This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 08:21:36 (UTC).

Musaid v. State of New York

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 a Prisoner - Other Prisoner case was filed by Musaid against State of New York in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-07944

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Colleen McMahon

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Mohamed Musaid

Respondent

State of New York

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) CIVIL JUDGMENT. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the petition is denied without prejudice. Because the petition makes no substantial showing of a denial of a constitutional right, a certificate of appealability will not issue under 28 U.S.C. 2253. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from the Court's judgment would not be taken in good faith. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court mail a copy of this judgment to Petitioner and note service on the docket. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/10/2019) (rjm) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 10/10/2019)

#3

(#3) ORDER OF DISMISSAL. the petition is denied without prejudice. See 28 U.S.C. 1914, 1915. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Petitioner and note service on the docket. Because Petitioner has not at this time made a substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right, a certificate of appealability will not issue. See 28 U.S.C. 2253. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore IFP status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/10/2019) (rjm) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 10/10/2019)

2 #1

IFP application

#2

(#2) ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEE OR IFP APPLICATION: The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket, mail a copy of this Order to Petitioner, and note service on the docket. Petitioner is directed to render payment of the filing fee or submit an IFP application to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Filing Fee due by 9/25/2019. In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 9/25/2019. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 8/26/2019) (Attachments: #1 IFP application)(ees) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#1

(#1) PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254. Document filed by Mohamed Musaid.(rdz) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Mailed a copy of #3 Order of Dismissal, #4 Judgment - Sua Sponte (Petition), with Notice of Right to Appeal, to Mohamed Musaid 16-A-1673 Clinton C.F. P.O. Box 2001 Dannemora, NY 12929. (aea) (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CIVIL JUDGMENT. IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the petition is denied without prejudice. Because the petition makes no substantial showing of a denial of a constitutional right, a certificate of appealability will not issue under 28 U.S.C. 2253. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from the Court's judgment would not be taken in good faith. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court mail a copy of this judgment to Petitioner and note service on the docket. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/10/2019) (rjm) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ORDER OF DISMISSAL. the petition is denied without prejudice. See 28 U.S.C. 1914, 1915. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Petitioner and note service on the docket. Because Petitioner has not at this time made a substantial showing of the denial of a constitutional right, a certificate of appealability will not issue. See 28 U.S.C. 2253. The Court certifies under 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3) that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore IFP status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. Cf. Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962) (holding that an appellant demonstrates good faith when he seeks review of a nonfrivolous issue). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 10/10/2019) (rjm) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 10/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Mailed a copy of #2 Order Directing Payment of Fee or IFP Application, to Mohamed Musaid 16-A-1673 Clinton C.F. P.O. Box 2001 Dannemora, NY 12929. (aea) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT - SUA SPONTE to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (bcu) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) ORDER DIRECTING PAYMENT OF FEE OR IFP APPLICATION: The Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to my docket, mail a copy of this Order to Petitioner, and note service on the docket. Petitioner is directed to render payment of the filing fee or submit an IFP application to this Court's Pro Se Office within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order. The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this Order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). Filing Fee due by 9/25/2019. In Forma Pauperis (IFP) Application due by 9/25/2019. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 8/26/2019) (Attachments: #1 IFP application)(ees) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • Case Designated ECF. (rdz) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254. Document filed by Mohamed Musaid.(rdz) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.