This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/22/2022 at 08:39:59 (UTC).

Myers v. Wright Medical Technology Inc

Case Summary

On 05/23/2022 Myers filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Wright Medical Technology Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Kristine G. Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-00472

  • Filing Date:

    05/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kristine G. Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alan Myers

Defendant

Wright Medical Technology Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

C. Calvin Warriner, III

Attorney at Searcy, Denney, Scarola, Barnhart & Shipley, PA

2139 Palm Beach Lakes Boulevard

West Palm Beach, FL 33409

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) NOTIFICATION to Counsel from the Clerk of Court regarding MDL 2949, In Re Profemur Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation. Attached are the Order Upon Transfer and Case Management Order No. 1 entered by the Court regarding this matter. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 5/23/2022. (jbh) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

#3

(#3) ORDER FOR FURTHER DOCUMENTATION OF PLAINTIFFS' ALLEGED INJURIES directing that each plaintiff with a case pending in this MDL shall, within 30 days of the date of this Order, provide the information and the supporting documentation required by "Exhibit A." For any cases subsequently filed in the MDL after the date of this Order, the plaintiff is required to complete and submit Exhibit A and the requested materials within 30 days of filing the complaint. Service of the completed Exhibit A and the supporting documentation shall be made electronically, via email, as specified by this Order. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 1/12/2022. (jbh) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alan Myers. Wright Medical Technology Inc served on 5/25/2022. (Warriner, C.) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alan Myers. Wright Medical Technology Inc served on 5/25/2022. (Warriner, C.) (Entered: 06/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re #1 Complaint. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to include "Summons issued and returned to counsel for service." (cmn) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER FOR FURTHER DOCUMENTATION OF PLAINTIFFS' ALLEGED INJURIES directing that each plaintiff with a case pending in this MDL shall, within 30 days of the date of this Order, provide the information and the supporting documentation required by "Exhibit A." For any cases subsequently filed in the MDL after the date of this Order, the plaintiff is required to complete and submit Exhibit A and the requested materials within 30 days of filing the complaint. Service of the completed Exhibit A and the supporting documentation shall be made electronically, via email, as specified by this Order. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 1/12/2022. (jbh) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTIFICATION to Counsel from the Clerk of Court regarding MDL 2949, In Re Profemur Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation. Attached are the Order Upon Transfer and Case Management Order No. 1 entered by the Court regarding this matter. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 5/23/2022. (jbh) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES with Jury Demand against Wright Medical Technology Inc, filed by Alan Myers. (Fee of $402 paid. Receipt Number LIT086856.) Summons issued and returned to counsel for service. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh) (Docket text modified on 5/26/2022 to indicate summons issued.)(cmn) (Entered: 05/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WRIGHT MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer C Calvin Warriner, III