This case was last updated from PACER on 10/22/2019 at 07:59:09 (UTC).

Murillo v. Saul

Case Summary

On 08/23/2019 a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability case was filed by Murillo against Saul in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, Connecticut District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-01307

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Connecticut District

Judge Details

Stefan R Underhill

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Leslie Murillo

Defendant

Andrew M. Saul

Interested Party

Social Security Administration

 

Court Documents

3 #1

Consent Form

#9

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 8/23/2019.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#4

(#4) STANDING SCHEDULING ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 8/23/2019.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#8

RESTRICTED

#1

RESTRICTED

#3

(#3) STANDING ORDER ON SOCIAL SECURITY APPEALS Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 8/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Social Security Transcripts by Andrew M. Saul. (Jewett, Peter) (Entered: 10/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Peter Jewett on behalf of Andrew M. Saul (Jewett, Peter) (Entered: 09/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2019
  • (#7) ORDER OF TRANSFER. Case reassigned to Judge William I. Garfinkel who presided over related case: 3:16-cv-00403-WIG Murillo v. Colvin Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 8/27/2019.(Anastasio, F.) (Entered: 08/27/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff has filed a motion seeking to proceed without payment of fees and costs, which motion includes a sworn statement as to plaintiff's current financial circumstances. See Doc. #2 -1. Plaintiff has completed the required information. Plaintiff asserts that she is unable to afford to pay fees and costs, having no income, minimal assets and outstanding debt. See generally id. at 4-6. Plaintiff also states that her mother helps her to pay rent and monthly bills, and that she receives monthly SNAP benefits. See id. at 5-6. At this stage, such allegations are sufficient to establish that plaintiff is unable to pay the ordinary filing fees required by the Court. 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(1). Accordingly, plaintiff's #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam on 8/26/2019. (Katz, S.) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • Answer deadline updated for Andrew M. Saul to 10/22/2019. (Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 8/23/2019.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) STANDING SCHEDULING ORDER Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 8/23/2019.(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) STANDING ORDER ON SOCIAL SECURITY APPEALS Signed by Judge Stefan R Underhill on 8/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form)(Fazekas, J.) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • Judge Stefan R Underhill and Judge Sarah A. L. Merriam added. Motions referred to Sarah A. L. Merriam(Nuzzi, Tiffany) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Leslie Murillo. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Yelner, Olia) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul, Social Security Administration, filed by Leslie Murillo.(Yelner, Olia) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.