This case was last updated from PACER on 02/07/2020 at 07:41:14 (UTC).

Mustin et al v. Polaris Industries Inc et al

Case Summary

On 12/09/2019 Mustin filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Polaris Industries Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alabama Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Madeline Hughes Haikala. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-01982

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Madeline Hughes Haikala

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Shaquawn Mustin

Sheleah McDonald

Defendants

James McKinley, Jr

Polaris Industries Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Samuel Maples

Attorney at MAPLES, TUCKER AND JACOBS LLC

2001 Park Place North, Ste. 501, Suite 501

Birmingham, AL 35203

Joseph T Walker

Attorney at MAPLES, TUCKER & JACOBS, LLC

2001 Park Place North, Ste. 501

Birmingham, AL 35203

Defendant Attorneys

Michael C Guarino

Attorney at CARR ALLISON

100 Vestavia Pkwy

Birmingham, AL 35216

R Brett Adair

Attorney at CARR ALLISON

100 Vestavia Parkway

Birmingham, AL 25216

Joseph N Gross

Attorney at Benesch, Friedlander, Coplan & Aronoff, LLP

200 Public Square, Suite 2300

Cleveland, OH 44114

Joseph R Blalock

Attorney at Benesch, Friedlander, Coplan & Aronoff, LLP

44 15Th Street, Suite 2

Wheeling, WV 26003

 

Court Documents

15 #2

Exhibit B

15 #1

Exhibit A

#15

(#15) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Shaquawn Mustin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Maples, Samuel) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

#14

(#14) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Adair, R) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

#12

(#12) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time by James McKinley, Jr, Polaris Industries Inc. (Adair, R) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

10 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C

10 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

10 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#10

(#10) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by James McKinley, Jr, Polaris Industries Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Adair, R) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

9 #3

Exhibit Exhibit C

9 #2

Exhibit Exhibit B

9 #1

Exhibit Exhibit A

#9

(#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by James McKinley, Jr, Polaris Industries Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Adair, R) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#8

(#8) ORDER re #7 - Accordingly, the Court denies the plaintiffs' motion to remand. Of course, the Court has a continuing obligation to examine its subject matter jurisdiction. If, through discovery, the plaintiffs identify a non-diverse party who is a named defendant or may be named as a defendant through joinder, the plaintiffs may renew their motion to remand. The Court directs the parties to please confer and file a Rule 26(f) report within 14 days. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 1/7/2020. (KEK) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#7

(#7) Opposition to re #1 filed by Sheleah McDonald, Shaquawn Mustin. (Maples, Samuel) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by James McKinley, Jr, Polaris Industries Inc.(Guarino, Michael) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Polaris Industries Inc, James McKinley, Jr from Circuit Court of Limestone County, Alabama, case number 44-cv-2019-900401, filed by Polaris Industries Inc, James McKinley, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(KEK) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) TEXT ORDER: The plaintiffs have filed a renewed motion to remand. (Doc. #15 ). The plaintiffs assert that they have identified a non-diverse party, Josh LaRue, who they intend to join as a party defendant in substitution of a previously named fictitious defendant(s), more specifically described as Fictitious Defendants No. 5, 6, 7, 8, 11, 12, and 13 in the pending suit. (Doc. #15 , p. 4, 7). The plaintiffs ask this Court to remand this action to the Circuit Court of Limestone County, Alabama so that the plaintiffs may amend their complaint to add[] LaRue as a defendant. (Doc. #15 , p. 4, 7). On or before February 19, 2020, Polaris Industries may file a response to the plaintiffs renewed motion to remand. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 02/04/2020. (ZTC) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Shaquawn Mustin. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Maples, Samuel) (Entered: 02/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Adair, R) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) TEXT ORDER: The Court grants the parties' joint motion for extension of time. (Doc. #12 ). The parties shall file their planning meeting report on or before January 31, 2020. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 1/27/2020. (YMB) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Joint MOTION for Extension of Time by James McKinley, Jr, Polaris Industries Inc. (Adair, R) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) TEXT ORDER: The Court grants Attorney Brett Adair's motions to admit Joseph N. Gross and Joseph R. Blalock pro hac vice in this action. (Docs. #9 , #10 ). Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 1/22/2020. (YMB) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketPHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3519969 (ALND B4601103516). (Adair, R) Modified on 1/23/2020 (KEK). (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • DocketPHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3519964 (ALND B4601103515). (Adair, R) Modified on 1/23/2020 (KEK). (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by James McKinley, Jr, Polaris Industries Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Adair, R) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by James McKinley, Jr, Polaris Industries Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Adair, R) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER re #7 - Accordingly, the Court denies the plaintiffs' motion to remand. Of course, the Court has a continuing obligation to examine its subject matter jurisdiction. If, through discovery, the plaintiffs identify a non-diverse party who is a named defendant or may be named as a defendant through joinder, the plaintiffs may renew their motion to remand. The Court directs the parties to please confer and file a Rule 26(f) report within 14 days. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 1/7/2020. (KEK) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Opposition to re #1 filed by Sheleah McDonald, Shaquawn Mustin. (Maples, Samuel) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by James McKinley, Jr, Polaris Industries Inc.(Guarino, Michael) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFiling Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3504566 (ALND B4601102966) related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Polaris Industries Inc, James McKinley, Jr from Circuit Court of Limestone County, Alabama, case number 44-cv-2019-900401, filed by Polaris Industries Inc, James McKinley, Jr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(KEK). (Adair, R) Modified on 12/30/2019 (KEK). (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) TEXT ORDER: The Court grants defendants' unopposed motion for extension of time. (Doc. #4 ). Defendants James McKinley, Jr and Polaris Industries Inc shall respond to the Complaint on or before 12/30/2019. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 12/16/2019. (YMB) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by James McKinley, Jr, Polaris Industries Inc. (Adair, R) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by James McKinley, Jr, Polaris Industries Inc. filed by James McKinley, Jr, Polaris Industries Inc (Guarino, Michael) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) INITIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 12/11/2019. (KEK) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Polaris Industries Inc, James McKinley, Jr from Circuit Court of Limestone County, Alabama, case number 44-cv-2019-900401, filed by Polaris Industries Inc, James McKinley, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(KEK) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where POLARIS INDUSTRIES INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph N Gross

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael C Guarino

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph R. Blalock