This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2020 at 09:05:49 (UTC).

Naiman v. Endeavor Metals Group, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/20/2020 Naiman filed an Other lawsuit against Endeavor Metals Group, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Kimberly J. Mueller and Dennis M. Cota. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00395

  • Filing Date:

    02/20/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kimberly J. Mueller

Referral Judge

Dennis M. Cota

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Sid Naiman

Defendant

Endeavor Metals Group, LLC Doing business as Endeavor Global Marketing & Advertising Agency

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Todd M. Friedman

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

3 #1

Standing Order

3 #2

Consent Form

3 #3

VDRP

#6

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

03/09/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Friedman, Todd) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/24/2020

Docket(#5) MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Pine for Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota ORDERING that this matter is set for an Initial Scheduling Conference on 7/8/2020 at 10:00 AM at 2986 Bechelli Lane in Redding, California, before Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota. Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this minute order on Defendants not yet appearing. (Pine, C) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/21/2020

Docket(#4) MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller ORDERING this matter REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota for pretrial scheduling. Accordingly, the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference set for 6/25/2020 before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller is VACATED, and will be reset by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota. Plaintiff shall serve a copy of this minute order on Defendant not yet appearing. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/21/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 6/25/2020 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Huang, H) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/21/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Endeavor Metals Group, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Todd M. Friedman* *Law Offices of Todd M. Friedman, P.C.* *21550 Oxnard St., Suite 780* *Woodland Hills, CA 91367*. (Huang, H) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/20/2020
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Endeavor Metals Group, LLC by Sid Naiman. Attorney Friedman, Todd M. added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8750885) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Friedman, Todd) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less