This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/13/2021 at 07:02:36 (UTC).

Murphy v. KB Orthopedics, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/06/2021 Murphy filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against KB Orthopedics, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Montana District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are John Johnston and Brian Morris. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:21-CV-00049

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Referral Judge

John Johnston

Presiding Judge

Brian Morris

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Rosalie Murphy

Defendants

KB Orthopedics, Inc.

DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc.

Medical Device Business Services, Inc.

Johnson & Johnson

John Does 1-10

Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc.

Karl Buhr

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Maxon R. Davis

Attorney at DAVIS HATLEY HAFFEMAN & TIGHE

Po Box 2103, 101 River Drive North The Milwaukee Station

Great Falls, MT 59401-2103

Jory C. Ruggiero

Attorney at WESTERN JUSTICE ASSOCIATES

303 West Mendenhall, Suite 1

Bozeman, MT 59715

Maxwell E. Kirchhoff

Attorney at WESTERN JUSTICE ASSOCIATES

303 West Mendenhall, Suite 1

Bozeman, MT 59715

Michele Stephan

Attorney at MAGLIO CHRISTOPHER & TOALE, P.A.

1605 Main Street, Suite 710

Sarasota, FL 34236

Michael J. Cowgill

Attorney at MAGLIO CHRISTOPHER & TOALE, P.A.

1605 Main Street, Suite 710

Sarasota, FL 34236

Ilyas Sayeg

Attorney at MAGLIO CHRISTOPHER & TOALE, P.A.

1605 Main Street, Suite 710

Sarasota, FL 34236

 

Court Documents

#26

#25

#24

#23

#22

21 #1

Exhibit 1 - Notice of Hearing Session

#21

#20

#5

4 #3

Exhibit 3

#3

#2

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Exhibit 4 - State Ct Pleading

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - Buhr Declaration

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - Amended Complaint

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Original Complaint

#1

59 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketCase transferred to Northern District of Texas. Copy of transfer order sent. (SLR) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) CERTIFIED Transfer Order (MDL) requesting transfer of action. Entire case file sent to Northern District of Texas consisting of all electronic filings. (SLR) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Rosalie Murphy (Sayeg, Ilyas) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Rosalie Murphy (Cowgill, Michael) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by Rosalie Murphy (Stephan, Michele) (Entered: 07/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER REASSIGNING: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above-captioned cause is REASSIGNED to the Honorable Brian Morris for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 6/29/2021. (SLR) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE re #5 MOTION TO REMAND by Rosalie Murphy (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Ruggiero, Jory) Modified on 6/28/2021 to link to motion (ACC). (Entered: 06/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Remand filed by Rosalie Murphy. (Ruggiero, Jory) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketRemark: Counsel Ilyas Sayeg is now a registered CM/ECF electronic user. (ACC) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketRemark: Counsel Michele Stephan is now a registered CM/ECF electronic user. (ACC) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AMENDED COMPLAINT for Damages and Demand for Jury Trial (State Court) against All Defendants, filed by Rosalie Murphy. (ACC) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) COMPLAINT for Damages and Demand for Jury Trial (State Court) against All Defendants, filed by Rosalie Murphy. (ACC) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal, from Montana Eighth Judicial District Court, Cascade County, consisting of: (Attachments: #1 State Court Docket Sheet, #2 State Court Issued Summonses, #3 Unserved Summons - Karl Buhr, #4 Affidavit of Lost Summons for KB Orthopedics, #5 Declaration of Service - Karl Buhr served 3/26/21, #6 Declaration of Service - KB Orthopedics served on 3/26/21, #7 Summons - KB Orthopedics, #8 Summons return - Karl Buhr served 4/8/21, #9 Summon Return - Medical Device Business Srvc served 4/7/21, #10 Summons Return - Depuy Synthes Sales, Inc served 4/7/21, #11 Summons Return - Johnson & Johnson Srvc Inc served on 4/7/21, #12 Defendants' Motion to Extend Pleading Deadline, #13 Summons Return - Johnson & Johnson served on 4/27/21, #14 Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (ACC) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Brief/Memorandum in Support re #5 MOTION to Remand filed by Rosalie Murphy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Ruggiero, Jory) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION to Remand Jory C. Ruggiero appearing for Plaintiff Rosalie Murphy Motions referred to John Johnston. (Ruggiero, Jory) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RESPONSE to Motion re #2 MOTION to Stay filed by Rosalie Murphy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Ruggiero, Jory) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Brief/Memorandum in Support re #2 MOTION to Stay filed by DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., Medical Device Business Services, Inc.. (Davis, Maxon) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Stay Maxon R. Davis appearing for Defendants DePuy Synthes Sales, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Johnson & Johnson Services, Inc., Medical Device Business Services, Inc. Motions referred to John Johnston. (Davis, Maxon) (Entered: 05/07/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketFiling fee: $402, receipt number 0977-2660768 (TLO) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL by All Defendants from Montana 8th Judicial District Court, case number ADV 21-0157., filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Original Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Amended Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - Buhr Declaration, #4 Exhibit 4 - State Ct Pleading, #5 Civil Cover Sheet) (TLO) (Entered: 05/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEPUY SYNTHES PRODUCTS INC is a litigant

Latest cases where DePuy Orthopaedics Inc is a litigant