This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/21/2019 at 07:45:44 (UTC).

Nabong v. Mattel, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/22/2019 Nabong filed a Contract - Product Liability lawsuit against Mattel, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Geoffrey Crawford. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00668

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Geoffrey Crawford

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mark NABONG

Defendants

Mattel, Inc.

Fisher Price, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Terrence M. Connors

Attorney at Connors LLP

1000 Liberty Building

Buffalo, NY 14202

Daniel Tepper

Attorney at Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLP

270 Madison Ave.

New York, NY 10016

Kate M McGuire

Attorney at Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLP

270 Madison Ave.

New York, NY 10016

Demet Basar

Attorney at Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLP

270 Madison Ave.

New York, NY 10016

Kate G. Howard

Attorney at Connors LLP

1000 Liberty Building

Buffalo, NY 14202

Caitlin M Higgins

Attorney at Connors LLP

1000 Liberty Building

Buffalo, NY 14202

Carl V. Malmstrom

Attorney at Wolf Haldenstein Adler Freeman & Herz LLC

111 West Jackson, Suite 1700

Chicago, IL 60604

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew Paul Kanny

Attorney at Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP

11355 W. Olympic Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Adrianne Elizabeth Marshack

Attorney at Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP

695 Town Center Drive, 14Th Floor

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Cheryl A. Possenti

Attorney at Goldberg Segalla LLP

665 Main Street, Suite 400

Buffalo, NY 14203

 

Court Documents

21 #8

Text of Proposed Order

21 #7

Exhibit E to Declaration

21 #6

Exhibit D to Declaration

21 #5

Exhibit C to Declaration

21 #4

Exhibit B to Declaration

21 #3

Exhibit A to Declaration

21 #2

Declaration of Adrianne E. Marshack

21 #1

Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Extend Briefing Schedule on

#21

4 #1

summons issued

#4

9 #3

Exhibit

9 #2

Certificate of Service

9 #1

Exhibit

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

61 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORDER finding as moot #21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Hon. Geoffrey Crawford on 7/9/19. (JL)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP- (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER: Defendants have now filed an opposition to motion to lift stay. The pending motion for an extension of time to file an opposition #21 is DENIED as moot. The court will rule on the merits of the motion to lift stay #20 immediately after learning of the decision of the U.S. Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on the motion to transfer. Signed by Hon. Geoffrey Crawford on 7/9/19. (JL)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP- (Entered: 07/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Lift Stay filed by Fisher Price, Inc., Mattel, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adrianne E. Marshack in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Lift Stay, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration, #3 Exhibit B to Declaration, #4 Exhibit C to Declaration, #5 Exhibit D to Declaration, #6 Exhibit E to Declaration, #7 Exhibit F to Declaration, #8 Exhibit G to Declaration, #9 Exhibit H to Declaration, #10 Exhibit I to Declaration, #11 Exhibit J to Declaration, #12 Exhibit K to Declaration)(Marshack, Adrianne) (Entered: 07/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) RESPONSE in Opposition re #21 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Opposition on Plaintiffs Motion to Lift Stay filed by Mark Nabong. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Howard, Kate) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Docket(#22) ORDER Re: Motion to Extend Briefing Schedule on Plaintiff's Motion to Lift Stay. Response to this motion is due July 3, 2019. Signed by Hon. Geoffrey Crawford on 6/27/19. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00787-GWC et al.(JL)-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP- (Entered: 06/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Opposition on Plaintiffs Motion to Lift Stay by Fisher Price, Inc., Mattel, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Defendants' Motion to Extend Briefing Schedule on Plaintiff's Motion to Lift Stay, #2 Declaration of Adrianne E. Marshack, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration, #4 Exhibit B to Declaration, #5 Exhibit C to Declaration, #6 Exhibit D to Declaration, #7 Exhibit E to Declaration, #8 Text of Proposed Order)(Marshack, Adrianne) (Entered: 06/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MOTION to Lift Stay by Mark Nabong. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Memorandum in Support)(Howard, Kate) (Entered: 06/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Fisher Price, Inc., Mattel, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Mattel, Inc. for Fisher Price, Inc.; Corporate Parent No corporate parent and No publicly traded corporation owns 10 percent or more of its stock for Mattel, Inc... (Marshack, Adrianne) (Entered: 06/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Remark: Amended Memorandum in Support of #18 Defendants' motion to transfer, filed pursuant to MDL Panel Rule 6.2(a). Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00670-GWC et al.(KLH) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Second Amended Motion to transfer to Multidistrict court and supporting documents. This motion was filed in USDC pursuant to Panel Rule 6.2(a). Motion will be decided by Multidistrict Panel. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00670-GWC, 1:19-cv-00518-GWC, 1:19-cv-00667-GWC, 1:19-cv-00668-GWC, 1:19-cv-00695-GWC(KLH) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE by Fisher Price, Inc., Mattel, Inc. Notice of Filing of Motion for Transfer of Actions Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec.1407 (Possenti, Cheryl) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONTINUATION OF EXHIBITS Courtesy Copy filed in USDC pursuant to Panel Rule 6.2(a) by Fisher Price, Inc., Mattel, Inc., Fisher-Price, Inc.. to (5 in 1:19-cv-00667-GWC, 6 in 1:19-cv-00670-GWC, 5 in 1:19-cv-00668-GWC, 9 in 1:19-cv-00518-GWC) Memorandum in Support,, filed by Fisher Price, Inc., Mattel, Inc., Fisher-Price, Inc.. Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00670-GWC, 1:19-cv-00518-GWC, 1:19-cv-00667-GWC, 1:19-cv-00668-GWC(Possenti, Cheryl) Modified on 6/4/2019 (SG). (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT, Courtesy Copy filed in USDC pursuant to Panel Rule 6.2(a) re (5 in 1:19-cv-00670-GWC) MOTION to Consolidate Cases Defendants' Motion for Transfer of Actions Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sec. 1407 to the Central District of California for Coordination or Consolidation of Pretrial Proceedings byFisher Price, Inc., Mattel, Inc., Fisher-Price, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Exhibit)Associated Cases: 1:19-cv-00670-GWC, 1:19-cv-00518-GWC, 1:19-cv-00667-GWC, 1:19-cv-00668-GWC(Possenti, Cheryl) Modified on 6/4/2019 (SG). (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Fisher Price, Inc., Mattel, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 summons issued)(SG) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketNotice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms. (SG) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketAUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(SG) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Geoffrey Crawford. Notification to Chambers of on-line civil case opening. (SG) (Entered: 05/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Original Summons Filed. (Connors, Terrence) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Original Summons Filed. (Connors, Terrence) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants $ 400 receipt number 0209-3460741, filed by Mark NABONG. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Connors, Terrence) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MATTEL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Fisher-Price, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kate G. Howard

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel Tepper