This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/24/2023 at 07:16:23 (UTC).

Nabors v. DNF Associates LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/26/2022 Nabors filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against DNF Associates LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Steven D. Grimberg and Catherine M. Salinas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-05081

  • Filing Date:

    12/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steven D. Grimberg

Referral Judge

Catherine M. Salinas

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Joseph Nabors

Defendants

DNF Associates LLC

Aldridge Pite Haan LLP

Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

John William Nelson

Attorney at The Nelson Law Chambers, LLC

Suite 400, 2180 Satellite Blvd.

Duluth, GA 30097

Defendant Attorney

Brendan Hoffman Little

Attorney at Lippes Mathias LLP

50 Fountain Plaza, Suite 1700

Buffalo, NY 14202

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by DNF Associates LLC.(Little, Brendan) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 02/22/2023)

#17

(#17) MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default As To Defendant DNF Associates LLC by Joseph Nabors. (Nelson, John) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

#16

(#16) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Joseph Nabors. Aldridge Pite Haan LLP waiver mailed on 2/2/2023, answer due 4/3/2023. (Nelson, John) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

#14

(#14) MOTION for Extension of Time to Conduct Mandatory Rule 26(f) Conference by Joseph Nabors. (Nelson, John) (Entered: 02/13/2023)

#13

(#13) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Joseph Nabors. Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America waiver mailed on 2/1/2023, answer due 4/3/2023. (Nelson, John) (Entered: 02/13/2023)

#12

(#12) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service mailed to Aldridge Pite Haan LLP on 2/2/2023. (Nelson, John) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

#11

(#11) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service mailed to Travelers Casualty And Surety Company of America on 2/1/2023. (Nelson, John) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

#10

(#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Requests for Production to Defendant DNF Associates LLC by Joseph Nabors.(Nelson, John) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

9 #2

Summons Proposed Summons to Defendant Travelers Casualty And Surety Company of A

9 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A -- Travelers Surety Bond

9 #9

Main Document

#8

(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Diverse Funding Associates LLC for DNF Associates LLC by DNF Associates LLC.(Little, Brendan) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

#7

(#7) ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by DNF Associates LLC. Discovery ends on 6/26/2023.(Little, Brendan) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 01/27/2023)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Joseph Nabors. Aldridge Pite Haan LLP waiver mailed on 1/12/2023, answer due 3/13/2023. (Nelson, John) (Entered: 01/20/2023)

#5

(#5) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service mailed to Gregson T. Haan, Aldridge Pite Haan LLP on 1/12/2023. (Nelson, John) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

#4

(#4) Return of Service Executed by Joseph Nabors. DNF Associates LLC served on 1/10/2023, answer due 1/31/2023. (Nelson, John) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) ANSWER to #9 Amended Complaint by DNF Associates LLC.(Little, Brendan) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 02/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default As To Defendant DNF Associates LLC by Joseph Nabors. (Nelson, John) (Entered: 02/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Joseph Nabors. Aldridge Pite Haan LLP waiver mailed on 2/2/2023, answer due 4/3/2023. (Nelson, John) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER (by docket entry only) GRANTING #14 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Conduct Mandatory Rule 26(f) Conference. For the reasons set forth in the motion, the deadline for conducting the Rule 26(f) conference is extended to February 23, 2023. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Catherine M. Salinas on 02/14/2023. (drg) (Entered: 02/14/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION for Extension of Time to Conduct Mandatory Rule 26(f) Conference by Joseph Nabors. (Nelson, John) (Entered: 02/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Joseph Nabors. Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America waiver mailed on 2/1/2023, answer due 4/3/2023. (Nelson, John) (Entered: 02/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service mailed to Aldridge Pite Haan LLP on 2/2/2023. (Nelson, John) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service mailed to Travelers Casualty And Surety Company of America on 2/1/2023. (Nelson, John) (Entered: 02/02/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Requests for Production to Defendant DNF Associates LLC by Joseph Nabors.(Nelson, John) (Entered: 01/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand filed by Joseph Nabors. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A -- Travelers Surety Bond, #2 Summons Proposed Summons to Defendant Travelers Casualty And Surety Company of America)(Nelson, John) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 01/31/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Diverse Funding Associates LLC for DNF Associates LLC by DNF Associates LLC.(Little, Brendan) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT by DNF Associates LLC. Discovery ends on 6/26/2023.(Little, Brendan) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 01/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Joseph Nabors. Aldridge Pite Haan LLP waiver mailed on 1/12/2023, answer due 3/13/2023. (Nelson, John) (Entered: 01/20/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service mailed to Gregson T. Haan, Aldridge Pite Haan LLP on 1/12/2023. (Nelson, John) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Return of Service Executed by Joseph Nabors. DNF Associates LLC served on 1/10/2023, answer due 1/31/2023. (Nelson, John) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Electronic Summons Issued as to Aldridge Pite Haan LLP, DNF Associates LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons DNF)(ceo) (Entered: 12/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Joseph Nabors.(ceo) (Entered: 12/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Joseph Nabors. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-12282502) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ceo) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 12/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less