This case was last updated from PACER on 01/06/2020 at 08:44:01 (UTC).

Napermann v. Dubuque County et al

Case Summary

On 11/07/2019 Napermann filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Dubuque County. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are CJ Williams, Mark A Roberts and Leonard T Strand. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01033

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Iowa Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Mark A Roberts

Presiding Judges

CJ Williams

Leonard T Strand

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gerald Napermann

Dubuque, IA 52001

Defendants

Michael J Shubatt

Dubuque County

Mark T Hostager

Dubuque County Jail

Scott J Nelson

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) JUDGMENT in favor of Dubuque County, Dubuque County Jail, Mark T Hostager, Michael J Shubatt, Scott J Nelson against Gerald Napermann. Signed by Clerk on 12/4/2019. (copy w/nef mailed to pro se plaintiff) (des) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#4

(#4) ORDER Dismissing Case: The complaint is denied and the case is dismissed. Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 12/4/2019. (copy w/nef mailed to pro se plaintiff) (des) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#3

(#6) MAIL Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Yoosuf Moment which included (5 in 2:19-cv-01036-LTS-MAR) Judgment, (5 in 2:19-cv-01033-LTS-MAR) Judgment, (13 in 2:19-cv-01029-LTS-MAR) SUPPLEMENT/ADDENDUM, (4 in 2:19-cv-01036-LTS-MAR) Order, (4 in 2:19-cv-01033-LTS-MAR) Order, (5 in 2:19-cv-01032-LTS-MAR) Order, (6 in 2:19-cv-01032-LTS-MAR) Clerk's Judgment, (2 in 2:19-cv-01035-LTS-MAR) Order, (12 in 2:19-cv-01029-LTS-MAR) Order. Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-01029-LTS-MAR et al. No forwarding address found. (des) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

3 #1

*Restricted*

#3

(#3) Case transferred in from District of Arkansas Eastern; Case Number 4:19-cv-00785. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. NORTHERN DISTRICT OF IOWA DOCKET BEGINS HERE (docket report to pro se plaintiff) (PSLC notified) Modified on 11/7/2019 (des) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

#2

(#2) ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to immediately transfer Plaintiff's entire case file to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Iowa. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 11/7/2019. (ljb) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 11/7/2019.] (Entered: 11/07/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Gerald Napermann.(kdr) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 11/7/2019.] (Entered: 11/06/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MAIL Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Yoosuf Moment which included (5 in 2:19-cv-01036-LTS-MAR) Judgment, (5 in 2:19-cv-01033-LTS-MAR) Judgment, (13 in 2:19-cv-01029-LTS-MAR) SUPPLEMENT/ADDENDUM, (4 in 2:19-cv-01036-LTS-MAR) Order, (4 in 2:19-cv-01033-LTS-MAR) Order, (5 in 2:19-cv-01032-LTS-MAR) Order, (6 in 2:19-cv-01032-LTS-MAR) Clerk's Judgment, (2 in 2:19-cv-01035-LTS-MAR) Order, (12 in 2:19-cv-01029-LTS-MAR) Order. Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-01029-LTS-MAR et al. No forwarding address found. (des) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) JUDGMENT in favor of Dubuque County, Dubuque County Jail, Mark T Hostager, Michael J Shubatt, Scott J Nelson against Gerald Napermann. Signed by Clerk on 12/4/2019. (copy w/nef mailed to pro se plaintiff) (des) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER Dismissing Case: The complaint is denied and the case is dismissed. Signed by Chief Judge Leonard T Strand on 12/4/2019. (copy w/nef mailed to pro se plaintiff) (des) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • Case Reassigned to Chief Judge Leonard T Strand. Judge CJ Williams no longer assigned to the case. Action taken pursuant to direction from PSLC. No conflicts identified. (src) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • Judge CJ Williams and Magistrate Judge Mark A Roberts added. No conflicts identified. (des) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Case transferred in from District of Arkansas Eastern; Case Number 4:19-cv-00785. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. NORTHERN DISTRICT OF IOWA DOCKET BEGINS HERE (docket report to pro se plaintiff) (PSLC notified) Modified on 11/7/2019 (des) (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to immediately transfer Plaintiff's entire case file to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Iowa. Signed by Judge James M. Moody Jr. on 11/7/2019. (ljb) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 11/7/2019.] (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Gerald Napermann.(kdr) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 11/7/2019.] (Entered: 11/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less