This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/01/2020 at 09:42:20 (UTC).

Nallapaty et al v. Nallapati et al

Case Summary

On 09/02/2020 Nallapaty filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Nallapati. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, North Carolina Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Terrence W. Boyle. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:20-CV-00470

  • Filing Date:

    09/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Terrence W. Boyle

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Hari Hara Prasad Nallapaty

UTS Holdings, LLC

Defendants

Nallapati Properties, LLC

Vamsi Mohan Nallapati

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jessica Thaller-Moran

Attorney at Brooks Pierce McLendon Humphrey & Leonard, LLP

150 Fayetteville Street, Suite 1700

Raleigh, NC 27601

Clinton Shepperd Morse

Attorney at Brooks Pierce McLendon Humphrey & Leonard, L.L.P.

P.O. Box 26000 (Zip 27420), 230 North Elm Street, Suite 2000

Greensboro, NC 27401

Joshua Aaron Yost

Attorney at Brooks Pierce Law Firm

P.O. Box 1800

Raleigh, NC 27602

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

#7

#8

#9

#10

#11

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) Waiver of Service Returned Executed filed by Hari Hara Prasad Nallapaty, UTS Holdings, LLC. All Defendants. (Thaller-Moran, Jessica) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Notice of Appearance filed by Joshua Aaron Yost on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Yost, Joshua) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Summons Issued as to Vamsi Mohan Nallapati, Nallapati Properties, LLC. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Notice of Appearance filed by Clinton Shepperd Morse on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (Morse, Clinton) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Notice of Appearance filed by Jessica Thaller-Moran on behalf of Hari Hara Prasad Nallapaty, UTS Holdings, LLC. (Thaller-Moran, Jessica) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice filed by Hari Hara Prasad Nallapaty, UTS Holdings, LLC regarding #1 Complaint Summons for Defendant Corporation. (Thaller-Moran, Jessica) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice filed by Hari Hara Prasad Nallapaty, UTS Holdings, LLC regarding #1 Complaint Summons For Defendant Individual. (Thaller-Moran, Jessica) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Financial Disclosure Statement by Hari Hara Prasad Nallapaty (Thaller-Moran, Jessica) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Notice filed by Hari Hara Prasad Nallapaty, UTS Holdings, LLC . (Thaller-Moran, Jessica) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketNotice to Counsel - No Summons provided for issuance or Waiver of Service filed. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEFICIENCY regarding #1 Complaint - Counsel failed to file a JS44 Civil Cover Sheet as required by the Court. Counsel should file a Cover Sheet using the event "Notice-Other" as soon as possible. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketNotice to Counsel - All Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/04/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Failure to File Financial Disclosure Statement as to Hari Hara Prasad Nallapaty. Pursuant to 7.1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Civil Rule 7.3, all parties shall file a financial disclosure statement. A negative statement is required if a party has no disclosures to make. The disclosure statement must be on a form provided by the clerk. This form is available at the clerk's office and on the court's website. (Rudd, D.) (Entered: 09/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Financial Disclosure Statement by UTS Holdings, LLC (Thaller-Moran, Jessica) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Vamsi Mohan Nallapati, Nallapati Properties, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-5600354.), filed by Hari Hara Prasad Nallapaty, UTS Holdings, LLC. (Thaller-Moran, Jessica) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Clinton Shepperd Morse

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jessica Thaller-Moran