This case was last updated from PACER on 04/22/2019 at 07:22:53 (UTC).

MUTHANA v. POMPEO et al

Case Summary

On 02/21/2019 MUTHANA filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against POMPEO. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Reggie B. Walton. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-00445

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Reggie B. Walton

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Not Classified By Court

AHMED ALI MUTHANA

Defendants

MICHAEL POMPEO

WILLIAM PELHAM BARR

DONALD J. TRUMP

Not Classified By Court

Secretary of State MICHAEL R. POMPEO

AHMED ALI MUTHANA

Attorney General WILLIAM P. BARR

President of US DONALD J. TRUMP

Amicus Curiae

CENTER FOR CONSTITUTIONAL JURISPRUDENCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Not Classified By Court Attorneys

Christina A. Jump

Attorney at CONSTITUTIONAL LAW CENTER FOR MUSLIMS IN AMERICA

833 - E. Arapaho Rd., Suite 102

Richardson, TX 75081

Charles Davidson Swift

Attorney at CONSTITUTIONAL LAW CENTER FOR MUSLIMS IN AMERICA

833 - E. Arapaho Rd., Suite 102

Richardson, TX 75081

Defendant Attorneys

Joseph F. Carilli, Jr.

Attorney at U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

P.O. Box 868, Ben Franklin Station

Washington, DC 20044

Scott Grant Stewart

Attorney at U.S. DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

950 Pennsylvania Avenue, Nw

Washington, DC 20530

Amicus Curiae Attorneys

John C. Eastman

Attorney at CENTER FOR CONSTITUTIONAL JURISPRUDENCE

One University Drive

Orange, CA 92866

Julie B. Axelrod

Attorney at CENTER FOR IMMIGRATION STUDIES

1629 K Street, Nw, Suite 600

Washington, DC 20006

 

Court Documents

#18

(#18) ORDER. In accordance with the attached Order, it is hereby ORDERED that the plaintiff's request for expedited consideration of this case raised in the plaintiff's #1 Expedited Complaint for Declaratory Judgment, Injunctive Relief and Petition for Writ of Mandamus is DENIED. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on March 11, 2019. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

#17

RESTRICTED

#16

(#16) AMICUS BRIEF by CENTER FOR CONSTITUTIONAL JURISPRUDENCE. (ztd) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

#13

(#13) MOTION for Leave to Appear by Telephone Request to Appear Telephonically by Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence (Axelrod, Julie) Modified on 3/14/2019 (znmw). (Entered: 03/03/2019)

12 #2

Text of Proposed Order

#12

MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered the Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence's #12 Motion for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under this Court's rules, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that John C. Eastman, Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence, Chapman University Fowler School of Law, One University Drive, Orange, CA 92866, is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on March 4, 2019. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

11 #2

Text of Proposed Order

11 #1

Exhibit A- Proposed Amicus Brief

#11

MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence's #11 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief and Proposed Brief of Amicus Curiae Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the Brief of Amicus Curiae Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence in Support of Defendants/Respondents, ECF No. 11-1, is ACCEPTED AS FILED, and the Clerk of the Court shall file it as a separate entry on the docket. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on March 4, 2019. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

1 #8

Exhibit Letter from U.S. Attorney ND AL

1 #7

Exhibit Letter from Charles D. Swift

1 #6

Exhibit Department of State Letter

1 #5

Exhibit United States Mission to United Nations Letter

1 #4

Exhibit Birth Certificate

1 #3

Affidavit Exhibit A to Complaint

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#15) SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re #1 Complaint,, filed by AHMED ALI MUTHANA. (ztd) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER. In accordance with the attached Order, it is hereby ORDERED that the plaintiff's request for expedited consideration of this case raised in the plaintiff's #1 Expedited Complaint for Declaratory Judgment, Injunctive Relief and Petition for Writ of Mandamus is DENIED. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on March 11, 2019. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 03/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) TRANSCRIPT OF MOTIONS HEARING before Judge Reggie B. Walton held on March 4, 2019. Page Numbers: 1 - 46. Date of Issuance: March 4, 2019. Court Reporter: Jeff Hook. Telephone number: 202-354-3373. Transcripts may be ordered by submitting the #Transcript Order FormFor the first 90 days after this filing date, the transcript may be viewed at the courthouse at a public terminal or purchased from the court reporter referenced above. After 90 days, the transcript may be accessed via PACER. Other transcript formats, (multi-page, condensed, CD or ASCII) may be purchased from the court reporter.NOTICE RE REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: The parties have twenty-one days to file with the court and the court reporter any request to redact personal identifiers from this transcript. If no such requests are filed, the transcript will be made available to the public via PACER without redaction after 90 days. The policy, which includes the five personal identifiers specifically covered, is located on our website at www.dcd.uscourts.gov. Redaction Request due 3/25/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/4/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/2/2019.(Hook, Jeff) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Minute Entry; for proceedings held before Judge Reggie B. Walton: Oral Argument held on 3/4/2019. Plaintiff's #2 Motion for Expedited Consideration; heard and denied. (Court Reporter Jeff Hook) (hs) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) AMICUS BRIEF by CENTER FOR CONSTITUTIONAL JURISPRUDENCE. (ztd) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence's #11 Motion for Leave to File Amicus Curiae Brief and Proposed Brief of Amicus Curiae Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the Brief of Amicus Curiae Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence in Support of Defendants/Respondents, ECF No. 11-1, is ACCEPTED AS FILED, and the Clerk of the Court shall file it as a separate entry on the docket. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on March 4, 2019. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence's #13 Request to Appear Telephonically, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the request is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that John Eastman may appear telephonically at the hearing scheduled for March 4, 2019. The Clerk of the Court shall provide Dr. Eastman with instructions for his telephonic appearance. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on March 4, 2019. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTE ORDER. The Court having considered the Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence's #12 Motion for Admission of Attorney Pro Hac Vice, and it appearing to the Court that the attorney referenced therein meets the requirements for pro hac vice admission under this Court's rules, it is hereby ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that John C. Eastman, Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence, Chapman University Fowler School of Law, One University Drive, Orange, CA 92866, is ADMITTED to practice before the Court pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on March 4, 2019. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) RESPONSE TO ORDER OF THE COURT re Order on Motion for Leave to File,, filed by WILLIAM PELHAM BARR, MICHAEL POMPEO, DONALD J. TRUMP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Carilli, Joseph) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MOTION for Leave to Appear by Telephone Request to Appear Telephonically by Center for Constitutional Jurisprudence (Axelrod, Julie) Modified on 3/14/2019 (znmw). (Entered: 03/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM to re #1 Complaint,, filed by AHMED ALI MUTHANA. (ztd) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Davidson Swift on behalf of AHMED ALI MUTHANA (Swift, Charles) (Entered: 02/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) GENERAL ORDER FOR CIVIL CASES BEFORE THE HONORABLE REGGIE B. WALTON. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on February 26, 2019. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the #2 Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Hearing, and for good cause shown, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties shall appear before the Court for a hearing on the plaintiff's Expedited Complaint for Declaratory Judgment, Injunctive Relief and Petition for Writ of Mandamus on March 4, 2019, at 11:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Reggie B. Walton on February 26, 2019. (lcrbw2) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 02/25/2019., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/25/2019. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/26/2019.), RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. WILLIAM PELHAM BARR served on 2/25/2019; MICHAEL POMPEO served on 2/25/2019; DONALD J. TRUMP served on 2/25/2019 (Jump, Christina) (Entered: 02/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) SUMMONS (5) Issued Electronically as to WILLIAM PELHAM BARR, MICHAEL POMPEO, DONALD J. TRUMP, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent)(zef, ) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ERRATA Correcting Page 1 of Complaint and Requests for Summons by AHMED ALI MUTHANA #1 Complaint,, filed by AHMED ALI MUTHANA. (Attachments: #1 Errata Revised Page One of Complaint, #2 Errata Summons)(Jump, Christina) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • SUMMONS Not Issued as to WILLIAM PELHAM BARR, MICHAEL POMPEO, DONALD J. TRUMP (zef, ) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • Case Assigned to Judge Reggie B. Walton. (zef, ) (Entered: 02/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Emergency MOTION to Expedite by AHMED ALI MUTHANA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jump, Christina) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT Seeking Expedited Relief against WILLIAM P. BARR, MICHAEL R. POMPEO, DONALD J. TRUMP ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0090-5959743) filed by AHMED ALI MUTHANA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Affidavit Exhibit A to Complaint, #4 Exhibit Birth Certificate, #5 Exhibit United States Mission to United Nations Letter, #6 Exhibit Department of State Letter, #7 Exhibit Letter from Charles D. Swift, #8 Exhibit Letter from U.S. Attorney ND AL)(Jump, Christina) (Entered: 02/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less