Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from PACER on 05/03/2021 at 09:52:50 (UTC).

Murphy v. Toyota Motor Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 03/04/2021 Murphy filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability lawsuit against Toyota Motor Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Amos L. Mazzant, III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00178

  • Filing Date:

    03/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Amos L. Mazzant, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Juliet Murphy

Defendants

Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America Inc

Does 1-50 Inclusive

Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.

Toyota Motor North America Inc

Toyota Motor Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Steven A. Haskins

Attorney at McCune Wright Arevalo, LLP

3281 E. Guasti Rd., Suite 100

Ontario, CA 91761

Bruce William Steckler

Attorney at Steckler Wayne Cochran PLLC

12720 Hillcrest Road, Suite 1045

Dallas, TX 75230

Austin Paul Smith

Attorney at Steckler Wayne Cochran PLLC

12720 Hillcrest Road, Suite 1045

Dallas, TX 75230

Mark I. Richards

Attorney at McCune Wright Arevalo, LLP

3281 E. Guasti Rd., Suite 100

Ontario, CA 91761

Kimberly A. Justice

Attorney at Freed Kanner London & Millen LLC

923 Fayette Street

Conshohocken, PA 19428

Laura Kirstine Rogers

Attorney at Steckler Wayne Cochran PLLC

12720 Hillcrest Road, Suite 1045

Dallas, TX 75230

David C. Wright

Attorney at McCune Wright Arevalo, LLP

3281 E. Guasti Rd., Suite 100

Ontario, CA 91761

Paul Douglas Stickney

Attorney at Steckler Wayne Cochran PLLC

12720 Hillcrest Road, Suite 1045

Dallas, TX 75230

Richard D. McCune

Attorney at McCune Wright Arevalo, LLP

3281 E. Guasti Rd., Suite 100

Ontario, CA 91761

Christopher Chorba

Attorney at Gibson Dunn Crutcher LLP - Los Angeles

333 South Grand Ave, 47Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3197

Andrew Patrick LeGrand

Attorney at Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP - Dallas

2001 Ross Avenue, Suite 2100

Dallas, TX 75201

Ashbey N Morgan

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP

2001 Ross Avenue, Suite 2100, Dallas

Dallas, TX 75201

 

Court Documents

#17

(#17) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Kimberly A. Justice on behalf of All Defendants. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8368584. (Justice, Kimberly) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

#16

(#16) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Christopher Chorba on behalf of Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America Inc, Toyota Motor North America Inc, Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8331072. (Chorba, Christopher) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Steven A. Haskins on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8328376. (Haskins, Steven) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Mark I. Richards on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8328360. (Richards, Mark) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Richard D. McCune on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8328336. (McCune, Richard) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

#12

(#12) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint served on Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc. on 3/9/2021, filed by Juliet Murphy. (Wright, David) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

#11

(#11) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service of Complaint served on Toyota Motor North America, Inc. on 03/09/2021, filed by Juliet Murphy. (Wright, David) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

#10

No Description Available

#9

No Description Available

#8

(#8) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America Inc, Toyota Motor North America Inc, Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc..( LeGrand, Andrew) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Patrick LeGrand on behalf of Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America Inc, Toyota Motor North America Inc, Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. (LeGrand, Andrew) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by David C. Wright on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8303354. (Wright, David) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Issued as to Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.. (baf, ) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

#4

(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to Toyota Motor North America Inc. (baf, ) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Issued as to Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America Inc. (baf, ) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Issued as to Toyota Motor Corporation. (baf, ) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketDefendant's Unopposed SECOND Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Toyota Motor North America Inc to 5/14/2021; Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. to 5/14/2021; Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America Inc to 5/14/2021. 15 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( baf, ) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Defendants' Unopposed Second Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc., Toyota Motor North America, Inc, Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.( LeGrand, Andrew) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Kimberly A. Justice on behalf of All Defendants. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8368584. (Justice, Kimberly) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Christopher Chorba on behalf of Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America Inc, Toyota Motor North America Inc, Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8331072. (Chorba, Christopher) (Entered: 03/31/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Steven A. Haskins on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8328376. (Haskins, Steven) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Mark I. Richards on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8328360. (Richards, Mark) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Richard D. McCune on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8328336. (McCune, Richard) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketDefendant's Unopposed FIRST Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint is granted pursuant to Local Rule CV-12 for Toyota Motor North America Inc to 4/29/2021; Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. to 4/29/2021; Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America Inc to 4/29/2021. 30 Days Granted for Deadline Extension.( baf, ) (Entered: 03/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint served on Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America, Inc. on 3/9/2021, filed by Juliet Murphy. (Wright, David) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Affidavit of Service of Complaint served on Toyota Motor North America, Inc. on 03/09/2021, filed by Juliet Murphy. (Wright, David) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Defendant's Unopposed First Application for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint re Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America Inc, Toyota Motor North America Inc, Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc..( LeGrand, Andrew) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Patrick LeGrand on behalf of Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America Inc, Toyota Motor North America Inc, Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. (LeGrand, Andrew) (Entered: 03/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by David C. Wright on behalf of All Plaintiffs. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number 0540-8303354. (Wright, David) (Entered: 03/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Issued as to Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc.. (baf, ) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) SUMMONS Issued as to Toyota Motor North America Inc. (baf, ) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Issued as to Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America Inc. (baf, ) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Issued as to Toyota Motor Corporation. (baf, ) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (baf, ) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • DocketCase ASSIGNED to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (baf, ) (Entered: 03/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Does 1-50 Inclusive, Toyota Motor Corporation, Toyota Motor Engineering & Manufacturing North America Inc, Toyota Motor North America Inc, Toyota Motor Sales, U.S.A., Inc. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0540-8277855.), filed by Juliet Murphy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Steckler, Bruce) (Entered: 03/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TOYOTA MOTOR ENGINEERING & MANUFACTURING NORTH AMERICA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where TOYOTA MOTOR NORTH AMERICA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Toyota Motor Sales U S A Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where Toyota Motor Corporation is a litigant