Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 02/02/2020 at 08:30:26 (UTC).

Murray et al v. Wheeler et al

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 Murray filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against Wheeler. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Therese Wiley Dancks and Lawrence E. Kahn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01498

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Therese Wiley Dancks

Presiding Judge

Lawrence E. Kahn

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

June Omura

William Murray

Defendants

U.S. Environmental Protection Agency

Andrew Wheeler

U.S. Army Corps of Engineers

R.D. James

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James Bryan Bacon, I

Attorney at James Bacon, Esq.

Po Box 575

New Paltz, NY 12561

Defendant Attorney

Erica Zilioli

Attorney at DOJ-Enrd

P.O. Box 7611

Washington, DC 20044

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) Consent Letter Motion from Erica Zilioli for R.D. James, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, Andrew Wheeler requesting Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and for Adjournment of Initial Telephone Conference submitted to Judge Dancks . (Zilioli, Erica) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Erica Zilioli on behalf of R.D. James, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, Andrew Wheeler (Zilioli, Erica) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

#5

(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service pursuant to Rule 4(i)(2) and Local Rule 4.1(C) served on Andrew Wheeler, US Environmental Protection Agency, R.D. James, U.S. Department of the Army, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorney's Office/Syracuse, NY on December 12, 2019, filed by William Murray. (Bacon, James) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#4

(#4) Letter Motion from James Bacon for William Murray requesting 1 week adjournment submitted to Judge Dancks . (Bacon, James) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#3

(#3) G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Telephone Conference set for 3/4/2020 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 2/26/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (pjh) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

2 #5

Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney General

2 #4

Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney's Office

2 #3

Summons Issued as to U.S. Army Corps of Engineers

2 #2

Summons Issued as to R.D. James

2 #1

Summons Issued as to U.S. Environmental Protection Agency

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Andrew Wheeler. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, #2 Summons Issued as to R.D. James, #3 Summons Issued as to U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, #4 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney's Office, #5 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney General)(pjh) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against R.D. James, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency and Andrew Wheeler (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4962323) filed by William Murray and June Omura. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjh) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2020
  • DocketTEXT NOTICE of Rescheduling of the Rule 16 Initial Conference: The Telephone Rule 16 Initial Conference has been RESCHEDULED for 3/26/2020 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the call as directed in General Order 25. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed NO LATER THAN 3/19/2020 and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 3/19/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (sg ) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) TEXT ORDER : Court has reviewed Plaintiff's #4 Letter Request to reschedule the Rule 16 Conference, and Defendants' #7 Letter Request for extension of time to respond to the complaint and reschedule the Rule 16 Conference, which are granted for the reasons stated therein. All Defendants' answer due 3/16/2020. The Rule 16 Conference and associated deadlines will be reset by separate text notice. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks on 1/29/2020. (sg ) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Consent Letter Motion from Erica Zilioli for R.D. James, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, Andrew Wheeler requesting Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and for Adjournment of Initial Telephone Conference submitted to Judge Dancks . (Zilioli, Erica) (Entered: 01/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Erica Zilioli on behalf of R.D. James, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, Andrew Wheeler (Zilioli, Erica) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AFFIDAVIT of Service pursuant to Rule 4(i)(2) and Local Rule 4.1(C) served on Andrew Wheeler, US Environmental Protection Agency, R.D. James, U.S. Department of the Army, U.S. Attorney General, U.S. Attorney's Office/Syracuse, NY on December 12, 2019, filed by William Murray. (Bacon, James) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Letter Motion from James Bacon for William Murray requesting 1 week adjournment submitted to Judge Dancks . (Bacon, James) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) G.O. 25 FILING ORDER ISSUED: Initial Telephone Conference set for 3/4/2020 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Therese Wiley Dancks. Civil Case Management Plan must be filed and Mandatory Disclosures are to be exchanged by the parties on or before 2/26/2020. (Pursuant to Local Rule 26.2, mandatory disclosures are to be exchanged among the parties but are NOT to be filed with the Court.) (pjh) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to Andrew Wheeler. (Attachments: #1 Summons Issued as to U.S. Environmental Protection Agency, #2 Summons Issued as to R.D. James, #3 Summons Issued as to U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, #4 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney's Office, #5 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney General)(pjh) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against R.D. James, U.S. Army Corps of Engineers, U.S. Environmental Protection Agency and Andrew Wheeler (Filing fee $400 receipt number ANYNDC-4962323) filed by William Murray and June Omura. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(pjh) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where U.S. Environmental Protection Agency is a litigant

Latest cases where U.S. Army Corps of Engineers is a litigant