This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/14/2021 at 10:45:26 (UTC).

MUR Shipping BV v. Lalumina LLC

Case Summary

On 12/16/2020 MUR Shipping BV filed a Contract - Marine lawsuit against Lalumina LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian S. Miller. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:20-CV-01461

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Marine

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian S. Miller

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MUR Shipping BV

Defendant

Lalumina LLC

Garnishee

Almatis Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gordon S. Rather, Jr.

Attorney at Wright, Lindsey & Jennings

200 West Capitol Avenue, Suite 2300

Little Rock, AR 72201-3699

Defendant Attorneys

Bruce B. Tidwell

Attorney at Friday, Eldredge & Clark, LLP

Regions Center, Suite 2000, 400 West Capitol Avenue

Little Rock, AR 72201-3522

James D. Bercaw

Attorney at King & Jurgens LLC

201 St. Charles Avenue, Suite 4500

New Orleans, LA 70170

Henry A. King

Attorney at King & Jurgens LLC

201 St. Charles Avenue, Suite 4500

New Orleans, LA 70170

 

Court Documents

#4

15 #3

Exhibit B - Charterparty Excerpts

15 #2

Exhibit A - Arkansas Secretary of State Data on LAlumina LLC

15 #1

Brief in Support

#15

#14

#11

#10

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) MOTION to Vacate #4 Order,,, #5 Application for Writ of Garnishment and to Stay Pending Arbitration by Lalumina LLC (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Exhibit A - Arkansas Secretary of State Data on LAlumina LLC, #3 Exhibit B - Charterparty Excerpts)(Bercaw, James) (Entered: 02/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) RESPONSE re #8 Affidavit, by Almatis Inc (Tidwell, Bruce) (Entered: 02/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by James D. Bercaw. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/27/2021. (rmg) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no pdf document associated with this entry.) ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Henry A. King. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 1/27/2021. (rmg) (Entered: 01/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by James D. Bercaw. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-3923311. Filed by Lalumina LLC (Tidwell, Bruce) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) MOTION for Leave to Appear pro hac vice by Henry A. King. Fee $100 receipt number AAREDC-3923297. Filed by Lalumina LLC (Tidwell, Bruce) (Entered: 01/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Lalumina LLC.(Tidwell, Bruce) (Entered: 01/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Order, Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment with Schedule A, Interrogatories to Garnishee Almatis, Inc. and Second Interrogatories to Garnishee Almatis, Inc. served on 01/19/2021 by MUR Shipping BV. (Rather, Gordon) (Entered: 01/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RESPONSE re #4 Order,,, by Almatis Inc (Tidwell, Bruce) (Entered: 01/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) AFFIDAVIT of Service of Order, Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment with Schedule A, Interrogatories to Garnishee Almatis, Inc. , filed by MUR Shipping BV. Almatis Inc served on 12/21/2020. (Rather, Gordon) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #5 Application for Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment. CORRECTION: The docket text was modified to include the text "Document issued". (thd) (Entered: 12/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) APPLICATION for Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment against Almatis Inc, filed by MUR Shipping BV. Document issued. (llg) (Docket text modified on 12/22/2020 to include the text "Document issued".)(thd). (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER granting #1 MUR Shipping BV's application for maritime attachment. Process of Maritime Attachment and Garnishment shall issue against all property belonging to, or owed to, LAlumina, up to $1,722,833.96, that is held by Almatis, Inc. A copy of the process of attachment and garnishment shall be served upon Almatis, and a copy of this order shall be served with it. Any garnishee who determines that it is in possession of property that may be subject to this order shall advise MUR Shipping BV of the attachment. Any person claiming an interest in property attached or garnished pursuant to this order shall, upon application, be entitled to a hearing at which MU Shipping BV will be required to show why the attachment and garnishment should not be vacated. Signed by Judge Brian S. Miller on 12/21/2020. (kdr) (Entered: 12/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) BRIEF filed by MUR Shipping BV (Rather, Gordon) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement (Rule 7.1) by MUR Shipping BV (Rather, Gordon) (Entered: 12/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) VERIFIED COMPLAINT against Lalumina LLC, filed by MUR Shipping BV. Filing Fee of $402 paid. Receipt Number LIT080137. Summons issued. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(kdr) (Entered: 12/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Bruce B. Tidwell

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Henry Arthur King

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James D Bercaw