This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/14/2021 at 07:25:03 (UTC).

Myer v. Vine Energy Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 09/15/2021 Myer filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Vine Energy Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Ronnie Abrams. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-07742

  • Filing Date:

    09/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Ronnie Abrams

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gaines Myer

Defendants

Vine Energy Inc.

Eric Marsh

Angelo Acconcia

H. Paulett Eberhart

David Foley

John H. Lee

Charles M. Sledge

Vine Energy Holdings LLC

Hannibal Merger Sub, Inc.

Hannibal Merger Sub, LLC

Chesapeake Energy Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Evan J. Smith

Attorney at Brodsky & Smith, L.L.C.

240 Mineola Blvd.

Mineola, NY 11501

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#3

4 #4

Main Document

4 #1

Supplement 2nd Summons Form

#5

(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to VINE ENERGY INC., VINE ENERGY HOLDINGS LLC, ERIC MARSH, ANGELO ACCONCIA, H. PAULETT EBERHART, DAVID FOLEY, JOHN H. LEE, and CHARLES M. SLEDGE, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Gaines Myer..(Smith, Evan) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

#6

(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CHESAPEAKE ENERGY CORPORATION, HANNIBAL MERGER SUB, INC., and HANNIBAL MERGER SUB, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Gaines Myer..(Smith, Evan) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

#7

(#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Angelo Acconcia, H. Paulett Eberhart, David Foley, John H. Lee, Eric Marsh, Charles M. Sledge, Vine Energy Holdings LLC, Vine Energy Inc.. (sj) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

#8

(#8) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chesapeake Energy Corporation, Hannibal Merger Sub, Inc., Hannibal Merger Sub, LLC. (sj) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

#9

(#9) ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference by telephone set for 12/17/2021 at 10:15 AM before Judge Ronnie Abrams. The parties shall use the dial-in information provided below to call into the conference: Call-in Number: (888) 363-4749; Access Code: 1015508. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 9/20/2021) (vfr) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

#10

(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Angelo Acconcia waiver sent on 9/22/2021, answer due 11/22/2021; H. Paulett Eberhart waiver sent on 9/22/2021, answer due 11/22/2021; David Foley waiver sent on 9/22/2021, answer due 11/22/2021; John H. Lee waiver sent on 9/22/2021, answer due 11/22/2021; Eric Marsh waiver sent on 9/22/2021, answer due 11/22/2021; Charles M. Sledge waiver sent on 9/22/2021, answer due 11/22/2021; Vine Energy Holdings LLC waiver sent on 9/22/2021, answer due 11/22/2021; Vine Energy Inc. waiver sent on 9/22/2021, answer due 11/22/2021. Document filed by Gaines Myer..(Smith, Evan) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Angelo Acconcia waiver sent on 9/22/2021, answer due 11/22/2021; H. Paulett Eberhart waiver sent on 9/22/2021, answer due 11/22/2021; David Foley waiver sent on 9/22/2021, answer due 11/22/2021; John H. Lee waiver sent on 9/22/2021, answer due 11/22/2021; Eric Marsh waiver sent on 9/22/2021, answer due 11/22/2021; Charles M. Sledge waiver sent on 9/22/2021, answer due 11/22/2021; Vine Energy Holdings LLC waiver sent on 9/22/2021, answer due 11/22/2021; Vine Energy Inc. waiver sent on 9/22/2021, answer due 11/22/2021. Document filed by Gaines Myer..(Smith, Evan) (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference by telephone set for 12/17/2021 at 10:15 AM before Judge Ronnie Abrams. The parties shall use the dial-in information provided below to call into the conference: Call-in Number: (888) 363-4749; Access Code: 1015508. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 9/20/2021) (vfr) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Chesapeake Energy Corporation, Hannibal Merger Sub, Inc., Hannibal Merger Sub, LLC. (sj) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Angelo Acconcia, H. Paulett Eberhart, David Foley, John H. Lee, Eric Marsh, Charles M. Sledge, Vine Energy Holdings LLC, Vine Energy Inc.. (sj) (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CHESAPEAKE ENERGY CORPORATION, HANNIBAL MERGER SUB, INC., and HANNIBAL MERGER SUB, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Gaines Myer..(Smith, Evan) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to VINE ENERGY INC., VINE ENERGY HOLDINGS LLC, ERIC MARSH, ANGELO ACCONCIA, H. PAULETT EBERHART, DAVID FOLEY, JOHN H. LEE, and CHARLES M. SLEDGE, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Gaines Myer..(Smith, Evan) (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Evan J. Smith to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Create one summons form and list all defendant names and addresses on a rider or file each summons separately, not as an attachment. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (pc) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(pc) (Entered: 09/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to VINE ENERGY INC., ERIC MARSH, ANGELO ACCONCIA, H. PAULETT EBERHART, DAVID FOLEY, JOHN H. LEE, CHARLES M. SLEDGE, VINE ENERGY HOLDINGS LLC, HANNIBAL MERGER SUB, INC., HANNIBAL MERGER SUB, LLC, and CHESAPEAKE ENERGY CORPORATION, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Gaines Myer. (Attachments: #1 Supplement 2nd Summons Form).(Smith, Evan) Modified on 9/16/2021 (pc). (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Gaines Myer..(Smith, Evan) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Smith, Evan) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Angelo Acconcia, Chesapeake Energy Corporation, H. Paulett Eberhart, David Foley, Hannibal Merger Sub, Inc., Hannibal Merger Sub, LLC, John H. Lee, Eric Marsh, Charles M. Sledge, Vine Energy Holdings LLC, Vine Energy Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25067336)Document filed by Gaines Myer..(Smith, Evan) (Entered: 09/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Chesapeake Energy Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Evan Jason Smith