This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/15/2020 at 07:57:23 (UTC).

Murray et al v. American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.

Case Summary

On 12/17/2019 Murray filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S I. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Noelle C. Collins. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-03281

  • Filing Date:

    12/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Missouri Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Noelle C. Collins

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Louis Murray

Colleen Murray

Defendant

American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Scott Hunziker

Attorney at ZERBE MILLER FINGERET

3009 Post Oak Blvd., Ste. 1700

Houston, TX 77056

Daniel W. Craig

Attorney at DONELON, P.C.

6614 Clayton Road, #320

St. Louis, MO 63117

Michael Kent Kovalsky

Attorney at ZENSTEIN KOVALSKY

1240 Old York Road, Suite 101

Warminster, PA 18974

Defendant Attorneys

Nicholas Anthony Cammarata

Attorney at ARMSTRONG TEASDALE LLP

7700 Forsyth Blvd., Suite 1800

St. Louis, MO 63105

Sean Patrick Dolan

Attorney at EVANS AND DIXON

211 N. Broadway, Suite 2500

St. Louis, MO 63102

Laurie Anne Loeschner

Attorney at EVANS AND DIXON

211 N. Broadway, Suite 2500

St. Louis, MO 63102

 

Court Documents

#25

(#25) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. (See Full Order.) This case is assigned to Track: 2 (Standard). Discovery Completion due by 9/30/2020. Non-Dispositive Motions due by 10/11/2020. ADR Future Reference 9/1/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 10/12/2020. Jury Trial set for 3/8/2021 09:30 AM in Courtroom 15N - St. Louis before Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins. Pretrial Conference set for 3/1/2021 10:00 AM in Courtroom 15N - St. Louis before Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins. Pretrial Compliance due by 2/16/2021. Motion in Limine due by 2/26/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 2/12/2020. (CBL) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

#24

(#24) ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY (no pdf attached) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins: Rule 16 Conference held on 2/12/2020. Conference held in person and by telephone. Schedule discussed. Case Management Order to issue. (proceedings started: 10:02 a.m.) (proceedings ended: 10:16 a.m.)(Appearance for Plaintiff: Daniel Craig and Michael Kovalsky by telephone)(Appearance for Defendant: Laurie Loeschner in person) (CBL) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

#23

(#23) ENTRY of Appearance by Laurie Anne Loeschner for Defendant American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.. (Loeschner, Laurie) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

#21

(#21) MOTION to Substitute Attorney/Law Firm ;attorney or firm Sean Dolan/Evans & Dixon, LLC ;substituted for:Nick Cammarata by Defendant American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.. (Dolan, Sean) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

#20

(#20) JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiffs Colleen Murray, Louis Murray. . (Kovalsky, Michael) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

#18

(#18) MOTION for Leave to Appear by Telephone by Plaintiffs Colleen Murray, Louis Murray. (Kovalsky, Michael) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

16 #1

Certificate of Good Standing

#16

(#16) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Michael K. Kovalsky. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7711598) by Plaintiffs Colleen Murray, Louis Murray. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Kovalsky, Michael) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#5

(#5) ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas Anthony Cammarata for Defendant American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.. (Cammarata, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

#4

(#4) ANSWER to Complaint by American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I..(Cammarata, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

#3

(#3) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I... (Cammarata, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. Sent To: Plaintiff (Cammarata, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

1 #5

Original Filing Form

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis County Circuit Court, case number 19SL-CC04773, with receipt number AMOEDC-7644453, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Original Filing Form)(Cammarata, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. (See Full Order.) This case is assigned to Track: 2 (Standard). Discovery Completion due by 9/30/2020. Non-Dispositive Motions due by 10/11/2020. ADR Future Reference 9/1/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 10/12/2020. Jury Trial set for 3/8/2021 09:30 AM in Courtroom 15N - St. Louis before Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins. Pretrial Conference set for 3/1/2021 10:00 AM in Courtroom 15N - St. Louis before Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins. Pretrial Compliance due by 2/16/2021. Motion in Limine due by 2/26/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 2/12/2020. (CBL) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY (no pdf attached) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins: Rule 16 Conference held on 2/12/2020. Conference held in person and by telephone. Schedule discussed. Case Management Order to issue. (proceedings started: 10:02 a.m.) (proceedings ended: 10:16 a.m.)(Appearance for Plaintiff: Daniel Craig and Michael Kovalsky by telephone)(Appearance for Defendant: Laurie Loeschner in person) (CBL) (Entered: 02/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ENTRY of Appearance by Laurie Anne Loeschner for Defendant American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.. (Loeschner, Laurie) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.'s Motion for Leave to Substitute Counsel (Doc. #21 ) is GRANTED. Attorney Sean P. Dolan is substituted as counsel for Defendant. Attorney Nicholas Anthony Cammarata is terminated as counsel for Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 2/10/2020. (KBL) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MOTION to Substitute Attorney/Law Firm ;attorney or firm Sean Dolan/Evans & Dixon, LLC ;substituted for:Nick Cammarata by Defendant American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.. (Dolan, Sean) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiffs Colleen Murray, Louis Murray. . (Kovalsky, Michael) (Entered: 02/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Motion to Appear by Telephone (Doc. #18 ) is GRANTED. Counsel participating in the Rule 16 Conference by telephone is directed to call the conference toll free at: 1-888-398-2342. The access code to enter the conference for all participants is: 2359637. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 1/31/2020. (KBL) (Entered: 01/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION for Leave to Appear by Telephone by Plaintiffs Colleen Murray, Louis Murray. (Kovalsky, Michael) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Verified Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Doc. #16 ) filed by Michael Kent Kovalsky, counsel for Plaintiffs, is GRANTED. Michael Kent Kovalsky is admitted for the purpose of representing Plaintiffs in this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 1/27/2020. (KBL) (Entered: 01/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Michael K. Kovalsky. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-7711598) by Plaintiffs Colleen Murray, Louis Murray. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Kovalsky, Michael) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 12/17/2019
  • Docket(#9) Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (CSAW) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • DocketCase Opening Notification: All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Judge Assigned: Honorable Noelle C. Collins. (MFG) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Letter to attorney Scott Hunziker from Clerk re: Admission To Practice Law (MFG) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) SUPPLEMENTAL State Court Docket Sheet. (MFG) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis County, filed by Colleen Murray, Louis Murray.(MFG) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas Anthony Cammarata for Defendant American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.. (Cammarata, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ANSWER to Complaint by American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I..(Cammarata, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I... (Cammarata, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. Sent To: Plaintiff (Cammarata, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis County Circuit Court, case number 19SL-CC04773, with receipt number AMOEDC-7644453, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Original Filing Form)(Cammarata, Nicholas) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniel William Craig

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL K. KOVALSKY

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Scott G Hunziker