This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/27/2023 at 08:48:15 (UTC).

Murphy et al v. Harrison Contracting Company Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/26/2023 Murphy filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Harrison Contracting Company Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Sarah E. Geraghty. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:23-CV-00403

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Sarah E. Geraghty

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jennifer Murphy

Emily Webb

Defendants

Harrison Contracting Company Inc.

Cincinnati Insurance Company

Scot Douglas Brock

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thomas James Knight

Defendant Attorneys

Joseph Menello

Nicole Mika Henderson

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Scot Douglas Brock, Cincinnati Insurance Company, Harrison Contracting Company Inc. (ane) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

#3

(#3) STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 2/7/2023. (sap) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

#4

(#4) Return of Service Executed by Jennifer Murphy, Emily Webb. Harrison Contracting Company Inc. served on 2/2/2023, answer due 2/23/2023. (Knight, Thomas) (Entered: 02/17/2023)

#5

(#5) Return of Service Executed by Jennifer Murphy, Emily Webb. Cincinnati Insurance Company served on 2/7/2023, answer due 2/28/2023. (Knight, Thomas) (Entered: 02/17/2023)

#6

(#6) Return of Service Executed by Jennifer Murphy, Emily Webb. Scot Douglas Brock served on 2/2/2023, answer due 2/23/2023. (Knight, Thomas) (Entered: 02/17/2023)

#7

(#7) Defendant's ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Scot Douglas Brock. Discovery ends on 7/24/2023.(Henderson, Nicole) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 02/23/2023)

#8

(#8) Special ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Cincinnati Insurance Company.(Henderson, Nicole) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 02/23/2023)

#9

(#9) Defendant's ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Harrison Contracting Company Inc..(Henderson, Nicole) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 02/23/2023)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Defendant's ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Harrison Contracting Company Inc..(Henderson, Nicole) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 02/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Special ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Cincinnati Insurance Company.(Henderson, Nicole) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 02/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Defendant's ANSWER to #1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Scot Douglas Brock. Discovery ends on 7/24/2023.(Henderson, Nicole) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 02/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Return of Service Executed by Jennifer Murphy, Emily Webb. Scot Douglas Brock served on 2/2/2023, answer due 2/23/2023. (Knight, Thomas) (Entered: 02/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Return of Service Executed by Jennifer Murphy, Emily Webb. Cincinnati Insurance Company served on 2/7/2023, answer due 2/28/2023. (Knight, Thomas) (Entered: 02/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Return of Service Executed by Jennifer Murphy, Emily Webb. Harrison Contracting Company Inc. served on 2/2/2023, answer due 2/23/2023. (Knight, Thomas) (Entered: 02/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STANDING ORDER REGARDING CIVIL LITIGATION. Signed by Judge Sarah E. Geraghty on 2/7/2023. (sap) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Electronic Summons Issued as to Scot Douglas Brock, Cincinnati Insurance Company, Harrison Contracting Company Inc. (ane) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Jennifer Murphy, Emily Webb. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-12347669) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ane) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 01/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less