This case was last updated from PACER on 10/11/2020 at 10:44:58 (UTC).

Nall v. Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 08/12/2020 Nall filed a Labor - Employee Benefit lawsuit against Hartford Life Accident Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District. The Judge overseeing this case is Alfred V. Covello. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01170

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Employee Benefit

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Connecticut District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alfred V. Covello

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ashley Nall

Defendant

Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Hudson Taylor Ellis

Attorney at Eric Buchanan & Associates, PLLC

414 Mccallie Ave.

Chattanooga, TN 37402

Defendant Attorneys

Ivana Deyrup Greco

Attorney at Robinson and Cole LLP

280 Trumbull Street

Hartford, CT 06103

Patrick Walter Begos

Attorney at Robinson & Cole LLP, Stamford

1055 Washington Boulevard 9Th Floor

Stamford, CT 06901-2249

 

Court Documents

#10

(#10) MOTION for Extension of Time until November 2, 2020 to File Rule 26(F) Report by Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company. (Begos, Patrick) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

#9

(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Life, Inc., Corporate Parent Hartford Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company. (Begos, Patrick) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company waiver sent on 8/19/2020, answer due 10/18/2020 filed by Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company. (Begos, Patrick) Modified on 8/26/2020 to correct waiver sent and answer dates (Bozek, M.). (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Walter Begos on behalf of Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company (Begos, Patrick) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Ivana Deyrup Greco on behalf of Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company (Greco, Ivana) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

#5

(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Hudson Taylor Ellis* *Eric Buchanan & Associates, PLLC* *414 McCallie Ave.* *Chattanooga, TN 37402*. (Bozek, M.) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Ashley Nall, #3 Electronic Filing Order, and #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines. Signed by Clerk on 8/13/2020.(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

#3

(#3) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 8/12/2020.(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

#2

(#2) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/11/2020. Discovery due by 2/11/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 3/18/2021. Signed by Clerk on 8/12/2020.(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-6028813.), filed by Ashley Nall. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover sheet)(Ellis, Hudson) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketSet Deadlines: Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 11/2/2020. (Velez, F.) (Entered: 09/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER granting #10 motion for extension of time to file 26f report to and including 11/02/20. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 09/25/20. (Codeanne, K.) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Extension of Time until November 2, 2020 to File Rule 26(F) Report by Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company. (Begos, Patrick) (Entered: 09/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDocket Entry Correction re #8 Waiver of Service Executed. Docket text modified to correct waiver sent on date from 8/25/2020 to 8/19/2020 and answer due date from 10/24/2020 to 10/18/2020. (Bozek, M.) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Life, Inc., Corporate Parent Hartford Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent The Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company. (Begos, Patrick) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company waiver sent on 8/19/2020, answer due 10/18/2020 filed by Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company. (Begos, Patrick) Modified on 8/26/2020 to correct waiver sent and answer dates (Bozek, M.). (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Walter Begos on behalf of Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company (Begos, Patrick) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Ivana Deyrup Greco on behalf of Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company (Greco, Ivana) (Entered: 08/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Hudson Taylor Ellis* *Eric Buchanan & Associates, PLLC* *414 McCallie Ave.* *Chattanooga, TN 37402*. (Bozek, M.) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #1 Complaint filed by Ashley Nall, #3 Electronic Filing Order, and #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines. Signed by Clerk on 8/13/2020.(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER. Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 8/12/2020.(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 10/11/2020. Discovery due by 2/11/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 3/18/2021. Signed by Clerk on 8/12/2020.(Bozek, M.) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketJudge Alfred V. Covello added. (Oliver, T.) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • DocketRequest for Clerk to issue summons as to Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company. (Ellis, Hudson) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Hartford Life & Accident Insurance Company ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-6028813.), filed by Ashley Nall. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover sheet)(Ellis, Hudson) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less