This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/25/2023 at 08:23:19 (UTC).

Murray v. Samsung Electronics America, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/24/2023 Murray filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Samsung Electronics America, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New Jersey District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Christine P. O'Hearn and Elizabeth A. Pascal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-01088

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Christine P. O'Hearn

Referral Judge

Elizabeth A. Pascal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Liam Murray

Defendant

Samsung Electronics America Inc

In Re

SAMSUNG CUSTOMER DATA SECURITY BREACH LITIGATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paul C. Whalen

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27197677)Document filed by Liam Murray..(Whalen, Paul) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

#2

(#2) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Liam Murray.(Whalen, Paul) Modified on 1/13/2023 (sj). (Entered: 01/12/2023)

#3

(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Whalen, Paul) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

#4

(#4) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUEST- REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Liam Murray..(Whalen, Paul) Modified on 1/18/2023 (vf). (Entered: 01/18/2023)

#5

(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Liam Murray..(Whalen, Paul) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

#6

(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (vf) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Samsung Electronics America, Inc. waiver sent on 1/26/2023, answer due 3/27/2023. Document filed by Liam Murray..(Whalen, Paul) (Entered: 02/06/2023)

#8

(#8) CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - District of New Jersey. (Signed by MDL Panel on 2/10/2023) (vba) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

#9

(#9) Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:23-cv-00295. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 02/24/2023)

9 #1

*Restricted*

#10

(#10) Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (jab,N.M.) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketMember Case Transferred in on 2/24/2023 from the Southern District of New York 1:23-cv-00295 as DNJ Case 1:23-cv-1088 for MDL 3055 SAMSUNG CUSTOMER DATA BREACH LITIGATION. (jab,N.M.) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Clerk's Notice to Counsel. (jab,N.M.) (Entered: 02/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • DocketJudge Christine P. O'Hearn and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal added. (dmw) (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Certified Copy of Transfer Order and docket received, Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:23-cv-00295. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 02/24/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/15/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - District of New Jersey. (Signed by MDL Panel on 2/10/2023) (vba) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketMDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - District of New Jersey (vba) (Entered: 02/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Samsung Electronics America, Inc. waiver sent on 1/26/2023, answer due 3/27/2023. Document filed by Liam Murray..(Whalen, Paul) (Entered: 02/06/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (vf) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Liam Murray..(Whalen, Paul) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Paul C. Whalen to RE-FILE Document No. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Summons Caption Error. Plaintiff party name in summons caption does not correspond to pleading caption. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (vf) (Entered: 01/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT - SUMMONS REQUEST- REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Liam Murray..(Whalen, Paul) Modified on 1/18/2023 (vf). (Entered: 01/18/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Paul C. Whalen to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; the form used for the summons is not the official A.O. Standard Summons form dated 6/12. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (sj) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (sj) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Louis L. Stanton. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions..(sj) (Entered: 01/13/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Whalen, Paul) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Samsung Electronics America, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Liam Murray.(Whalen, Paul) Modified on 1/13/2023 (sj). (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Samsung Electronics America, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-27197677)Document filed by Liam Murray..(Whalen, Paul) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less