This case was last updated from PACER on 10/14/2021 at 07:02:50 (UTC).

Nanobebe US Inc. v. Mayborn (UK) Limited et al

Case Summary

On October 13, 2021, Nanobebe US Inc. (“Plaintiff” or “Nanobebe”), represented by Elana Araj and Julie Pamela Bookbinder of Greenberg Traurig, LLP, filed intellectual property lawsuit against Mayborn (UK) Limited (“Mayborn UK”), Mayborn USA, Inc. (“Mayborn USA”), and Mayborn Group Limited (“Mayborn Group”) (collectively “Mayborn” or “Defendants”), seeking declaratory relief along with costs and expenses among other relief for the alleged non-infringement of the United States Patent owned by Defendants. The case was filed in the United States District Court in the Southern District of New York.

 

Plaintiff filed this complaint for the alleged non-infringement of United States Patent No. 10,952,930 entitled “Baby Bottle with Flexible Nipple” (“’930 patent” or “Asserted Patent”) owned by the Defendants.

 

In the complaint, Plaintiff alleged that, “On information and belief, Mayborn is a global company selling baby products, including bottles and other products under the brand name “Tommee Tippee” and “On information and belief, Mayborn knew about Nanobebe and the Accused Products prior to contacting Amazon in August 2021. On April 9, 2019, Mr. Kehat, received a message from Mr. Galand via LinkedIn” and “The message states that Mr. Galand was “Tommee Tippee Regional President for EMEA Region and we are reviewing strategic opportunities, so may be interesting to get to know each other better.”

 

Plaintiff further alleged that, “On May 16, 2019, Mr. Galand emailed Mr. Kehat stating “[w]e have been in contact through LinkedIn a few weeks ago as I was proposing to meet and get to know each other and our Companies better as we operate in the same Categories” and that Mayborn was “working on strategic development projects” and “Following the communications between Mr. Kehat and Mayborn in 2019, Mr. Kehat received emails from Mr. Alex Moody of Finquest in June, July, and August of 2020. Mr. Moody, who was working on behalf of Mayborn, informed Mr. Kehat that Mayborn was “hoping to engage with you in order to discuss the potential of investing in, acquiring, or setting up a strategic partnership with [Nanobebe].”

 

Plaintiff also alleged that, “During the above-referenced communications, Mayborn and its agents or representatives did not inform Nanobebe that Mayborn owned any patents or pending patent applications” and “Nanobebe has not infringed and does not infringe any claim of the ’930 patent directly or indirectly, either literally or under the doctrine of equivalents.”

 

There is one claim of relief laid down by Plaintiff for the alleged non-infringement of the ’930 Patent.

 

In the prayer for relief, Plaintiff requested the court for declaratory relief along with an award to Nanobebe of its costs, expenses, and reasonable attorneys’ fees incurred in this action along with any other relief the court deems just and proper.

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-08444

  • Filing Date:

    10/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nanobebe US Inc.

Defendants

Mayborn (UK) Limited

Mayborn USA, Inc.

Mayborn Group Limited

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Elana Araj

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP (NY)

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

Julie Pamela Bookbinder

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig, LLP (NYC)

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elana Araj on behalf of Nanobebe US Inc...(Araj, Elana) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

#7

(#7) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Nutrits Ltd. for Nanobebe US Inc.. Document filed by Nanobebe US Inc...(Bookbinder, Julie) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

#6

(#6) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Bookbinder, Julie) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

#5

(#5) AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Bookbinder, Julie) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

#4

(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mayborn Group Limited, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Nanobebe US Inc...(Bookbinder, Julie) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

1 #13

Exhibit 13 - June-Aug 2020 Communications

1 #12

Exhibit 12 - May & July 2019 Communications

1 #10

Exhibit 10 - Mayborn Group Website

1 #9

Exhibit 9 Amazon Utility Patent Neutral Evaluation Procedure

1 #8

Exhibit 8 - Mayborn Executed Agreement

1 #7

Exhibit 7 - September 23, 2021 Amazon Notice

1 #6

Exhibit 6 - September 15, 2021 Communication

1 #5

Exhibit 5 - August 31, 201 Communication

1 #4

Exhibit 4 - August 30, 2021 Response

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - August 11, 2021 Amazon Notice

1 #2

Exhibit 2- Assignment

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - US Patent # 10952930

1 #1

Main Document

10 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elana Araj on behalf of Nanobebe US Inc...(Araj, Elana) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Nutrits Ltd. for Nanobebe US Inc.. Document filed by Nanobebe US Inc...(Bookbinder, Julie) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Bookbinder, Julie) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review..(Bookbinder, Julie) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mayborn Group Limited, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Nanobebe US Inc...(Bookbinder, Julie) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mayborn USA, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Nanobebe US Inc...(Bookbinder, Julie) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mayborn (UK) Limited, re: #1 Complaint,,,. Document filed by Nanobebe US Inc...(Bookbinder, Julie) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Mayborn (UK) Limited, Mayborn Group Limited, Mayborn USA, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25189436)Document filed by Nanobebe US Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - US Patent # 10952930, #2 Exhibit 2- Assignment, #3 Exhibit 3 - August 11, 2021 Amazon Notice, #4 Exhibit 4 - August 30, 2021 Response, #5 Exhibit 5 - August 31, 201 Communication, #6 Exhibit 6 - September 15, 2021 Communication, #7 Exhibit 7 - September 23, 2021 Amazon Notice, #8 Exhibit 8 - Mayborn Executed Agreement, #9 Exhibit 9 Amazon Utility Patent Neutral Evaluation Procedure, #10 Exhibit 10 - Mayborn Group Website, #11 Exhibit 11 - Linkedin Communications, #12 Exhibit 12 - May & July 2019 Communications, #13 Exhibit 13 - June-Aug 2020 Communications).(Bookbinder, Julie) (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mayborn USA, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Elana Beth Araj

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Julie Pamela Bookbinder