This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/27/2020 at 11:39:56 (UTC).

Munson v. Ethicon, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/28/2020 Munson filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Ethicon, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Georgia Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard W. Story. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03142

  • Filing Date:

    07/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    Georgia Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard W. Story

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Tiffany L. Munson

Defendants

Ethicon, Inc.

Johnson & Johnson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Allison Whitten

Attorney at Johnson Law Group

2925 Richmond Avenue, Suite 1700

Houston, TX 77098

 

Court Documents

#4

(#3) ORDER granting (589) Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Deposition of Oliver Martini and Production of Documents in case 1:17-md-02782-RWS. The parties are directed to meet and confer concerning the details since Plaintiffs' original requested deposition date is no longer feasible. The parties shall decide upon a mutually agreed date for Mr. Martini to be deposed as well as a timeline in advance of the deposition date to provide Plaintiffs with the document production at least 21 days before the scheduled deposition. (See Order for details) Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 8/11/2020. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02782-RWS et al.(bdb) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

#2

(#2) FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/2020. (ah) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Tiffany L. Munson (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9962251) (Direct File MDL from North Dakota). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ah) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified to edit date on 7/30/2020 (ah). (Entered: 07/30/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER granting (589) Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Deposition of Oliver Martini and Production of Documents in case 1:17-md-02782-RWS. The parties are directed to meet and confer concerning the details since Plaintiffs' original requested deposition date is no longer feasible. The parties shall decide upon a mutually agreed date for Mr. Martini to be deposed as well as a timeline in advance of the deposition date to provide Plaintiffs with the document production at least 21 days before the scheduled deposition. (See Order for details) Signed by Judge Richard W. Story on 8/11/2020. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02782-RWS et al.(bdb) (Entered: 08/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) FIFTH AMENDMENT TO GENERAL ORDER 20-01 RE: COURT OPERATIONS UNDER THE EXIGENT CIRCUMSTANCES CREATED BY COVID-19 AND RELATED CORONAVIRUS. Signed by Judge Thomas W. Thrash, Jr. on 7/10/2020. (ah) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) SHORT FORM COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Tiffany L. Munson (Filing fee $400, receipt number AGANDC-9962251) (Direct File MDL from North Dakota). (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(ah) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Modified to edit date on 7/30/2020 (ah). (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Johnson & Johnson is a litigant

Latest cases where Ethicon Inc is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Allison Elizabeth Whitten