This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/11/2022 at 07:41:19 (UTC).

Murden v. Meta Platforms Inc et al

Case Summary

On 07/13/2022 Murden filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Meta Platforms Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is David W. Dugan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-01511

  • Filing Date:

    07/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

David W. Dugan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Brianna Murden

Defendants

Meta Platforms Inc

Facebook Holdings LLC

Facebook Operations LLC

Facebook Payments Inc

Facebook Technologies LLC

Instagram LLC

Siculus Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Joseph Glenn VanZandt, II

Attorney at Beasley Allen et al - AL

218 Commerce Street

Montgomery, AL 36104

Jennifer K. Emmel

Attorney at Beasley Allen et al - AL

218 Commerce Street

Montgomery, AL 36104

Andy D. Birchfield, Jr.

Attorney at Beasley Allen et al - AL

218 Commerce Street

Montgomery, AL 36104

Seth Vincent Harding

Attorney at Beasley Allen et al - AL

218 Commerce Street

Montgomery, AL 36104

Peter J. Flowers

Attorney at Meyers & Flowers, LLC

225 West Wacker Drive, Suite 1515

Chicago, IL 60606

Clinton A. Richardson

Attorney at Beasley Allen et al - AL

218 Commerce Street

Montgomery, AL 36104

Defendant Attorney

Patricia B Holmes

Attorney at Riley Safer Holmes, et al

Three First National Plaza, 70 West Madison Street

Chicago, IL 60602

 

Court Documents

#27

(#27) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Meta Platforms Inc. (Holmes, Patricia) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

26 #1

Exhibit

26 #26

Main Document

#25

(#25) NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia B Holmes on behalf of Meta Platforms Inc (Holmes, Patricia) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

#23

(#23) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Anthony Dow Birchfield, Jr $200 fee paid,receipt number AILSDC-4868632 by on behalf of Brianna Murden. (Birchfield, Anthony) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

#21

(#21) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Seth Vincent Harding $200 fee paid,receipt number AILSDC-4861544 by on behalf of Brianna Murden. (Harding, Seth) (Entered: 08/18/2022)

#20

(#20) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jennifer K. Emmel $200 fee paid,receipt number AILSDC-4861334 by on behalf of Brianna Murden. (Emmel, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/18/2022)

#18

(#19) ORDER granting #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney VanZandt on behalf Plaintiff Brianna Murden. (kdw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 08/02/2022)

#2

(#2) NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Brianna Murden. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 22-cv-1511-RJD. Consent due by 8/4/2022 (jlh) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

1 #8

Summons Def Siculus Inc

1 #7

Summons Def Instagram LLC

1 #6

Summons Def Facebook Technologies LLC

1 #5

Summons Def Facebook Payments Inc

1 #4

Summons Def Facebook Operations LLC

1 #3

Summons Def Facebook Holdings LLC

1 #2

Summons Def Meta Platforms Inc

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ORDER STAYING CASE granting #26 Joint Motion to Stay All Case Deadlines. By Motion dated September 7, 2022, the parties jointly request a stay of all deadlines in this matter. This action is one of 27 nearly analogous actions filed in courts across the country, all of which are related to allegations of harm caused by Defendants products. The parties represent that Plaintiff Brianna Murden has filed a motion with the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation seeking to consolidate the actions and asking the MDL Panel to transfer the centralized cases to the Northern District of Illinois or the Western District of Missouri (Doc. 26) (See In re Social Media Adolescent Addiction/Personal Injury Product Liability Litigation, MDL No. 3047 (J.P.M.L.)). The MDL Panel has set a briefing schedule and a September 29, 2022 hearing to consider the MDL Transfer Motion. The parties agree that a stay of this matter would avoid the possibility of duplicative litigation and serve the interest of judicial economy and efficiency. Accordingly, for good cause shown, the motion to stay all case deadlines is GRANTED. This action shall be STAYED in its entirety. The parties are DIRECTED to file a joint status report addressing the status of the MDL proceedings by November 1, 2022, unless events before that date warrant an earlier report to the Court. Signed by Judge David W. Dugan on 9/8/2022. (dmw2) THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 09/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Meta Platforms Inc. (Holmes, Patricia) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines Pending Decision of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation on Motion to Transfer by Meta Platforms Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Holmes, Patricia) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) NOTICE of Appearance by Patricia B Holmes on behalf of Meta Platforms Inc (Holmes, Patricia) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER granting #23 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Andy D. Birchfield, Jr. (also known as Anthony Dow Birchfield, Jr.) on behalf of Plaintiff, Brianna Murden. (kls3)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 08/30/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Anthony Dow Birchfield, Jr $200 fee paid,receipt number AILSDC-4868632 by on behalf of Brianna Murden. (Birchfield, Anthony) (Entered: 08/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER, Granting #20 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Attorney Jennifer K. Emmel and #21 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Attorney Seth Vincent Harding.(kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 08/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Seth Vincent Harding $200 fee paid,receipt number AILSDC-4861544 by on behalf of Brianna Murden. (Harding, Seth) (Entered: 08/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jennifer K. Emmel $200 fee paid,receipt number AILSDC-4861334 by on behalf of Brianna Murden. (Emmel, Jennifer) (Entered: 08/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER granting #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney VanZandt on behalf Plaintiff Brianna Murden. (kdw)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 08/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Brianna Murden. Facebook Operations LLC waiver sent on 7/19/2022, answer due 9/19/2022. (Richardson, Clinton) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Brianna Murden. Facebook Holdings LLC waiver sent on 7/19/2022, answer due 9/19/2022. (Richardson, Clinton) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF MODIFICATION re #5 Waiver of Service Executed filed by Brianna Murden. Document attached is solely a waiver of service returned executed as to Defendant Meta Platforms, Inc. Docket text has been modified to remove referenced to, and answer due dates for, all other defendants. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER granting #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed Attorney Clinton A. Richardson. (kek)THIS TEXT ENTRY IS AN ORDER OF THE COURT. NO FURTHER DOCUMENTATION WILL BE MAILED. (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Clinton A. Richardson $200 fee paid,receipt number AILSDC-4835885 by on behalf of Brianna Murden. (Richardson, Clinton) (Entered: 07/19/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Brianna Murden. Meta Platforms Inc waiver sent on 7/15/2022, answer due 9/13/2022 (Richardson, Clinton) Modified on 7/19/2022 (kek). (Entered: 07/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to Facebook Holdings LLC, Facebook Operations LLC, Facebook Payments Inc, Facebook Technologies LLC, Instagram LLC, Meta Platforms Inc, Siculus Inc. Originals mailed to Attorney Flowers. (jlh) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Appearance by Peter J. Flowers on behalf of Brianna Murden (Flowers, Peter) (Entered: 07/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF INITIAL ASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE: This case has been randomly assigned to United States Magistrate Judge Reona J. Daly pursuant to Administrative Order No. 257. The parties are advised that their consent is required if the assigned Magistrate Judge is to conduct all further proceedings in the case, including trial and final entry of judgment pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c) and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 73. As set forth in Administrative Order No. 257, each party will be required to file a Notice and Consent to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form indicating consent or nonconsent to the jurisdiction of the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties do not consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction, the case will be randomly assigned to a district judge for all further proceedings and the parties cannot later consent to reassignment of the case to a magistrate judge. The parties are further advised that they are free to withhold consent without adverse substantive consequences. Within 21 days of this Notice, the following party or parties must file the attached form indicating consent to proceed before the assigned Magistrate Judge or an affirmative declination to consent: Brianna Murden. A link regarding the magistrate judges in this district is attached for your convenience: #http://www.ilsd.uscourts.gov/documents/BenefitsofConsent.pdf. All future documents must bear case number 22-cv-1511-RJD. Consent due by 8/4/2022 (jlh) (Entered: 07/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AILSDC-4831593.), filed by Brianna Murden. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Def Meta Platforms Inc, #3 Summons Def Facebook Holdings LLC, #4 Summons Def Facebook Operations LLC, #5 Summons Def Facebook Payments Inc, #6 Summons Def Facebook Technologies LLC, #7 Summons Def Instagram LLC, #8 Summons Def Siculus Inc)(Flowers, Peter) (Entered: 07/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Facebook Holdings, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Siculus, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Meta Platforms, Inc. f/k/a Facebook, Inc. is a litigant