This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/20/2023 at 09:32:13 (UTC).

Murhammer v. Ashford Le Pavillon LP et al

Case Summary

On 12/22/2022 Murhammer filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Ashford Le Pavillon LP. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Eldon E. Fallon and Janis van Meerveld. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-05419

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Eldon E. Fallon

Referral Judge

Janis van Meerveld

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Michael W. Murhammer

Defendants

Safety National Casualty Corporation

Ashford Le Pavillon LP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew Remy Fransen

Jeffery Patrick Brothers

David L. Colvin

Benjamin Thomas Sanders

Defendant Attorneys

Roger Anthony Javier

Alexa Marie Youssef

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from Civil District Court Orleans Pairsh, case number 2022-10719 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BLAEDC-9715089) filed by Ashford Le Pavillon LP, Safety National Casualty Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 State Court Pleadings, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Alexa Marie Youssef added to party Ashford Le Pavillon LP(pty:dft), Attorney Alexa Marie Youssef added to party Safety National Casualty Corporation(pty:dft).(Youssef, Alexa) Modified text/filers on 12/23/2022 (js). (Entered: 12/22/2022)

1 #1

Exhibit

1 #2

State Court Pleadings

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) Notice of Compliance List of Parties, List of Documents by All Defendants re #1 Notice of Removal. (Youssef, Alexa) Modified text/filers on 12/23/2022 (js). (Entered: 12/22/2022)

#4

(#4) Consent to Removal by All Defendants. (Youssef, Alexa) Modified text/filers on 12/23/2022 (js). (Entered: 12/22/2022)

#5

(#5) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Ashford Le Pavillon, Safety National Casualty Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Ashford Le Pavillon, GP, LLC, Corporate Parent Ashford Le Pavillon Senior Mezz, LLC, Corporate Parent Ashford Hospital Limited Partnership, Corporate Parent Ashford OP Limited Partner, LLC, Corporate Parent Ashford OP General Partner, LLC, Corporate Parent Ashford Hospitality Trust, Inc. for Ashford Le Pavillon LP. (Youssef, Alexa) Modified text/corporate parents on 12/23/2022 (js). Modified corporate parents on 12/28/2022 (js). (Entered: 12/22/2022)

#6

(#6) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal,, with Jury Demand by Ashford Le Pavillon LP, Safety National Casualty Corporation.(Youssef, Alexa) (Entered: 12/29/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 2/9/2023 11:00 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk.(ko) (Entered: 12/29/2022)

#8

(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/5/2023 01:30 PM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon. Telephone Status Conference set for 3/14/2023 01:30 PM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon. Jury Trial set for 9/18/2023 08:30 AM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon. All discovery must be completed by 8/14/2023. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form)(lag) (Entered: 02/09/2023)

8 #1

Pretrial Notice Form

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/5/2023 01:30 PM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon. Telephone Status Conference set for 3/14/2023 01:30 PM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon. Jury Trial set for 9/18/2023 08:30 AM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon. All discovery must be completed by 8/14/2023. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon. (Attachments: #1 Pretrial Notice Form)(lag) (Entered: 02/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE: Scheduling Conference set for 2/9/2023 11:00 AM before case manager by telephone. By Clerk.(ko) (Entered: 12/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal,, with Jury Demand by Ashford Le Pavillon LP, Safety National Casualty Corporation.(Youssef, Alexa) (Entered: 12/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Ashford Le Pavillon, Safety National Casualty Corporation identifying Corporate Parent Ashford Le Pavillon, GP, LLC, Corporate Parent Ashford Le Pavillon Senior Mezz, LLC, Corporate Parent Ashford Hospital Limited Partnership, Corporate Parent Ashford OP Limited Partner, LLC, Corporate Parent Ashford OP General Partner, LLC, Corporate Parent Ashford Hospitality Trust, Inc. for Ashford Le Pavillon LP. (Youssef, Alexa) Modified text/corporate parents on 12/23/2022 (js). Modified corporate parents on 12/28/2022 (js). (Entered: 12/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Consent to Removal by All Defendants. (Youssef, Alexa) Modified text/filers on 12/23/2022 (js). (Entered: 12/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • Docket(#3) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (mb) (Entered: 12/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Compliance List of Parties, List of Documents by All Defendants re #1 Notice of Removal. (Youssef, Alexa) Modified text/filers on 12/23/2022 (js). (Entered: 12/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from Civil District Court Orleans Pairsh, case number 2022-10719 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number BLAEDC-9715089) filed by Ashford Le Pavillon LP, Safety National Casualty Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 State Court Pleadings, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Alexa Marie Youssef added to party Ashford Le Pavillon LP(pty:dft), Attorney Alexa Marie Youssef added to party Safety National Casualty Corporation(pty:dft).(Youssef, Alexa) Modified text/filers on 12/23/2022 (js). (Entered: 12/22/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less