This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 09:39:51 (UTC).

Nairn et al v. Boston Scientific Corporation

Case Summary

On 05/13/2020 Nairn filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Boston Scientific Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judge overseeing this case is Timothy S. Hillman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-40054

  • Filing Date:

    05/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Timothy S. Hillman

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Donna Nairn

Michael Nairn

Defendant

Boston Scientific Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeffrey L. Haberman

Attorney at Schlesinger Law Offices, P.A.

1212 Se 3Rd Avenue

Ft. Lauderdale, FL 33316

David Silverman

Attorney at SCHLESINGER LAW OFFICES

1212 Southeast Third Avenue

Ft. Lauderdale, FL 33316

Defendant Attorneys

Eric M. Anielak

Attorney at Shook, Hardy & Bacon LLP,

One Kansas City Place, 1200 Main Street

Kansas City,, MI 64104

Jon A. Strongman

Attorney at SHOOK HARDY & BACON

2555 Grand Boulevard

Kansas City, MO 64108

James H. Keale

Attorney at McCarter & English

Four Gateway Center, 100 Mulberry Street

Newark, NJ 07101-0652

Thomas J. Joensen

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

801 Grand Avenue, 33Rd Floor

Des Moines, IA 50309

Lisa Oliver White

Attorney at Murphy & Riley, PC

125 High Street, Suite 2311

Boston, MA 02110

Michelle M. Tessier

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

90 South 7Th Street, Suite 2200

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Lauren J.F. Barta

Attorney at Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP

2200 Wells Fargo Center, 90 South Seventh Street

Minneapolis, MN 55402

Susan D. Murphy

Attorney at Murphy & Riley PC

125 High Street, Suite 2311

Boston, MA 02110

 

Court Documents

#43

(#43) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J. Joensen on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation (Joensen, Thomas) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

41 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing and Attorney Joensen Affidavit

#41

(#41) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Thomas J. Joensen Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8270278 by Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing and Attorney Joensen Affidavit)(White, Lisa) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

#40

(#40) NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren J.F. Barta on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation (Barta, Lauren) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

#39

(#39) NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle M. Tessier on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation (Tessier, Michelle) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

36 #1

Exhibit Affidavit w/ Certificate of Good Standing

#36

(#36) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Michelle M. Tessier Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8259636 by Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit w/ Certificate of Good Standing)(White, Lisa) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

35 #1

Exhibit Affidavit w/ certificate of Good Standing

#35

(#35) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Lauren J.F. Barta Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8259606 by Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit w/ certificate of Good Standing)(White, Lisa) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

#9

(#9) NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Donna Nairn, Michael Nairn of Dr. Jyot Saini on 04/18/2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Haberman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/09/2018)

#8

(#8) PRETRIAL ORDER # 175 (Docket Control Order - Boston Scientific Corp. Wave 4 Cases) THIS PRETRIAL ORDER SETS MANDATORY DEADLINES FOR MOST OF THE REMAINING BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION CASES. The court ORDERS that this Docket Control Order be filed in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in every case listed on Exhibit A (hereinafter "Wave 4 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order. The following deadlines apply in all Wave 4 cases: A. Scheduling Deadlines. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 3/19/2018, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 4/19/2018, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 5/18/2018, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 6/04/2018, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 7/05/2018, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 7/23/2018, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/04/2018, Deadline to file list of general causation experts in each individual Wave 4 case due by 9/11/2018, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2018, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/05/2018, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/12/2018, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/05/2018, Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/19/2018, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/26/2018. B.4. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/10/2018, and any response is due by 8/24/2018. Any reply is due by 8/31/2018. C.1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/27/2018 the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/03/2018. Additional directives are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; BSC Wave 4 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (klc) (ADI) (Entered: 02/02/2018)

#5

(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Jon A. Strongman on 2/13/2017. Boston Scientific Corporation waiver mailed on 2/10/2017, answer due 4/11/2017. (Strongman, Jon) (Entered: 02/16/2017)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Jon A. Strongman on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Strongman, Jon) (Entered: 02/16/2017)

#3

(#3) TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 152 (Order Establishing Harry F. Bell Settlements Subaccount) entered on 12/21/2016 in MDL 2326 to attorneys in member case. (jk) (Entered: 12/22/2016)

#2

(#2) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Boston Scientific Corporation, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (sas) (Entered: 12/20/2016)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#2) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Boston Scientific Corporation, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (sas) (Entered: 12/20/2016)

182 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas J. Joensen on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation (Joensen, Thomas) (Entered: 06/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #41 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Thomas J. Joensen. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Burgos, Sandra) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Thomas J. Joensen Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8270278 by Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing and Attorney Joensen Affidavit)(White, Lisa) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#40) NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren J.F. Barta on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation (Barta, Lauren) (Entered: 06/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) NOTICE of Appearance by Michelle M. Tessier on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation (Tessier, Michelle) (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#38) District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #36 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Michelle M. Tessier. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Burgos, Sandra) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) District Judge Timothy S. Hillman: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #35 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Added Lauren J.F. Barta. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Burgos, Sandra) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Michelle M. Tessier Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8259636 by Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit w/ Certificate of Good Standing)(White, Lisa) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Lauren J.F. Barta Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8259606 by Boston Scientific Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit w/ certificate of Good Standing)(White, Lisa) (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa Oliver White on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation (White, Lisa) (Entered: 05/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 02/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Donna Nairn, Michael Nairn of Dr. Jyot Saini on 04/18/2018 at 9:00 a.m. (Haberman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 02/09/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) PRETRIAL ORDER # 175 (Docket Control Order - Boston Scientific Corp. Wave 4 Cases) THIS PRETRIAL ORDER SETS MANDATORY DEADLINES FOR MOST OF THE REMAINING BOSTON SCIENTIFIC CORPORATION CASES. The court ORDERS that this Docket Control Order be filed in the main MDL and, as of the time of that filing in every case listed on Exhibit A (hereinafter "Wave 4 cases") becomes subject to the deadlines in this Docket Control Order. The following deadlines apply in all Wave 4 cases: A. Scheduling Deadlines. Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 3/19/2018, Defendant Fact Sheets due by 4/19/2018, Deadline for written discovery requests due by 5/18/2018, Expert disclosure by plaintiffs due by 6/04/2018, Expert disclosure by defendants due by 7/05/2018, Expert disclosure for rebuttal purposes due by 7/23/2018, Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 9/04/2018, Deadline to file list of general causation experts in each individual Wave 4 case due by 9/11/2018, Filing of Dispositive Motions due by 9/21/2018, Response to Dispositive Motions due by 10/05/2018, Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 10/12/2018, Filing of Daubert motions due by 10/05/2018, Responses to Daubert motions due by 10/19/2018, and Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 10/26/2018. B.4. Confidential Documents. In the event there are issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, they must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due on or before 8/10/2018, and any response is due by 8/24/2018. Any reply is due by 8/31/2018. C.1. Venue Recommendations. By no later than 8/27/2018 the parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases, and the parties are ORDERED to submit joint venue recommendations to the court by 9/03/2018. Additional directives are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/30/2018. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2326; BSC Wave 4 Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (klc) (ADI) (Entered: 02/02/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #6 Plaintiff Profile Form. ERROR: Document filed in the incorrect civil action. CORRECTION: Image removed. (skh) (Entered: 06/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) PLAINTIFF PROFILE FORM filed by Donna Nairn, Michael Nairn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) 1)(Haberman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 06/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • Docket(#6) INCORRECT ENTRY; IMAGE REMOVED. (Modified on 6/21/2017 to remove image filed in the incorrect civil action) (skh). (Entered: 06/21/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Waiver signed by Jon A. Strongman on 2/13/2017. Boston Scientific Corporation waiver mailed on 2/10/2017, answer due 4/11/2017. (Strongman, Jon) (Entered: 02/16/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Jon A. Strongman on behalf of Boston Scientific Corporation. (Strongman, Jon) (Entered: 02/16/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 152 (Order Establishing Harry F. Bell Settlements Subaccount) entered on 12/21/2016 in MDL 2326 to attorneys in member case. (jk) (Entered: 12/22/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Boston Scientific Corporation, re: #1 Complaint. Summons returnable 21 days. Instructions to Counsel: This is your electronic summons. Please print as many copies of the Summons and Complaint as are necessary to effectuate service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. See Proof of Service page of this Summons form for filing a return of service if required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(l). (sas) (Entered: 12/20/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-5185533. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (sas) (Entered: 12/20/2016)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Boston Scientific Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lauren J F Barta

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lisa Oliver White

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Thomas J. Joensen