This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/05/2023 at 07:05:39 (UTC).

Naimoli et al v. Pro-Football, Inc., et al

Case Summary

On 09/09/2022 Naimoli filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Pro-Football, Inc ,. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Theodore D. Chuang. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:22-CV-02276

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Theodore D. Chuang

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Michael A Naimoli, Jr.

Morgan French

Andrew Collins

Marissa Santarlasci

Defendants

Pro-Football, Inc.

WFI Stadium, Inc.

Washington Commanders Football Team

Washington Football Team

Washington Redskins Football Team

JKC Stadium, Inc.

Contemporary Services Corporation (CSC)

Company Does

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Robert David Sokolove

Attorney at Curtin & Heefner LLP

1040 Stony Hill Road, Suite 150

Yardley, PA 19067

Defendant Attorneys

Brett Stephen Covington

Attorney at Hollingsworth LLP

1350 I Street, N.W.

Washington, DC 20005

Grant Wagner Hollingsworth

Attorney at Hollingsworth LLP

1350 I St Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Halle Gray

Attorney at Pessin Katz Law, P.A. (PK Law)

10500 Little Patuxent Parkway, Suite 650

Columbia, MD 21044

Joe G Hollingsworth

Attorney at Hollingsworth LLP

1350 I St Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Paul McDermott Finamore

Attorney at Pessin Katz Law, P.A.

10500 Little Patuxent Parkway, Suite 650

Columbia, MD 21044

Michael Patrick Gallagher

Attorney at Martell Donnelly Grimaldi and Gallagher PA

11222 York Road, Second Floor

Hunt Valley, MD 21030

 

Court Documents

#29

(#29) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Pro-Football, Inc., WFI Stadium, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Washington Football, Inc. for Pro-Football, Inc., WFI Stadium, Inc..(Covington, Brett) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

#28

(#28) Correspondence re: Plaintiffs Not Responding to Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss (Covington, Brett) (Entered: 12/11/2022)

27 #1

Exhibit A - Email correspondence between attorneys

27 #27

Main Document

#26

(#26) NOTICE of Appearance by Grant Wagner Hollingsworth on behalf of Pro-Football, Inc., WFI Stadium, Inc. (Hollingsworth, Grant) (Entered: 12/07/2022)

#25

(#25) NOTICE of Appearance by Brett Stephen Covington on behalf of Pro-Football, Inc., WFI Stadium, Inc. (Covington, Brett) (Entered: 12/07/2022)

21 #4

Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order

21 #3

Exhibit B

21 #2

Exhibit A

21 #1

Memorandum in Support Memorandum

21 #21

Main Document

#10

(#10) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on CSC Lawyers Inc. on 09/30/2022, filed by Andrew Collins, Morgan French, Michael A Naimoli, Jr, Marissa Santarlasci.(Sokolove, Robert) (Entered: 10/10/2022)

#8

(#8) Summons Issued 21 days as to Contemporary Services Corporation (CSC), Pro-Football, Inc., WFI Stadium, Inc..(heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE by Andrew Collins, Morgan French, Michael A Naimoli, Jr, Marissa Santarlasci re #1 Complaint, (Sokolove, Robert) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE by Andrew Collins, Morgan French, Michael A Naimoli, Jr, Marissa Santarlasci re #1 Complaint, (Sokolove, Robert) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE by Andrew Collins, Morgan French, Michael A Naimoli, Jr, Marissa Santarlasci re #1 Complaint, (Sokolove, Robert) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

#3

(#3) Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 9/12/2022. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

#1

(#7) NOTICE by Andrew Collins, Morgan French, Michael A Naimoli, Jr, Marissa Santarlasci re #1 Complaint, (Sokolove, Robert) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

19 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) PAPERLESS NOTICE. A CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE is scheduled for January 4, 2023 at 9:00 a.m. to discuss #21 NOTICE OF INTENT TO FILE A MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION AND TO DISMISS. To join the call at the scheduled time: (1) Dial 1-888-557-8511. (2) Enter access code 3008173, followed by the # key. You will then be placed on hold until Chambers dials into the call, at which point you will be prompted to enter a security code. (3) When prompted, enter security code 01040900 followed by the # key. The call will be recorded, so please do not use speakerphones as they compromise sound quality. Also, we ask that parties not remain on the conference line after the Judge has left the call, to ensure that the line is free for other calls that may be on the Judge's calendar. The parties should also be prepared to address whether they consent to have all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge and whether they wish to participate in a mediation session with a Magistrate Judge, whether before, during, or after discovery. Parties are expected to consult with their clients and confer with each other on these issues in advance of the Case Management Conference and, if possible, present joint views to the Court. (ds2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Pro-Football, Inc., WFI Stadium, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Washington Football, Inc. for Pro-Football, Inc., WFI Stadium, Inc..(Covington, Brett) (Entered: 12/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) Correspondence re: Plaintiffs Not Responding to Defendants' Motion to Compel Arbitration and Dismiss (Covington, Brett) (Entered: 12/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Request for Conference (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Email correspondence between attorneys)(Sokolove, Robert) (Entered: 12/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE of Appearance by Grant Wagner Hollingsworth on behalf of Pro-Football, Inc., WFI Stadium, Inc. (Hollingsworth, Grant) (Entered: 12/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE of Appearance by Brett Stephen Covington on behalf of Pro-Football, Inc., WFI Stadium, Inc. (Covington, Brett) (Entered: 12/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Contemporary Services Corporation (CSC) identifying Corporate Parent Event Services America, Inc., Other Affiliate Apex Security Group, Inc. for Contemporary Services Corporation (CSC).(Gallagher, Michael) (Entered: 12/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE of Appearance by Paul McDermott Finamore on behalf of Pro-Football, Inc., WFI Stadium, Inc. (Finamore, Paul) (Entered: 12/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Theodore D. Chuang on 11/21/2022. (ds2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/21/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MOTION to Compel Arbitration and to Dismiss by Contemporary Services Corporation (CSC), Pro-Football, Inc., WFI Stadium, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Gray, Halle) (Entered: 11/18/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 10/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint served on CSC Lawyers Inc. on 09/30/2022, filed by Andrew Collins, Morgan French, Michael A Naimoli, Jr, Marissa Santarlasci.(Sokolove, Robert) (Entered: 10/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Summons Issued 21 days as to Contemporary Services Corporation (CSC), Pro-Football, Inc., WFI Stadium, Inc..(heps, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE by Andrew Collins, Morgan French, Michael A Naimoli, Jr, Marissa Santarlasci re #1 Complaint, (Sokolove, Robert) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE by Andrew Collins, Morgan French, Michael A Naimoli, Jr, Marissa Santarlasci re #1 Complaint, (Sokolove, Robert) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE by Andrew Collins, Morgan French, Michael A Naimoli, Jr, Marissa Santarlasci re #1 Complaint, (Sokolove, Robert) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) QC NOTICE: #1 Complaint filed by Andrew Collins, Morgan French, Michael A Naimoli, Jr, Marissa Santarlasci was filed missing information. **Please file the summons using the event Notice (Other) and link summons to #1 Complaint. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Case Management Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan on 9/12/2022. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE of Case Assignment. This case has been assigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan. Andrew Collins, Morgan French, Michael A Naimoli, Jr, Marissa Santarlasci or counsel for Andrew Collins, Morgan French, Michael A Naimoli, Jr, Marissa Santarlasci are required to review and comply with the Magistrate Judge Pilot Project Procedures which can be downloaded #here. Pursuant to Standing Order 2019-07, which can be downloaded #here, counsel has 14 days from the date of this notice to file their consent, or decline to consent to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. To file your consent, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. To file your declination, go to Civil > Other Filings > Other Documents > 25 Pct Mag - Decline to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge. Failure to file a consent or declination will result in issuance of an Order to Show Cause. Please review the case management order that has been issued in this case. Magistrate Election Form due by 9/26/2022. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/12/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Magistrate Judge Timothy J. Sullivan. (kns, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 09/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Pro-Football, Inc., Washington Commanders Football Team, WFI Stadium, Inc., Contemporary Services Corporation (CSC), Company Does ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AMDDC-10145864.), filed by Michael A Naimoli, Jr, Morgan French, Andrew Collins.(Sokolove, Robert) (Entered: 09/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Pro-Football, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where CONTEMPORARY SERVICES CORPORATION is a litigant