This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/05/2020 at 10:26:41 (UTC).

Nahai et al v. Baby Brezza Enterprises LLC et al

Case Summary

On 04/06/2020 Nahai filed a Contract - Product Liability lawsuit against Baby Brezza Enterprises LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark Falk, Claire C. Cecchi, James B. Clark and Kevin McNulty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-03712

  • Filing Date:

    04/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judges

Mark Falk

James B. Clark

Presiding Judges

Claire C. Cecchi

Kevin McNulty

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Ashley Nahai

Michael Soter

Defendants

The Betesh Group

Baby Brezza Enterprises LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

JASON LOUIS LICHTMAN

Attorney at LIEFF CABRASER HEIMANN & BERNSTEIN LLP

250 Hudson River Street, 8Th Floor

New York, NY 10013

DONALD A. ECKLUND

Attorney at CARELLA, BYRNE, CECCHI, OLSTEIN, BRODY & AGNELLO, P.C.

5 Becker Farm Road

Roseland, NJ 07068

Defendant Attorneys

SUNA LEE

Attorney at WILSON, ELSER, MOSKOWITZ, EDELMAN & DICKER, LLP

200 Campus Drive

Florham Park,, NJ 07932

CAROLYN F. O'CONNOR

Attorney at WILSON, ELSER, MOSKOWITZ, EDELMAN & DICKER, LLP

33 Washington Street

Newark, NJ 07102

 

Court Documents

#12

#11

10 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#10

#9

#8

6 #5

Certificate of Service

6 #4

Text of Proposed Order

6 #3

Declaration of Jason L. Lichtman

6 #2

Declaration of Donald A. Ecklund

6 #1

Statement

#6

#5

#4

#3

1 #3

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE of Appearance by SUNA LEE on behalf of Baby Brezza Enterprises LLC (LEE, SUNA) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by CAROLYN F. O'CONNOR on behalf of Baby Brezza Enterprises LLC (O'CONNOR, CAROLYN) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Proposed Order by Baby Brezza Enterprises LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(O'CONNOR, CAROLYN) (Entered: 05/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER GRANTING JASON L. LICHTMAN PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION, etc. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 5/6/2020. (lag, ) (Entered: 05/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Order to Refund Fees (Finance notified). Signed by Chief Deputy Clerk Theresa Burnett on 04/14/2020. (man, Entered 05/04/2020) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • Docket(#7) TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Kevin McNulty and Magistrate Judge James B. Clark for all further proceedings. Judge Claire C. Cecchi, Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel no longer assigned to case. So Ordered by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 5/5/20. (ak, ) (Entered: 05/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSet Deadlines as to #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 6/1/2020 before Judge Claire C. Cecchi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sm) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Ashley Nahai, Michael Soter. (Attachments: #1 Statement, #2 Declaration of Donald A. Ecklund, #3 Declaration of Jason L. Lichtman, #4 Text of Proposed Order, #5 Certificate of Service)(ECKLUND, DONALD) (Entered: 05/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Soter, Ashley Nahai. The Betesh Group served on 4/8/2020, answer due 4/29/2020. (LICHTMAN, JASON) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Soter, Ashley Nahai. Baby Brezza Enterprises LLC served on 4/8/2020, answer due 4/29/2020. (LICHTMAN, JASON) (Entered: 04/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Application for Refund of Fees from Counsel for Plaintiffs re #1 Complaint, (finance notified).. (LICHTMAN, JASON) (Entered: 04/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • DocketJudge Claire C. Cecchi and Magistrate Judge Edward S. Kiel added. (ps, ) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS ISSUED as to Baby Brezza Enterprises LLC, The Betesh Group. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (sm) (Entered: 04/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Baby Brezza Enterprises LLC, The Betesh Group ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number ANJDC-10649250) with JURY DEMAND, filed by Michael Soter, Ashley Nahai. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(LICHTMAN, JASON) (Entered: 04/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BABY BREZZA ENTERPRISES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CAROLYN F. O'CONNOR

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SUNA LEE