This case was last updated from PACER on 07/11/2020 at 06:37:03 (UTC).

Murray v. Transportation Media, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/06/2019 Murray filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Transportation Media, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oregon District. The Judge overseeing this case is Jolie A. Russo. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-00180

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oregon District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jolie A. Russo

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Colin W. Murry

Defendants

Transportation Media, Inc.

Transportation Media, Inc. doing business as Bench Craft Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

W. John Gadd

Attorney at Law Office of W. John Gadd, P.A.

2727 Ulmerton Road, Bank Of America Building, Suite 250

Clearwater, FL 33762-3369

Bernard R. Mazaheri

Attorney at Mazaheri & Mazaheri Law Firm

325 Shelby Street

Frankfort, KY 40601

Defendant Attorneys

Anna Reinert

Attorney at Gordon & Rees LLP-Denver

555 17Th Street, Suite 3400

Denver, CO 80202

John D. Keen

Attorney at Gordon & Rees LLP-Denver

555 17Th Street, Suite 3400

Denver, CO 80202

Philip Timothy Barrett

Attorney at Gordon & Rees LLP-Denver

555 17Th Street, Suite 3400

Denver, CO 80202

Brian J. Kernan

Attorney at Gordon & Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP

121 Sw Morrision St, Suite 1575

Portland, OR 97204

Christopher E. Hawk

Attorney at Gordon & Rees Scully Mansukhani LLP

121 Sw Morrision St, Suite 1575

Portland, OR 97204

 

Court Documents

#43

(#43) ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of W. John Gadd for Colin W. Murry. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 82520 issued. Signed on 3/7/2019 by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (ecp) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

#41

(#41) ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Bernard R. Mazaheri for Colin W. Murry. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 82520 issued. Signed on 3/7/2019 by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (ecp) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

#35

(#35) Motion for Leave for Admission Pro Hac Vice Without Local Counsel. Filed by Colin W. Murry. (ecp) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by John D. Keen on behalf of Transportation Media, Inc.Attorney John D. Keen added to party Transportation Media, Inc.(pty:dft) (Keen, John) [Transferred from Colorado on 2/6/2019.] (Entered: 12/19/2018)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Anna Reinert on behalf of Transportation Media, Inc.Attorney Anna Reinert added to party Transportation Media, Inc.(pty:dft) (Reinert, Anna) [Transferred from Colorado on 2/6/2019.] (Entered: 12/19/2018)

6 #15

Ex. O - Sales Rep Ad - Tampa, FL

6 #14

Ex. N - Sales Rep Ad - Revlon, VA

6 #13

Ex. M - Sales Rep Ad - Portland, OR

6 #10

Ex. J - Sales Rep Ad - Omaha, NE

6 #3

Ex. C - Proposed Consent to Join Form

6 #2

Ex. B - Proposed Follow-Up Notice of Lawsuit

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Bernard R. Mazaheri on behalf of Colin W. MurryAttorney Bernard R. Mazaheri added to party Colin W. Murry(pty:pla) (Mazaheri, Bernard) [Transferred from Colorado on 2/6/2019.] (Entered: 11/30/2018)

#4

(#4) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 11/28/2018. Consent Form due by 1/17/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 1/31/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. (jgonz, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 2/6/2019.] (Entered: 11/28/2018)

3 #1

Magistrate Judge Consent Form

#3

(#3) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (dbera, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 2/6/2019.] (Entered: 11/28/2018)

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Transportation Media, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6413113)Attorney W. John Gadd added to party Colin W Murray(pty:pla), filed by Colin W Murray. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Gadd, W.) [Transferred from Colorado on 2/6/2019.] (Entered: 11/27/2018)

65 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/07/2019
  • Docket(#44) Notification of CM/ECF Account for W, John Gadd (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: wjgadd. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of W. John Gadd for Colin W. Murry. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 82520 issued. Signed on 3/7/2019 by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (ecp) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Docket(#42) Notification of CM/ECF Account for Bernard R. Mazaheri (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: brmazaheri. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#41) ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Bernard R. Mazaheri for Colin W. Murry. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 82520 issued. Signed on 3/7/2019 by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo. (ecp) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • Docket(#40) Clerk's Notice of Mailing to Plaintiff's Attorneys Bernard R. Mazaheri and W. John Gadd regarding Order 39 . (gm) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#39) ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Jolie A. Russo: Granting Attorneys Mazaheri and Gadd's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice without Local Counsel #35 . Attorneys Bernard R. Mazaheri and W. John Gadd may appear in this case pro hac vice without associating with local counsel. Counsel shall adhere to this court's Local Rules (see https://ord.uscourts.gov/index.php/rules-orders-and-notices/local-rules/civil-procedure) with regard to filing practices in this district. (gm) (Entered: 03/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) Reply Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' to Motion to Certify Class Conditionally Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. Sec. 216(b) #6 . Filed by Colin W. Murry. (ecp) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney W. John Gadd. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Receipt No.: 82520. Filed by Colin W. Murry. (ecp) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Bernard R. Mazaheri. Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Receipt No.: 82520. Filed by Colin W. Murry. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (ecp) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) Motion for Leave for Admission Pro Hac Vice Without Local Counsel. Filed by Colin W. Murry. (ecp) (Entered: 03/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(3) or, Alternatively, to Transfer Venue by Defendant Transportation Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Barrett, Philip) [Transferred from Colorado on 2/6/2019.] (Entered: 01/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Transportation Media, Inc.. Transportation Media, Inc. answer due 1/11/2019. (Keen, John) [Transferred from Colorado on 2/6/2019.] (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by John D. Keen on behalf of Transportation Media, Inc.Attorney John D. Keen added to party Transportation Media, Inc.(pty:dft) (Keen, John) [Transferred from Colorado on 2/6/2019.] (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Anna Reinert on behalf of Transportation Media, Inc.Attorney Anna Reinert added to party Transportation Media, Inc.(pty:dft) (Reinert, Anna) [Transferred from Colorado on 2/6/2019.] (Entered: 12/19/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) MOTION to Certify Class Conditionally Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. Sec. 216(b) by Plaintiff Colin W. Murry. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - Proposed Notice of Lawsuit, #2 Ex. B - Proposed Follow-Up Notice of Lawsuit, #3 Ex. C - Proposed Consent to Join Form, #4 Ex. D - Declaration of Colin Murray, #5 Ex. E - Sales Rep Ad - Arlington, TX, #6 Ex. F - Sales Rep Ad - Atlanta, GA, #7 Ex. G - Sales Rep Ad - Boston, MA, #8 Ex. H - Sales Rep Ad - Denver, CO, #9 Ex. I - Sales Rep Ad - Minneapolis, MN, #10 Ex. J - Sales Rep Ad - Omaha, NE, #11 Ex. K - Sales Rep Ad - Overland Park, KS, #12 Ex. L - Sales Rep Ad - Pittsburgh, PA, #13 Ex. M - Sales Rep Ad - Portland, OR, #14 Ex. N - Sales Rep Ad - Revlon, VA, #15 Ex. O - Sales Rep Ad - Tampa, FL, #16 Ex. P - Paychecks, #17 Ex. Q - Declaration of Hannah Bell, #18 Ex. R - Time Sheet)(Mazaheri, Bernard) [Transferred from Colorado on 2/6/2019.] (Entered: 12/18/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Bernard R. Mazaheri on behalf of Colin W. MurryAttorney Bernard R. Mazaheri added to party Colin W. Murry(pty:pla) (Mazaheri, Bernard) [Transferred from Colorado on 2/6/2019.] (Entered: 11/30/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 11/28/2018. Consent Form due by 1/17/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 1/31/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. (jgonz, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 2/6/2019.] (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/28/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (dbera, ) [Transferred from Colorado on 2/6/2019.] (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • (#2) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry (dbera, ) Modified to correct date on 11/28/2018 (dbera, ). [Transferred from Colorado on 2/6/2019.] (Entered: 11/28/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Transportation Media, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6413113)Attorney W. John Gadd added to party Colin W Murray(pty:pla), filed by Colin W Murray. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Gadd, W.) [Transferred from Colorado on 2/6/2019.] (Entered: 11/27/2018)

    Read MoreRead Less