This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/12/2020 at 12:41:11 (UTC).

Mustapick et al v. A. W. Chesterton, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 04/18/2019 Mustapick filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against A W Chesterton, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Joan M. Azrack and A. Kathleen Tomlinson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-02305

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Joan M. Azrack

Referral Judge

A. Kathleen Tomlinson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Irene Mustapick

Defendants

Goodyear Tire & Rubber Co.

Lear Siegler Diversified Holdings, Corp.

General Refractories Company

Viad Corporation

Hedman Resources Limited

John Crane, Inc.

Kelly-Moore Paint Company, Inc.

URS Corporation

Dana Companies, LLC.

Plastics Engineering Company

BW/IP, Inc.

Duro Dyne Corporation

Pfizer, Inc.

Vanderbilt Minerals, LLC

Industrial Holdings Corporation

DAP Products Inc

Corrigan Company Mechanical Contractors, Inc.

Dow Chemical Company

Vellumoid, Inc.

74 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jason Michael Hodrinsky

Attorney at Gori, Julian & Associates, P.C.

360 Lexington Avenue, 20Th Flr.

New York, NY 10017

Defendant Attorney

Suzanne M. Halbardier

Attorney at Barry McTiernan & Moore

2 Rector Street, 14Th Floor

New York, NY 10006

Other Attorneys

Thomas Philip Kurland

Attorney at Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler

1133 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10036

Lisa M. Pascarella

Attorney at Pascarella DiVita, PLLC

2137 Route 35, Suite 290

Holmdel, NJ 07733

 

Court Documents

#23

#22

#21

#20

19 #3

Exhibit Johnson & Johnson Responses to Interrogatories

19 #2

Exhibit Momorandum of Opinion

19 #1

Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand

#19

#18

#4

#3

#2

1 #5

Exhibit D, Electronic docket

1 #4

Exhibit C, Motion to Fix Venue for Claims

1 #3

Exhibit B, Responsive pleading

1 #2

Exhibit A, Complaint

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Trane US, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Ingersoll-Rand Plc (Ireland) for Trane US, Inc.. (Pascarella, Lisa) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa M. Pascarella on behalf of Trane US, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Pascarella, Lisa) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ingersoll-Rand Company identifying Corporate Parent Ingersoll-Rand Plc (Ireland) for Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Pascarella, Lisa) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa M. Pascarella on behalf of Ingersoll-Rand Company (aty to be noticed) (Pascarella, Lisa) (Entered: 05/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) First MOTION to Remand to State Court by Gerald Mustapick, Irene Mustapick. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit Momorandum of Opinion, #3 Exhibit Johnson & Johnson Responses to Interrogatories) (Hodrinsky, Jason) (Entered: 05/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne M. Halbardier on behalf of Warren Rupp, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Halbardier, Suzanne) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Warren Rupp, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Warren Rupp, Inc. is wholly-owned by IDEX Corporation. IDEX is a public company (NYSE:IEX). BlackRock Inc. ("BlackRock") currently owns approximately 10.4% of IDEX's outstanding for Warren Rupp, Inc.. (Halbardier, Suzanne) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Suzanne M. Halbardier on behalf of Arvinmeritor, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Halbardier, Suzanne) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Arvinmeritor, Inc. (Halbardier, Suzanne) (Entered: 05/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER re DE #13 : in light of the representations made in DE #13 , the Court is staying this case for a period of six months. Counsel are directed to provide the Court with a status report by November 3, 2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson on 5/3/2019. (Cento, Patrick) (Entered: 05/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 04/24/2019
  • DocketORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Joan M. Azrack for all further proceedings. Judge Denis R. Hurley no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 4/24/2019. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • DocketORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein recused. Case randomly reassigned to Judge Denis R. Hurley for all further proceedings.Ordered by Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein on 4/23/2019. (Morabito, Bryan) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Related Case indicated on the civil cover sheet in case number 19cv2305. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Sandra J. Feuerstein and Magistrate Judge A. Kathleen Tomlinson. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Rodin, Deanna) (Entered: 04/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/23/2019: #1 Additional Corrections) (Rodin, Deanna). (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Civil Cover Sheet.. Re Notice (Other), by Johnson & Johnson (Kurland, Thomas) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2019
  • DocketNOTICE - the Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed Civil Cover Sheet (MISSING SECOND PAGE FORM). Counsel is directed to forward a completed Civil Cover Sheet, answering all questions in *** NY-E DIVISION OF BUSINESS RULE 50.1(d)(2) and CERTIFICATION OF ARBITRATION ELIGIBILITY *** section on the second page. This document can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 04/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice of Removal and supporting documents served on Jason M. Hodrinksky, Esq. on 4/19/2019, filed by Johnson & Johnson. (Kurland, Thomas) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Johnson & Johnson from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Nassau, case number 604068/2018. (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYEDC-11401253) Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, Complaint, #3 Exhibit B, Responsive pleading, #4 Exhibit C, Motion to Fix Venue for Claims, #5 Exhibit D, Electronic docket) (Kurland, Thomas) Modified on 4/23/2019 (Rodin, Deanna). (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HEDMAN RESOURCES LIMITED is a litigant

Latest cases where General Refractories Company is a litigant

Latest cases where Vellumoid, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where LEAR SIEGLER INC. is a litigant