This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/22/2022 at 07:45:15 (UTC).

Murphy v. Board of Trustees for the Oklahoma County Criminal Justice Authority et al

Case Summary

On 06/23/2022 Murphy filed a Prisoner - Prison Condition lawsuit against Board of Trustees for the Oklahoma County Criminal Justice Authority. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oklahoma Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Scott L. Palk. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:22-CV-00525

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Prison Condition

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Scott L. Palk

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TaVion Murphy

Defendants

Board of Trustees for the Oklahoma County Criminal Justice Authority

Dominique Thomas

Board Of County Commissioners for Oklahoma County

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Derek S Franseen

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Derek S Franseen on behalf of TaVion Murphy (Franseen, Derek) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

#3

(#3) Summons Issued Electronically as to Board Of County Commissioners for Oklahoma County, Board of Trustees for the Oklahoma County Criminal Justice Authority, Dominique Thomas. (rr) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued Electronically as to Board Of County Commissioners for Oklahoma County, Board of Trustees for the Oklahoma County Criminal Justice Authority, Dominique Thomas. (rr) (Entered: 08/03/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ENTRY of Appearance by Derek S Franseen on behalf of TaVion Murphy (Franseen, Derek) (Entered: 07/11/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • DocketPAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AOKWDC-3934894. (Franseen, Derek) (Entered: 06/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Board Of County Commissioners for Oklahoma County, Board of Trustees for the Oklahoma County Criminal Justice Authority, Dominique Thomas filed by TaVion Murphy. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(rr) (Entered: 06/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less