This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/21/2022 at 07:28:24 (UTC).

Myre et al v. Oxford Community School District et al

Case Summary

On 05/22/2022 Myre filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Oxford Community School District. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Mark A. Goldsmith and Anthony P. Patti. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-11113

  • Filing Date:

    05/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark A. Goldsmith

Referral Judge

Anthony P. Patti

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

William Myre

Sheri Myre

TM

Craig Shilling

Jill Soave

JCS

Chad Gregory

KG

Lauren Aliano

SK

GK

Laura Lucas

AS

Defendants

Oxford Community School District

Timothy Throne

Steven Wolf

Nicholas Ejak

Shawn Hopkins

Kenneth Weaver, Superintendent

Pam Parker Fine

6 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeffrey T. Stewart

Kanwarpreet Singh Khahra

Vernon R. Johnson

Defendant Attorneys

Annabel F. Shea

John L. Miller

Kenneth B. Chapie

Timothy J. Mullins

Other Attorneys

Deborah L. Gordon

Matthew L. Turner

Lisa M. Esser

 

Court Documents

#26

(#26) ORDER (1) Setting Deadlines Regarding Joint Statement and Proposed Order, (2) Directing Parties to File Memoranda Regarding Timing of Qualified Immunity Motions, and (3) Directing Parties to Conduct Substantive Motion Practice in Case No. 21-cv-12871. (Joint Statement due by 7/27/2022; Qualified Immunity Memoranda due by 8/12/2022; Responses due by 8/26/2022.) Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (KWin) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

#25

(#25) AMENDED NOTICE TO APPEAR BY VIDEO CONFERENCE: Status Conference set for 7/13/2022 03:30 PM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith (WBar) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

#24

(#24) NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Status Conference set for 7/13/2022 03:30 PM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith (DTof) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

#23

(#23) AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by All Defendants (Mullins, Timothy) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

#22

(#22) NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa M. Esser on behalf of Lisa M. Esser. (Esser, Lisa) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

#21

(#21) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew L. Turner on behalf of Matthew L. Turner. (Turner, Matthew) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

#20

(#20) ORDER for Joint Statement and Status Conference on Coordination of Related Litigation (Joint Statement due 7/11/2022). Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (KSan) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

#19

(#19) ORDER Regarding Telephonic Scheduling Conference ( TELEPHONIC Scheduling Conference set for 7/14/2022 11:00 AM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith). The parties shall call into (877) 336-1274 and use access code: 9602327. An email will be sent to counsel with the security code. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (KSan) (Entered: 06/25/2022)

6 #2

Exhibit 1

6 #1

Index of Exhibits

6 #6

Main Document

#5

(#5) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Judith E. Levy and Magistrate Judge Jonathan J.C. Grey in Ann Arbor to District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith and Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti in Detroit. (SSch) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

#4

(#4) ORDER to Striking Plaintiffs' #1 Complaint and Directing the Clerk to Amend the Docket. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (JOwe) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (TTho) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

2 #2

Exhibit PL Exhibit 2

2 #1

Exhibit PL Exhibit 1

2 #2

Main Document

#1

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORDER (1) Setting Deadlines Regarding Joint Statement and Proposed Order, (2) Directing Parties to File Memoranda Regarding Timing of Qualified Immunity Motions, and (3) Directing Parties to Conduct Substantive Motion Practice in Case No. 21-cv-12871. (Joint Statement due by 7/27/2022; Qualified Immunity Memoranda due by 8/12/2022; Responses due by 8/26/2022.) Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (KWin) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • DocketMinute Entry for telephonic proceedings before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 7/14/2022; (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (WBar) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • DocketMinute Entry for virtual proceedings before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith: Status Conference held on 7/13/2022; (Court Reporter: None Present, Not on the Record) (WBar) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) AMENDED NOTICE TO APPEAR BY VIDEO CONFERENCE: Status Conference set for 7/13/2022 03:30 PM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith (WBar) (Entered: 07/12/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Status Conference set for 7/13/2022 03:30 PM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith (DTof) (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES by All Defendants (Mullins, Timothy) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa M. Esser on behalf of Lisa M. Esser. (Esser, Lisa) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew L. Turner on behalf of Matthew L. Turner. (Turner, Matthew) (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ORDER for Joint Statement and Status Conference on Coordination of Related Litigation (Joint Statement due 7/11/2022). Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (KSan) (Entered: 06/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER Regarding Telephonic Scheduling Conference ( TELEPHONIC Scheduling Conference set for 7/14/2022 11:00 AM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith). The parties shall call into (877) 336-1274 and use access code: 9602327. An email will be sent to counsel with the security code. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (KSan) (Entered: 06/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 06/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE TO APPEAR BY TELEPHONE: Status Conference set for 6/13/2022 at 01:00 PM before District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith (EPar) (Entered: 06/09/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah L. Gordon on behalf of Deborah L Gordon. (Gordon, Deborah) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER Regarding Filings. Signed by District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith. (KSan) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8926688 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): Oakland County Circuit Court, 22-192262-NO, Judge Rae Lee Chabot] (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2) (Johnson, Vernon) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE from District Judge Judith E. Levy and Magistrate Judge Jonathan J.C. Grey in Ann Arbor to District Judge Mark A. Goldsmith and Magistrate Judge Anthony P. Patti in Detroit. (SSch) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER to Striking Plaintiffs' #1 Complaint and Directing the Clerk to Amend the Docket. Signed by District Judge Judith E. Levy. (JOwe) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • DocketA United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (TTho) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (TTho) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) INDEX of Exhibits re #1 Complaint,, by All Plaintiffs (Attachments: #1 Exhibit PL Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit PL Exhibit 2) (Johnson, Vernon) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) [STRICKEN] COMPLAINT filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-8920171 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Oakland - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Oakland. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): Oakland County Circuit Court, 22-192262-NO, Judge Rae Lee Chabot] (Johnson, Vernon) Modified on 5/23/2022 (JOwe). (Entered: 05/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less