This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/03/2022 at 08:17:02 (UTC).

N et al v. Meta Platforms, Inc.

Case Summary

On 07/25/2022 N filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Meta Platforms, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Kandis A. Westmore and Jeffrey S. White. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-04283

  • Filing Date:

    07/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Kandis A. Westmore

Jeffrey S. White

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

C N

Candace Wuest

Defendants

Meta Platforms, Inc.

Facebook, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Laura R. Garrett

Attorney at Social Media Victims Law Center

1390 Market St, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 98104

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover

#2

(#2) Proposed Summons. (Garrett, Laura) (Filed on 7/25/2022) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

#4

(#4) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by C N, Candace Wuest.. (Garrett, Laura) (Filed on 7/25/2022) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

#6

(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/18/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/25/2022 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2022) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

#7

(#7) Summons Issued as to Meta Platforms, Inc. (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2022) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

8 #8

Main Document

8 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#9

(#9) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 27, 2022. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2022) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

10 #10

Main Document

10 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#11

(#11) ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on July 27, 2022. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/21/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/28/2022 11:00 AM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jsw Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argum ent at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at jswcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than October 27, 2022 at 12:00 PM PST.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (dts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2022) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

#12

(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Candace Wuest, C N. Meta Platforms, Inc. served on 7/27/2022, answer due 8/17/2022. (Garrett, Laura) (Filed on 7/28/2022) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Candace Wuest, C N. Meta Platforms, Inc. served on 7/27/2022, answer due 8/17/2022. (Garrett, Laura) (Filed on 7/28/2022) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on July 27, 2022. Joint Case Management Statement due by 10/21/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/28/2022 11:00 AM in Oakland, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar.Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jsw Court Appearances: Advanced notice is required of counsel or parties who wish to be identified by the court as making an appearance or will be participating in the argum ent at the hearing. One list of names of all counsel appearing for all parties must be sent in one email to the CRD at jswcrd@cand.uscourts.gov no later than October 27, 2022 at 12:00 PM PST.General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited.Zoom Guidance and Setup: #https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/. (dts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2022) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jeffrey S. White for all further proceedings. Judge Maxine M. Chesney no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by Clerk on 07/27/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(mbc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2022) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER OF RECUSAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 27, 2022. (mmclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/27/2022) (Entered: 07/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Maxine M. Chesney for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore no longer assigned to case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by The Clerk on 07/26/2022. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(jrs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2022) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Summons Issued as to Meta Platforms, Inc. (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2022) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: Case Management Statement due by 10/18/2022. Initial Case Management Conference set for 10/25/2022 01:30 PM in Oakland, - To be determined. (sfb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2022) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2022
  • Docket(#5) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (wft, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/26/2022) (Entered: 07/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by C N, Candace Wuest.. (Garrett, Laura) (Filed on 7/25/2022) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • Docket(#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kandis A. Westmore. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 8/8/2022. (bw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2022) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Proposed Summons. (Garrett, Laura) (Filed on 7/25/2022) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Meta Platforms, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACANDC-17378344.). Filed byCandace Wuest, C N. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover)(Garrett, Laura) (Filed on 7/25/2022) (Entered: 07/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Meta Platforms, Inc. f/k/a Facebook, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Laura R. Garrett