This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/15/2022 at 08:56:19 (UTC).

Murphy Medical Associates, LLC et al v. United Medical Resources, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/14/2022 Murphy Medical Associates, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against United Medical Resources, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Alfred V. Covello. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-00083

  • Filing Date:

    01/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alfred V. Covello

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Murphy Medical Associates, LLC

Diagnostic and Medical Specialists of Greenwich, LLC

Steven A.R. Murphy

Defendants

UMR, INC.

United Medical Resources, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Roy Breitenbach

Attorney at Harris Beach PLLC

333 Earle Ovington Boulevard, Ste 901

Uniondale, NY 11553

Defendant Attorneys

Michael H. Bernstein

Attorney at Robinson & Cole, LLP - NYC

666 Third Avenue, 20Th Floor

New York, NY 10017

Patrick Walter Begos

Attorney at Robinson & Cole LLP, Stamford

1055 Washington Boulevard 9Th Floor

Stamford, CT 06901-2249

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit 1 - UMR Spreadsheet

#2

(#2) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/15/2022. Discovery due by 7/16/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 8/20/2022. Signed by Clerk on 01/14/2022.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#3

(#3) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 01/14/2022.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint, filed by Murphy Medical Associates, LLC, Steven A.R. Murphy, Diagnostic and Medical Specialists of Greenwich, LLC, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 01/18/2022.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#5

(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *United Medical Resources, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Roy Breitenbach* *Harris Beach PLLC* *333 Earle Ovington Boulevard, Ste 901* *Uniondale, NY 11553*. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

#6

(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to All Defendants filed by Diagnostic and Medical Specialists of Greenwich, LLC, Steven A.R. Murphy, Murphy Medical Associates, LLC. (Breitenbach, Roy) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael H. Bernstein on behalf of United Medical Resources, Inc. (Bernstein, Michael) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Walter Begos on behalf of United Medical Resources, Inc. (Begos, Patrick) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

#9

(#9) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Exhibit 1, Order on Pretrial Deadlines, Electronic Filing Order in Civil Cases served on UMR, Inc. on 2/2/2022, filed by Diagnostic and Medical Specialists of Greenwich, LLC, Steven A.R. Murphy, Murphy Medical Associates, LLC. (Breitenbach, Roy) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint, Exhibit 1, Order on Pretrial Deadlines, Electronic Filing Order in Civil Cases served on UMR, Inc. on 2/2/2022, filed by Diagnostic and Medical Specialists of Greenwich, LLC, Steven A.R. Murphy, Murphy Medical Associates, LLC. (Breitenbach, Roy) (Entered: 02/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick Walter Begos on behalf of United Medical Resources, Inc. (Begos, Patrick) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael H. Bernstein on behalf of United Medical Resources, Inc. (Bernstein, Michael) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to All Defendants filed by Diagnostic and Medical Specialists of Greenwich, LLC, Steven A.R. Murphy, Murphy Medical Associates, LLC. (Breitenbach, Roy) (Entered: 02/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *United Medical Resources, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Roy Breitenbach* *Harris Beach PLLC* *333 Earle Ovington Boulevard, Ste 901* *Uniondale, NY 11553*. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #3 Electronic Filing Order, #1 Complaint, filed by Murphy Medical Associates, LLC, Steven A.R. Murphy, Diagnostic and Medical Specialists of Greenwich, LLC, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines Signed by Clerk on 01/18/2022.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Alfred V. Covello on 01/14/2022.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 3/15/2022. Discovery due by 7/16/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 8/20/2022. Signed by Clerk on 01/14/2022.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketJudge Alfred V. Covello added. (Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 01/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketRequest for Clerk to issue summons as to United Medical Resources, Inc. (Breitenbach, Roy) Modified on 1/18/2022 to correct party (Anastasio, F.). (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number ACTDC-6792780.), filed by Murphy Medical Associates, LLC, Steven A.R. Murphy, Diagnostic and Medical Specialists of Greenwich, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - UMR Spreadsheet)(Breitenbach, Roy) (Entered: 01/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UMR INC. LLC A DELAWARE CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael H. Bernstein

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patrick Walter Begos