This case was last updated from PACER on 07/09/2019 at 07:45:52 (UTC).

Murphy v. Ted's Montana Grill, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/10/2019 Murphy filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Ted's Montana Grill, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Montana District. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian Morris. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-00022

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Montana District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian Morris

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Ryan P. Murphy

Defendant

Ted's Montana Grill, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Paul Grigsby

Attorney at Grigsby Law PLLC

1700 West Koch Street, Suite 6

Bozeman, MT 59715

Defendant Attorneys

Leonard H. Smith

Attorney at CROWLEY FLECK, PLLP - BOZEMAN

1915 South 19Th Avenue, Po Box 10969

Bozeman, MT 59719-0969

John W Harkins, IV

Attorney at CROWLEY FLECK PLLP - BILLINGS

490 North 31St Street, Suite 500, Po Box 2529

Billings, MT 59103-2529

 

Court Documents

#5

(#5) Unopposed Stipulated Motion Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice Paul Grigsby appearing for Plaintiff Ryan P. Murphy (Grigsby, Paul) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

#4

(#4) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for July 11, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. at the Missoula River Federal Courthouse, Great Falls, MT. Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 7/3/2019. Joint Discovery Plan due by 7/3/2019. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 7/3/2019. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 5/30/2019. (NOS) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

#3

(#3) STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Ted's Montana Grill, Inc. filed by Ryan P. Murphy. (NOS) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

2 #1

Doc 2. - Notice of Filing Removal

#2

(#2) NOTICE of RECEIPT of STATE COURT FILE. Case original filed in Montana Eighteenth Judicial District Court, Gallatin County, Cause No. DV 18-1308B. (Attachments: #1 Doc 2. - Notice of Filing Removal) (Original filed held in Butte clerk's office.) (NOS) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit D-State Court Pleadings

1 #3

Exhibit C-Pl's Demand Letter

1 #2

Exhibit B-Business Information

1 #1

Exhibit A-Complaint

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ted's Montana Grill, Inc. from Montana Eighteenth Judicial District Court, case number DV 18-1308B., filed by Ted's Montana Grill, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Business Information, #3 Exhibit C-Pl's Demand Letter, #4 Exhibit D-State Court Pleadings, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (KJL) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/17/2019
  • NOTICE from the Clerk of Court's Office: On June 17, 2019, the parties filed a Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice (Doc. 5) signed by all parties who have appeared. Therefore, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), this case is dismissed in accordance with the filing of the Parties' Stipulation of Dismissal and without further order of the Court. (NOS) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Unopposed Stipulated Motion Stipulation of Dismissal Without Prejudice Paul Grigsby appearing for Plaintiff Ryan P. Murphy (Grigsby, Paul) (Entered: 06/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for July 11, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. at the Missoula River Federal Courthouse, Great Falls, MT. Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 7/3/2019. Joint Discovery Plan due by 7/3/2019. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 7/3/2019. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 5/30/2019. (NOS) (Entered: 05/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Ted's Montana Grill, Inc. filed by Ryan P. Murphy. (NOS) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE of RECEIPT of STATE COURT FILE. Case original filed in Montana Eighteenth Judicial District Court, Gallatin County, Cause No. DV 18-1308B. (Attachments: #1 Doc 2. - Notice of Filing Removal) (Original filed held in Butte clerk's office.) (NOS) (Entered: 05/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0977-2307859 (KJL) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ted's Montana Grill, Inc. from Montana Eighteenth Judicial District Court, case number DV 18-1308B., filed by Ted's Montana Grill, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Business Information, #3 Exhibit C-Pl's Demand Letter, #4 Exhibit D-State Court Pleadings, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (KJL) (Entered: 05/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less