This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/13/2022 at 08:50:14 (UTC).

Murphy v. Thompson

Case Summary

On 03/14/2022 Murphy filed a Prisoner - Other Prisoner lawsuit against Thompson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Matthew W. Brann and MP. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-00370

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Other Prisoner

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Matthew W. Brann

Referral Judge

MP

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Phillip Jerome Murphy

White Deer, PA 17887

Respondent

Warden R. Thompson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Joseph J Terz

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

228 Walnut St, Room 217, Federal Building

Harrisburg, PA 17108

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus lodged as no filing fee was paid and no Motion for In Forma Pauperis was filed, filed by Phillip Jerome Murphy.(lp) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

#2

(#2) MOTION Emergency Motion to Correct Sentence Under 28 USC 2241 by Phillip Jerome Murphy.(lp) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

#3

(#3) PRO SE LETTER ISSUED providing the case number and the AO 85 Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent) (lp) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

3 #1

Notice of Consent

#4

(#4) THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 03/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 IFP (habeas corpus))(lp) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

4 #1

IFP (habeas corpus)

#5

(#5) Mail Returned as Undeliverable - 3/14/2022 letter and order returned; docket sheet has incorrect inmate number listed; number updated and documents remailed from Wmspt this date. (lg) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

#6

(#6) Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number 333080771. Petition is now deemed FILED. (sm) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

#7

(#7) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that #1 Petition is deemed filed; Clerk directed to serve petition, emergency motion and this Order on Respondent and US Attorney; Show Cause Response due by 5/20/2021. Signed by Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann on 4/20/2022. (lg) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

#8

(#8) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #7 Order to Show Cause. (rw) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketSHOW CAUSE ORDER, H/C petition and emergency motion served on US Attorney HBG. (lg) (Entered: 04/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #7 Order to Show Cause. (rw) (Entered: 04/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that #1 Petition is deemed filed; Clerk directed to serve petition, emergency motion and this Order on Respondent and US Attorney; Show Cause Response due by 5/20/2021. Signed by Chief Judge Matthew W. Brann on 4/20/2022. (lg) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketReceipt of payment from PHILLIP MURPHY in the amount of $5.00 for WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. Transaction posted on 4/18/2022. Receipt number 333080771 processed by gangeli. (jjs) (Entered: 04/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number 333080771. Petition is now deemed FILED. (sm) (Entered: 04/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Mail Returned as Undeliverable - 3/14/2022 letter and order returned; docket sheet has incorrect inmate number listed; number updated and documents remailed from Wmspt this date. (lg) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) THIRTY (30) DAY ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER directing the prisoner to pay the filing fee or file a signed Application to Proceed IFP within 30 days or case will be dismissed. Signed by LP on 03/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 IFP (habeas corpus))(lp) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PRO SE LETTER ISSUED providing the case number and the AO 85 Notice & Consent Form. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent) (lp) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION Emergency Motion to Correct Sentence Under 28 USC 2241 by Phillip Jerome Murphy.(lp) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus lodged as no filing fee was paid and no Motion for In Forma Pauperis was filed, filed by Phillip Jerome Murphy.(lp) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joseph J Terz