This case was last updated from PACER on 02/29/2020 at 08:26:59 (UTC).

Myers v. McNamee Hosea Jernigan Kim Greenan & Lynch, P.A.

Case Summary

On 12/31/2019 Myers filed a Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy lawsuit against McNamee Hosea Jernigan Kim Greenan Lynch, P A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is Paula Xinis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:19-CV-03677

  • Filing Date:

    12/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Bankruptcy - Other Bankruptcy

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maryland District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paula Xinis

 

Party Details

Appellant and Debtor

Gregory B. Myers

Naples, FL 34102

Appellee

McNamee Hosea Jernigan Kim Greenan & Lynch, P.A.

Trustee

Roger Schlossberg

Hagerstown, MD 21742

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellee Attorneys

Craig M Palik

Attorney at McNamee Hosea Jernigan Kim Greenan and Lynch PA

6411 Ivy Ln Ste 200

Greenbelt, MD 20770

Steven Lewis Goldberg

Attorney at McNamee Hosea Jernigan Kim Greenan and Lynch PA

6411 Ivy Lane Ste 200

Greenbelt, MD 20770

Trustee Attorneys

Roger Schlossberg

Attorney at Schlossberg, Mastro & Scanlan

18421 Henson Boulevard, Suite 201

Hagerstown, MD 21742

Frank J Mastro

Attorney at Schlossberg & Mastro

18421 Henson Boulevard, Suite 201

Hagerstown, MD 21742

 

Court Documents

7 #43

BK #845-1 Proposed Order

7 #33

BK #831 Motion to Cancel Hearing

7 #27

BK #757-4 Certificate of Service

7 #24

BK #757-1 Notice of Motion

7 #23

BK #757 Motion to Approve Stipulation/Settlement

7 #22

BK #720 Order Denying Motion to Compel

7 #21

BK #718-1 Proposed Order

7 #20

BK #718 Opposition related to BK#714

7 #19

BK #717 Opposition related to BK#714

7 #18

BK #714 Motion to Compel

7 #17

BK #688-1 Certificate of Service

7 #16

BK #688 Declaration re:Amended Disclosure of Connections

7 #15

BK #658 Opposition on Behalf of McNamee, Hosea, Jernigan, Kim, Greenan, Ly

7 #4

BK #331-1 Proposed Order

7 #3

BK #331 Application to Employ Attorney for Trustee and Verified Statement

#7

(#7) AMENDED APPELLANT DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal from U.S. Bankruptcy Court by Gregory B. Myers re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, (Attachments: #1 BK #285 Supplemental Disclosure of Compensation, #2 BK #310 Amended Disclosure, #3 BK #331 Application to Employ Attorney for Trustee and Verified Statement of Proposed Party, #4 BK #331-1 Proposed Order, #5 BK #381 Order Appointing Attorney to Trustee, #6 BK #397 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, #7 BK #397-1 Exhibit Withdrawal Letter, #8 BK #397-2 Proposed Order, #9 BK #434 Corrected Order Granting Leave of Court to Withdraw as Attorney, #10 BK #464 Final Application for Compensation, #11 BK #464-1 Exhibit Billing Statement, #12 BK #464-2 Notice of Motion, #13 BK #464-3 Mailing Matrix, #14 BK #464-4 Proposed Order, #15 BK #658 Opposition on Behalf of McNamee, Hosea, Jernigan, Kim, Greenan, Lynch, P.A., #16 BK #688 Declaration re:Amended Disclosure of Connections, #17 BK #688-1 Certificate of Service, #18 BK #714 Motion to Compel, #19 BK #717 Opposition related to BK#714, #20 BK #718 Opposition related to BK#714, #21 BK #718-1 Proposed Order, #22 BK #720 Order Denying Motion to Compel, #23 BK #757 Motion to Approve Stipulation/Settlement, #24 BK #757-1 Notice of Motion, #25 BK #757-2 Exhibit to Notice of Proposed Compromise, #26 BK #757-3 Proposed Order, #27 BK #757-4 Certificate of Service, #28 BK #757-5 Mailing Matrix, #29 BK #757-6 Certificate of Service, #30 BK #778 Objection related to BK#757, #31 BK #778-1 Exhibit, #32 BK #829 Notice of Hearing, #33 BK #831 Motion to Cancel Hearing, #34 BK #831-1 Exhibit A, #35 BK #831-2 Exhibit B, #36 BK #831-3 Exhibit C, #37 BK #831-4 Exhibit D, #38 BK #833 Order Denying Motion to Cancel Hearing, #39 BK #836 Hearing Held, #40 BK #837 Order Approving Compromise and Settlement, #41 BK #839 Motion to Reconsider Order Approving Compromise, #42 BK #845 Opposition Related to BK#839, #43 BK #845-1 Proposed Order, #44 BK #862 Order Denying Motion to Reconsider, #45 BK #864 Notice of Appeal, #46 BK #864-1 Exhibit A, #47 Docket Sheet, #48 Transmittal Sheet)(dg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

1 #4

Transmittal Sheet

#1

(#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT (Greenbelt). Bankruptcy Court case number 15-26033 LSS, filed by Gregory B. Myers. (Attachments: #1 BK #837 Order Approving Compromise and Settlement, #2 BK #862 Order Denying Motion to Reconsider, #3 Docket Sheet, #4 Transmittal Sheet)(kns, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

55 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) AMENDED APPELLANT DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal from U.S. Bankruptcy Court by Gregory B. Myers re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal, (Attachments: #1 BK #285 Supplemental Disclosure of Compensation, #2 BK #310 Amended Disclosure, #3 BK #331 Application to Employ Attorney for Trustee and Verified Statement of Proposed Party, #4 BK #331-1 Proposed Order, #5 BK #381 Order Appointing Attorney to Trustee, #6 BK #397 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, #7 BK #397-1 Exhibit Withdrawal Letter, #8 BK #397-2 Proposed Order, #9 BK #434 Corrected Order Granting Leave of Court to Withdraw as Attorney, #10 BK #464 Final Application for Compensation, #11 BK #464-1 Exhibit Billing Statement, #12 BK #464-2 Notice of Motion, #13 BK #464-3 Mailing Matrix, #14 BK #464-4 Proposed Order, #15 BK #658 Opposition on Behalf of McNamee, Hosea, Jernigan, Kim, Greenan, Lynch, P.A., #16 BK #688 Declaration re:Amended Disclosure of Connections, #17 BK #688-1 Certificate of Service, #18 BK #714 Motion to Compel, #19 BK #717 Opposition related to BK#714, #20 BK #718 Opposition related to BK#714, #21 BK #718-1 Proposed Order, #22 BK #720 Order Denying Motion to Compel, #23 BK #757 Motion to Approve Stipulation/Settlement, #24 BK #757-1 Notice of Motion, #25 BK #757-2 Exhibit to Notice of Proposed Compromise, #26 BK #757-3 Proposed Order, #27 BK #757-4 Certificate of Service, #28 BK #757-5 Mailing Matrix, #29 BK #757-6 Certificate of Service, #30 BK #778 Objection related to BK#757, #31 BK #778-1 Exhibit, #32 BK #829 Notice of Hearing, #33 BK #831 Motion to Cancel Hearing, #34 BK #831-1 Exhibit A, #35 BK #831-2 Exhibit B, #36 BK #831-3 Exhibit C, #37 BK #831-4 Exhibit D, #38 BK #833 Order Denying Motion to Cancel Hearing, #39 BK #836 Hearing Held, #40 BK #837 Order Approving Compromise and Settlement, #41 BK #839 Motion to Reconsider Order Approving Compromise, #42 BK #845 Opposition Related to BK#839, #43 BK #845-1 Proposed Order, #44 BK #862 Order Denying Motion to Reconsider, #45 BK #864 Notice of Appeal, #46 BK #864-1 Exhibit A, #47 Docket Sheet, #48 Transmittal Sheet)(dg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Filing by Gregory B. Myers (Attachments: #1 Attachment, #2 Exhibit A)(dg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) LETTER ORDER striking #4 Designation of Record from Bankruptcy Court filed by Gregory B. Myers. Signed by Judge Paula Xinis on 2/6/2020. (c/m 2/6/2020 - dg3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) (STRICKEN) APPELLANT'S DESIGNATION of Record on Appeal from U.S. Bankruptcy Court by Gregory B. Myers re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Transmittal Sheet)(kns, Deputy Clerk) Modified on 2/6/2020 (dg3s, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Frank J Mastro on behalf of Roger Schlossberg (Mastro, Frank) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Bankruptcy Notification Letter sent to parties. (kns, Deputy Clerk)(c/m 1/2/20) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT (Greenbelt). Bankruptcy Court case number 15-26033 LSS, filed by Gregory B. Myers. (Attachments: #1 BK #837 Order Approving Compromise and Settlement, #2 BK #862 Order Denying Motion to Reconsider, #3 Docket Sheet, #4 Transmittal Sheet)(kns, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.