This case was last updated from PACER on 08/30/2021 at 09:27:21 (UTC).

Murray v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration

Case Summary

On 07/01/2021 Murray filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner, Social Security Administration. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Colorado District. The Judge overseeing this case is Marcia S. Krieger. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-01803

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Courthouse:

    Colorado District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Marcia S. Krieger

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Marquetta C. Murray

Defendants

ANDREW M. SAUL

Commissioner, Social Security Administration

Interested Parties

Social Security Noticing

SSA Noticing

USAO-SS-Noticing

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Frederick W. Newall

Attorney at Frederick W. Newall, Attorney at Law

730 North Weber Street, Suite 101

Colorado Springs, CO 80903

Defendant Attorney

Danielle Alicia Pedderson

Attorney at Social Security Administration-OGC-Denver

1961 Stout Street, Suite 4169

Denver, CO 80294-4003

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 7/6/2021, re: #1 Complaint filed by Marquetta C. Murray. ORDERED as follows: that opening and response briefs shall be limited to no more than twenty (20) pages; and that reply briefs shall be limited to no more than ten (10) pages. (sphil, ) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

#7

(#7) ORDER Granting #2 the Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs, by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 7/6/2021.(sphil, ) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

#5

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint by Defendant Commissioner, Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Pedderson, Danielle) (Entered: 08/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 7/6/2021, re: #1 Complaint filed by Marquetta C. Murray. ORDERED as follows: that opening and response briefs shall be limited to no more than twenty (20) pages; and that reply briefs shall be limited to no more than ten (10) pages. (sphil, ) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER Granting #2 the Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs, by Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 7/6/2021.(sphil, ) (Entered: 07/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • Docket(#6) Utility Setting Deadlines: Commissioner, Social Security Administration answer due 8/30/2021. Text Only Entry (athom, ) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (jsalz, ) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • Docket(#4) Case assigned to Judge Marcia S. Krieger. Text Only Entry. (jsalz, ) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • Docket(#3) Administrative Notice: Social Security Case Service. Pursuant to the Letter of Agreement signed by the Clerk, U.S. District Court;U.S. Attorneys Office for the District of Colorado (USAO), and Social Security Administration (SSA), service of the initiating document(s) by the plaintiff to the SSA, the U.S. Attorney General, and USAO in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(i) is not necessary unless the court otherwise orders. A summons is not required and will not be issued. (Text Only Entry) (jsalz, ) (Entered: 07/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Plaintiff Marquetta C. Murray. (Newall, Frederick) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against ANDREW M. SAUL Attorney Frederick W. Newall added to party Marquetta C. Murray(pty:pla), filed by Marquetta C. Murray. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Decision, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Newall, Frederick) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Social Security Noticing is a litigant