 #25 #26 #27 #29 #38 #39 MOTIONS to Dismiss filed by Sidney Jack Narciso. (JLC) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

#8

RESTRICTED

#7

(#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by H. N., Sidney Jack Narciso. LSA served on 7/26/2019, answer due 8/16/2019; Chris G McCary served on 7/26/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. (KEK) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

#6

(#6) Summons Issued as to All Defendants delivered to USMS for service. (SRD) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

#5

(#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Reconsideration and granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Sidney Jack Narciso. This Order supersedes all previous orders. Signed by Judge Corey L Maze on 7/23/2019. (SRD) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

#4

(#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Reconsideration and granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Sidney Jack Narciso. This Order supersedes all previous orders. Signed by Judge Corey L Maze on 7/23/2019. (SRD) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

#2

(#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Reconsideration and granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Sidney Jack Narciso. This Order supersedes all previous orders. Signed by Judge Corey L Maze on 7/23/2019. (SRD) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

1 #2

*Restricted*

1 #1

envelope

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT (redacted) with Appendices 1 and 2 attached, against Marsha Busby, Castro, Cleburne County Sheriff Department, Highland Health Services, Stacy Jackson, LSA, Chris G McCary, Sandria V Narciso, Melody Brooks Walker, filed by H. N., Sidney Jack Narciso. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(KWC) (Additional attachment added on 7/8/2019: #2 Sealed Complaint- due to minor child's name) (KWC) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#47) ORDER granting #43 Motion to Compel. Plaintiff Sidney Narciso is ORDERED to send paper copies of every document he has filed in this case to Defendant Sandria Narciso. Plaintiff Sidney Narciso is NOT required to send copies to any other defendant. All defendants other than Sandria Narciso have been or will be served electronically. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 9/5/2019. (SRD) (Entered: 09/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#46) REPLY to Response to Motion re #27 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Melody Brooks Walker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Walker's appointments)(Albritton, Benjamin) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#45) RESPONSE in Opposition re #16 #24 #25 #26 #27 #29 #38 #39 MOTIONS to Dismiss filed by Sidney Jack Narciso. (JLC) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#44) NOTICE of Apology by Sidney Jack Narciso. (JLC) (Entered: 09/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) MOTION to Compel by Sandria V Narciso. (JLC) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) NOTICE of Appearance by William A Scott, Jr on behalf of Castro, Highland Health Services (Scott, William) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) ORDER: The Court GRANTS the Motion to Stay #30 and hereby presently relieves the parties of their obligation to conduct a Rule 26 planning meeting. The Court hereby grants Plaintiff Narciso until September 27, 2019, to file ONE consolidated brief in opposition to these motions that complies with the Federal Rules. The Court hereby GRANTS IN PART Defendant Sandria Narciso's request for copies #34 by ORDERING all parties to mail a copy of the briefs ordered in Parts A and B to Ms. Narciso at the mailing address she has provided. Absent good cause shown, the Court also intends to withhold a ruling on any subsequently-filed motions until the Court considers the briefs ordered herein and rules on the motions to dismiss. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 8/29/2019. (SRD) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Corey L Maze: Telephone Conference held on 8/28/2019. (SRD) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) Answer and Objection to #27 Defendant Walker's Motion to Dismiss filed by H. N., Sidney Jack Narciso. (KEK) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) MOTION to Dismiss by Highland Health Services. (Ronnlund, Robert) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
28 More Docket Entries
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sidney Jack Narciso. Stacy Jackson served on 7/29/2019, answer due 8/19/2019. (KAM) (Entered: 08/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER re #8 ex-parte MOTION for Interlocutory Order filed by Sidney Jack Narciso. The Court shall treat Narciso's filing as a motion to file under seal and hereby ORDERS that the July 30th filing (doc. 8) shall be filed under seal.The Court hereby ORDERS Plaintiff Narciso to re-file his motion with all pictures and other identifying information redacted. Signed by Judge Corey L Maze on 7/30/2019. (SRD) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) EX-PARTE MOTION FOR INTERLOCUTORY ORDER by Sidney Jack Narciso. (SRD) (Entered: 07/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) SUMMONS Returned Executed by H. N., Sidney Jack Narciso. LSA served on 7/26/2019, answer due 8/16/2019; Chris G McCary served on 7/26/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. (KEK) (Entered: 07/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Summons Issued as to All Defendants delivered to USMS for service. (SRD) (Entered: 07/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Reconsideration and granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Sidney Jack Narciso. This Order supersedes all previous orders. Signed by Judge Corey L Maze on 7/23/2019. (SRD) (Entered: 07/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION (Request) for Reconsideration of In-Forma Pauperis Application re 3 Order by Sidney Jack Narciso. (SRD) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • (#3) TEXT ORDER: Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED, but the required filing fee is hereby reduced to $100 on account of Plaintiff's limited financial resources. Signed by Judge Corey L. Maze on 7/15/19. (SAM1) (Entered: 07/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by H. N., Sidney Jack Narciso. (KWC) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT (redacted) with Appendices 1 and 2 attached, against Marsha Busby, Castro, Cleburne County Sheriff Department, Highland Health Services, Stacy Jackson, LSA, Chris G McCary, Sandria V Narciso, Melody Brooks Walker, filed by H. N., Sidney Jack Narciso. (Attachments: #1 envelope)(KWC) (Additional attachment added on 7/8/2019: #2 Sealed Complaint- due to minor child's name) (KWC) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CASTRO is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jonathan S Schlenker

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William A. Scott

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Moore Ronnlund