This case was last updated from PACER on 10/06/2020 at 08:25:17 (UTC).

Myers Team Management v. Brown

Case Summary

On 08/07/2020 Myers Team Management filed a Property - Other Eviction lawsuit against Brown. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Steven D. Grimberg and Linda T. Walker. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03282

  • Filing Date:

    08/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Eviction

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Steven D. Grimberg

Referral Judge

Linda T. Walker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Myers Team Management

2130 Hwy 81 S.

Loganville, GA 30052

Defendant

LaAreon Brown

Covington, GA 30014

 

Court Documents

#9

(#9) Letter to Magistrate Court of Newton County, Geoergia with #8 Order on Final Report and Recommendation remanding case back. (bdb) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER adopting #4 Final Report and Recommendation and that this action is REMANDED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c) to the Magistrate Court of Newton County, Georgia. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 9/8/2020. (bdb) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

#7

(#7) SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ddm) (ADI) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

#6

(#6) STANDING ORDER Regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on August 12, 2020. (ash) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

#5

(#5) ORDER for Service of #4 Final Report and Recommendation by Judge Steven D. Grimberg. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 8/11/2020. (bdb) Modified on 8/12/2020 to correct judge (bdb). (Entered: 08/11/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER granting ifp and FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #3 Notice of Removal filed by LaAreon Brown RECOMMENDING that this action be REMANDED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c) to the Magistrate Court of Newton County. As this is a final Report and Recommendation and there are no other matters pending before the Court, the Clerk is directed to terminate the reference to the undersigned. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 8/11/2020. (bdb) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

3 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#3

(#3) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by LaAreon Brown. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 08/11/2020)

#2

(#2) SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 8/3/20. (eop) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing re #8 Certified Copy of Order on Final Report and Recommendation and #9 Letter to Magistrate Court of Newton County, Georgia. (bdb) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Letter to Magistrate Court of Newton County, Geoergia with #8 Order on Final Report and Recommendation remanding case back. (bdb) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Terminated. (bdb) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to LaAreon Brown, Myers Team Management re #8 Order on Final Report and Recommendation. (bdb) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER adopting #4 Final Report and Recommendation and that this action is REMANDED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c) to the Magistrate Court of Newton County, Georgia. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on 9/8/2020. (bdb) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2020
  • DocketDocket reviewed by SDG. No conflict. (ash) (Entered: 09/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SEVENTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 9/1/2020. (ddm) (ADI) (Entered: 09/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #4 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #3 Notice of Removal, filed by LaAreon Brown, to District Judge Steven D. Grimberg. (bdb) (Entered: 08/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to LaAreon Brown, Myers Team Management re #6 Order. (bdb) (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) STANDING ORDER Regarding Civil Litigation. Signed by Judge Steven D. Grimberg on August 12, 2020. (ash) (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to LaAreon Brown, Myers Team Management re #5 Order for Service and #4 FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #3 Notice of Removal filed by LaAreon Brown. (bdb) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER for Service of #4 Final Report and Recommendation by Judge Steven D. Grimberg. Each party may file written objections to the Report & Recommendation within 14 days of service. If no objections are filed, the Report & Recommendation may be adopted as the opinion and order of the District Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 8/11/2020. (bdb) Modified on 8/12/2020 to correct judge (bdb). (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER granting ifp and FINAL REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #3 Notice of Removal filed by LaAreon Brown RECOMMENDING that this action be REMANDED pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c) to the Magistrate Court of Newton County. As this is a final Report and Recommendation and there are no other matters pending before the Court, the Clerk is directed to terminate the reference to the undersigned. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 8/11/2020. (bdb) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with COMPLAINT filed by LaAreon Brown. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(bdb) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2020
  • DocketORDER GRANTING In Forma Pauperis. Ruled on by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 8/11/2020 in R&R. (bdb) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSubmission of #1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, to Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker. (eop) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketClerk's Certificate of Mailing as to LaAreon Brown re #2 Order. (eop) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SIXTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 8/3/20. (eop) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by LaAreon Brown. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Removal, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less