This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/25/2022 at 08:03:37 (UTC).

MYNATT v. REAGLE et al

Case Summary

On 07/27/2022 MYNATT filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against REAGLE. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Indiana Southern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are James Patrick Hanlon and Mark J. Dinsmore. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00313

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James Patrick Hanlon

Referral Judge

Mark J. Dinsmore

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JARED MYNATT

Defendants

DENNIS REAGLE

MAGGIE BRYANT

DUANE ALSIP

CHRISTINA CONYERS

C.W. GREATHOUSE

MASON

BOWMAN

MARSH

PHFLEGGER

SIMONE

FISH

COMMANDER

GRIFFITH

NORADOES

KONKLE

BRUMBACH

MOORE

NIEMAN

MATLOCK

25 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against ALICIA, DUANE ALSIP, ASHBY, BOWMAN, BRUMBACH, MAGGIE BRYANT, K. CARTER, COLE, COMMANDER, CHRISTINA CONYERS, DOES 1-7, FISH, FRIEN, GOODNIGHT, C.W. GREATHOUSE, GREY, GRIFFITH, KEEBLE, KONKLE, LAMAR, LAMPART, MARSH, MARTIN, MASON(Cpt.), MASON(Sgt.), MATLOCK, MOORE, MOSER, NIEMAN, NORADOES, OPIE, PAGE, PHFLEGGER, POOR, DENNIS REAGLE, RITCHARDSON, RUIZ, SIDWELL, SIMONE, THOMAS, TURNER, VCKER, VOLGMAN, WATKINS(Mr.), WATKINS(Ms.), JONI WOODS, filed by JARED MYNATT. (No fee paid with this filing) (TPS) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff JARED MYNATT. (TPS) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

#3

(#3) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (TPS) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. Copy to plaintiff by U.S. mail. (MEH) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Your civil rights complaint has been received. You shall have through August 26, 2022, in which to correct the deficiencies as follows: Your motion to proceed in forma pauperis cannot be ruled on because you have not submitted a copy of the transaction history associated with your institution trust account for the 6-month period preceding the filing of this action. Copy to plaintiff by U.S. Mail. (MEH) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

#6

(#6) RESPONSE, re #5 Notice of Deficiency, filed by Plaintiff JARED MYNATT. (KAA) (Entered: 08/18/2022)

#7

(#7) Order on In Forma Pauperis Status - The plaintiff shall have through October 19, 2022, to comply with the Court's previous order or explain why doing so is not possible. The failure to do so by this date will result in the dismissal of this action without further warning. Copy to plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 9/20/2022.(KAA) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

 

Docket Entries

09/20/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#7) Order on In Forma Pauperis Status - The plaintiff shall have through October 19, 2022, to comply with the Court's previous order or explain why doing so is not possible. The failure to do so by this date will result in the dismissal of this action without further warning. Copy to plaintiff via US Mail. Signed by Judge James Patrick Hanlon on 9/20/2022.(KAA) (Entered: 09/20/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/18/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#6) RESPONSE, re #5 Notice of Deficiency, filed by Plaintiff JARED MYNATT. (KAA) (Entered: 08/18/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/29/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#5) NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Your civil rights complaint has been received. You shall have through August 26, 2022, in which to correct the deficiencies as follows: Your motion to proceed in forma pauperis cannot be ruled on because you have not submitted a copy of the transaction history associated with your institution trust account for the 6-month period preceding the filing of this action. Copy to plaintiff by U.S. Mail. (MEH) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/29/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#4) NOTICE to Pro se Litigant - The following information is provided to pro se litigants to inform them about rules and procedures governing how they communicate with the Court. Copy to plaintiff by U.S. mail. (MEH) (Entered: 07/29/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/28/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#3) MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (TPS) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff JARED MYNATT. (TPS) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/27/2022
View Court Documents

Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against ALICIA, DUANE ALSIP, ASHBY, BOWMAN, BRUMBACH, MAGGIE BRYANT, K. CARTER, COLE, COMMANDER, CHRISTINA CONYERS, DOES 1-7, FISH, FRIEN, GOODNIGHT, C.W. GREATHOUSE, GREY, GRIFFITH, KEEBLE, KONKLE, LAMAR, LAMPART, MARSH, MARTIN, MASON(Cpt.), MASON(Sgt.), MATLOCK, MOORE, MOSER, NIEMAN, NORADOES, OPIE, PAGE, PHFLEGGER, POOR, DENNIS REAGLE, RITCHARDSON, RUIZ, SIDWELL, SIMONE, THOMAS, TURNER, VCKER, VOLGMAN, WATKINS(Mr.), WATKINS(Ms.), JONI WOODS, filed by JARED MYNATT. (No fee paid with this filing) (TPS) (Entered: 07/28/2022)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less