Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 02/18/2020 at 07:36:04 (UTC).

Myers v. Koppers Recovery Resources LLC et al

Case Summary

On 12/20/2019 Myers filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Koppers Recovery Resources LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian S. Miller. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-00923

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Arkansas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian S. Miller

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dustin Myers

Defendants

Koppers Inc

Koppers Recovery Resources LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joshua Sanford

Attorney at Sanford Law Firm

One Financial Center, 650 South Shackleford, Suite 411

Little Rock, AR 72211

Tess Elizabeth Bradford

Attorney at Sanford Law Firm

One Financial Center, 650 South Shackleford, Suite 411

Little Rock, AR 72211

Defendant Attorneys

Joseph R. Falasco

Attorney at Quattlebaum, Grooms & Tull PLLC

111 Center Street, Suite 1900

Little Rock, AR 72201-3325

E. B. Chiles, IV

Attorney at Quattlebaum, Grooms & Tull PLLC

111 Center Street, Suite 1900

Little Rock, AR 72201-3325

Sarah Katherine Calvert

Attorney at Quattlebaum, Grooms & Tull PLLC

111 Center Street, Suite 1900

Little Rock, AR 72201-3325

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 3/30/2020; Rule 26(f) Report due by 4/13/2020; Bench Trial set for sometime during the week of 2/22/2021 at 09:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 2D before Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the direction of the Court on 02/03/2020. (rmg) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

#10

(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Koppers Inc, Koppers Recovery Resources LLC (Calvert, Sarah) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#9

(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Koppers Recovery Resources LLC.(Calvert, Sarah) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Koppers Inc.(Calvert, Sarah) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph R. Falasco on behalf of Koppers Inc, Koppers Recovery Resources LLC (Falasco, Joseph) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by E. B. Chiles, IV on behalf of Koppers Inc, Koppers Recovery Resources LLC (Chiles, E.) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#4

(#4) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Koppers Inc, Koppers Recovery Resources LLC (Calvert, Sarah) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Katherine Calvert on behalf of Koppers Inc, Koppers Recovery Resources LLC (Calvert, Sarah) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

#2

(#2) CONSENT To Join Collective Action as to Dustin Myers. (jbh) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) ORIGINAL COMPLAINT - COLLECTIVE ACTION against All Defendants, filed by Dustin Myers. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT075297.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(f) Conference to occur by 3/30/2020; Rule 26(f) Report due by 4/13/2020; Bench Trial set for sometime during the week of 2/22/2021 at 09:30 AM in Little Rock Courtroom # 2D before Judge Brian S. Miller. Signed at the direction of the Court on 02/03/2020. (rmg) (Entered: 02/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by Koppers Inc, Koppers Recovery Resources LLC (Calvert, Sarah) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Koppers Recovery Resources LLC.(Calvert, Sarah) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Koppers Inc.(Calvert, Sarah) (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Answers due 01/27/2020. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 01/13/2020. (rmg) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph R. Falasco on behalf of Koppers Inc, Koppers Recovery Resources LLC (Falasco, Joseph) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by E. B. Chiles, IV on behalf of Koppers Inc, Koppers Recovery Resources LLC (Chiles, E.) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Koppers Inc, Koppers Recovery Resources LLC (Calvert, Sarah) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah Katherine Calvert on behalf of Koppers Inc, Koppers Recovery Resources LLC (Calvert, Sarah) (Entered: 01/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CONSENT To Join Collective Action as to Dustin Myers. (jbh) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ORIGINAL COMPLAINT - COLLECTIVE ACTION against All Defendants, filed by Dustin Myers. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $400 paid. Receipt Number LIT075297.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Beazer East, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer E. B. Chiles, IV