This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/06/2020 at 07:38:49 (UTC).

MURPHY v. CVS HEALTH CORPORATION et al

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 MURPHY filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against CVS HEALTH CORPORATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is J. Nicholas Ranjan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00015

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

J. Nicholas Ranjan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TRUDI L. MURPHY

Defendants

CVS HEALTH CORPORATION

PENNSYLVANIA CVS PHARMACY, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Colleen Ramage Johnston

Attorney at Johnston Lykos, LLC

525 William Penn Place, 28Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Defendant Attorney

Emilie R. Hammerstein

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

625 Liberty Avenue, 26Th Floor

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

 

Court Documents

#7

(#7) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/23/2020 at 1:00 PM in Courtroom 6C before Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan; Exchange of required Rule 26(a)(1) information due by 4/13/2020; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/13/2020; Stipulation Selecting ADR Process due by 4/13/2020. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 3/4/2020. (dny) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Emilie R. Hammerstein on behalf of CVS HEALTH CORPORATION, PENNSYLVANIA CVS PHARMACY, LLC. (Hammerstein, Emilie) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

#5

(#5) Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by PENNSYLVANIA CVS PHARMACY, LLC Answer due from PENNSYLVANIA CVS PHARMACY, LLC on 3/20/2020; CVS HEALTH CORPORATION on 3/20/2020. (Hammerstein, Emilie) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

#4

(#4) Disclosure Statement identifying CVS Health Corporation as corporate parent or other affiliate, by PENNSYLVANIA CVS PHARMACY, LLC. (Hammerstein, Emilie) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by TRUDI L. MURPHY. PENNSYLVANIA CVS PHARMACY, LLC waiver sent on 1/6/2020, answer due 3/6/2020. (Johnston, Colleen) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

#2

(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by TRUDI L. MURPHY. CVS HEALTH CORPORATION waiver sent on 1/6/2020, answer due 3/6/2020. (Johnston, Colleen) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against CVS HEALTH CORPORATION, PENNSYLVANIA CVS PHARMACY, LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5414877), filed by TRUDI L. MURPHY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cjo) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Initial Case Management Conference set for 4/23/2020 at 1:00 PM in Courtroom 6C before Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan; Exchange of required Rule 26(a)(1) information due by 4/13/2020; Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/13/2020; Stipulation Selecting ADR Process due by 4/13/2020. Signed by Judge J. Nicholas Ranjan on 3/4/2020. (dny) (Entered: 03/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Emilie R. Hammerstein on behalf of CVS HEALTH CORPORATION, PENNSYLVANIA CVS PHARMACY, LLC. (Hammerstein, Emilie) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Stipulation for Extension of Time to Answer by PENNSYLVANIA CVS PHARMACY, LLC Answer due from PENNSYLVANIA CVS PHARMACY, LLC on 3/20/2020; CVS HEALTH CORPORATION on 3/20/2020. (Hammerstein, Emilie) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Disclosure Statement identifying CVS Health Corporation as corporate parent or other affiliate, by PENNSYLVANIA CVS PHARMACY, LLC. (Hammerstein, Emilie) (Entered: 03/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by TRUDI L. MURPHY. PENNSYLVANIA CVS PHARMACY, LLC waiver sent on 1/6/2020, answer due 3/6/2020. (Johnston, Colleen) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by TRUDI L. MURPHY. CVS HEALTH CORPORATION waiver sent on 1/6/2020, answer due 3/6/2020. (Johnston, Colleen) (Entered: 01/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against CVS HEALTH CORPORATION, PENNSYLVANIA CVS PHARMACY, LLC (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number 0315-5414877), filed by TRUDI L. MURPHY. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cjo) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PENNSYLVANIA CVS PHARMACY, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CVS Health Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Colleen Ramage Johnston