This case was last updated from PACER on 07/29/2021 at 19:02:08 (UTC).

Murphy v. Air Methods Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 05/28/2021 Murphy filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Air Methods Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Massachusetts District. The Judges overseeing this case are Katherine A. Robertson and Mark G. Mastroianni. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-10896

  • Filing Date:

    05/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Katherine A. Robertson

Mark G. Mastroianni

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mark Murphy

Defendants

Rocky Mountain Holdings LLC

Air Methods Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stephen J. Soule

Attorney at Paul Frank & Collins, P.C. - VT

One Church Street, P.O. Box 1307

Burlington, VT 05402-1307

Daryan P. Martinez

Attorney at EDWARD L. WHITE, P.C.

829 East 33Rd Street

Edmond, OK 73013

Edward L. White

Attorney at EDWARD L. WHITE, P.C.

829 East 33Rd Street

Edmond, OK 73013

Defendant Attorneys

Paul V. Holtzman

Attorney at Krokidas & Bluestein

600 Atlantic Avenue

Boston, MA 02210

Brian R. Richichi

Attorney at Krokidas & Bluestein LLP

600 Atlantic Avenue, 19Th Floor

Boston, MA 02210

 

Court Documents

17 #2

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

17 #1

Exhibit Declaration of Matthew J. Smith

#17

(#17) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Matthew J. Smith Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8867500 by Air Methods Corporation, Rocky Mountain Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Matthew J. Smith, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Holtzman, Paul) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

16 #2

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

16 #1

Exhibit Declaration of Jessica J. Smith

#16

(#16) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jessica J. Smith Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8867469 by Air Methods Corporation, Rocky Mountain Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Jessica J. Smith, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Holtzman, Paul) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

#15

(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Brian R. Richichi on behalf of Air Methods Corporation, Rocky Mountain Holdings LLC (Richichi, Brian) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Paul V. Holtzman on behalf of Air Methods Corporation, Rocky Mountain Holdings LLC (Holtzman, Paul) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

#12

(#12) Refusal to Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. . (Soule, Stephen) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

#11

(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mark Murphy. Rocky Mountain Holdings LLC waiver sent on 6/28/2021, answer due 8/27/2021. (Soule, Stephen) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

#10

(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mark Murphy. Air Methods Corporation waiver sent on 6/28/2021, answer due 8/27/2021. (Soule, Stephen) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

7 #2

Exhibit B - Affidavit D Martinez

7 #1

Exhibit A - Cert Good Standing

#7

(#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Daryan P. Martinez Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8833170 by Mark Murphy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Cert Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit D Martinez)(Soule, Stephen) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

6 #2

Exhibit B - Affidavit E White

6 #1

Exhibit A - Cert Good Standing

#6

(#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Edward L. White Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8833150 by Mark Murphy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Cert Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit E White)(Soule, Stephen) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Air Methods Corporation, Rocky Mountain Holdings LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Matthew J. Smith Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8867500 by Air Methods Corporation, Rocky Mountain Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Matthew J. Smith, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Holtzman, Paul) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Jessica J. Smith Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8867469 by Air Methods Corporation, Rocky Mountain Holdings LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Jessica J. Smith, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Holtzman, Paul) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Brian R. Richichi on behalf of Air Methods Corporation, Rocky Mountain Holdings LLC (Richichi, Brian) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Paul V. Holtzman on behalf of Air Methods Corporation, Rocky Mountain Holdings LLC (Holtzman, Paul) (Entered: 07/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • Docket(#13) ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case RE-Assignment. Judge Mark G. Mastroianni assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson. (Finn, Mary) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Refusal to Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge. . (Soule, Stephen) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mark Murphy. Rocky Mountain Holdings LLC waiver sent on 6/28/2021, answer due 8/27/2021. (Soule, Stephen) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mark Murphy. Air Methods Corporation waiver sent on 6/28/2021, answer due 8/27/2021. (Soule, Stephen) (Entered: 06/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ALLOWED. Added Daryan P. Martinez, Esq.. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. ALLOWED. Added Edward L. White, Esq.. Attorneys admitted Pro Hac Vice must register for electronic filing if the attorney does not already have an ECF account in this district. To register go to the Court website at www.mad.uscourts.gov. Select Case Information, then Electronic Filing (CM/ECF) and go to the CM/ECF Registration Form. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Daryan P. Martinez Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8833170 by Mark Murphy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Cert Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit D Martinez)(Soule, Stephen) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for admission of Edward L. White Filing fee: $ 100, receipt number 0101-8833150 by Mark Murphy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Cert Good Standing, #2 Exhibit B - Affidavit E White)(Soule, Stephen) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Summons Issued as to Air Methods Corporation, Rocky Mountain Holdings LLC. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Lindsay, Maurice) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge Katherine A. Robertson assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded #here. These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Danieli, Chris) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • Docket(#3) Case transferred in from Eastern Division (Boston) on 5/28/2021 Case Number 1:21-cv-10896. (Danieli, Chris) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • Docket(#2) Case transferred to Western Division (Springfield) (McDonagh, Christina) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Mark Murphy Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number 0101-8796307 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Mark Murphy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Civil Category Form)(Soule, Stephen) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AIR METHODS CORPORATION INTERNATIONAL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephen J. Soule, Esq.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Edward L. White III, PHV