This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/15/2020 at 07:10:40 (UTC).

MUNROE et al v. LUITPOLD PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. et al

Case Summary

On 01/15/2020 MUNROE filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against LUITPOLD PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY BEETLESTONE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-00282

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

WENDY BEETLESTONE

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ANTHONY MUNROE

MARIA MUNROE

Defendants

DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD.

DAIICHI SANKYO, INC.

AMERICAN REGENT, INC.

VIFOR PHARMACEUTICALS MANAGEMENT LTD

LUITPOLD PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

DAIICHI SANKYO US HOLDINGS, INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL G. DALY

Attorney at POGUST MILLROOD LLC

161 Washington St, Eight Tower Bridge Suite 940

Conshohocken, PA 19428

Defendant Attorney

RANDALL L. CHRISTIAN

Attorney at BOWMAN & BROOKE LLP

2901 Via Fortuna Drive, Suite 500

Austin, TX 78746

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) Joint MOTION to Stay RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS AND RELATED FILINGS filed by AMERICAN REGENT, INC., DAIICHI SANKYO US HOLDINGS, INC, DAIICHI SANKYO, INC..Proposed Order, Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(CHRISTIAN, RANDALL) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#3

(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ANTHONY MUNROE, MARIA MUNROE. AMERICAN REGENT, INC. waiver sent on 1/17/2020, answer due 3/17/2020. (DALY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

#2

(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ANTHONY MUNROE, MARIA MUNROE. DAIICHI SANKYO US HOLDINGS, INC waiver sent on 1/17/2020, answer due 3/17/2020; DAIICHI SANKYO, INC. waiver sent on 1/17/2020, answer due 3/17/2020. (DALY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

1 #3

Case Management Track Form

1 #2

Designation Form

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against AMERICAN REGENT, INC., DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO US HOLDINGS, INC, DAIICHI SANKYO, INC., LUITPOLD PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., VIFOR PHARMACEUTICALS MANAGEMENT LTD ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14046519.), filed by ANTHONY MUNROE, MARIA MUNROE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(DALY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) PAPERLESS ORDER granting #4 MOTION TO STAY. SIGNED BY HONORABLE WENDY BEETLESTONE ON 1/24/2020.1/24/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(nm, ) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Joint MOTION to Stay RESPONSIVE PLEADINGS AND RELATED FILINGS filed by AMERICAN REGENT, INC., DAIICHI SANKYO US HOLDINGS, INC, DAIICHI SANKYO, INC..Proposed Order, Memorandum, Certificate of Service.(CHRISTIAN, RANDALL) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ANTHONY MUNROE, MARIA MUNROE. AMERICAN REGENT, INC. waiver sent on 1/17/2020, answer due 3/17/2020. (DALY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ANTHONY MUNROE, MARIA MUNROE. DAIICHI SANKYO US HOLDINGS, INC waiver sent on 1/17/2020, answer due 3/17/2020; DAIICHI SANKYO, INC. waiver sent on 1/17/2020, answer due 3/17/2020. (DALY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • Docket6 Summons Issued as to AMERICAN REGENT, INC., DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO US HOLDINGS, INC, DAIICHI SANKYO, INC., LUITPOLD PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., VIFOR PHARMACEUTICALS MANAGEMENT LTD. Forwarded To: PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL on 1/16/2020 (amas) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by ANTHONY MUNROE, MARIA MUNROE. (amas) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against AMERICAN REGENT, INC., DAIICHI SANKYO CO., LTD., DAIICHI SANKYO US HOLDINGS, INC, DAIICHI SANKYO, INC., LUITPOLD PHARMACEUTICALS, INC., VIFOR PHARMACEUTICALS MANAGEMENT LTD ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0313-14046519.), filed by ANTHONY MUNROE, MARIA MUNROE. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(DALY, MICHAEL) (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where VIFOR PHARMACEUTICALS MANAGEMENT LTD. is a litigant

Latest cases where LUITPOLD PHARMACEUTICALS, INC. is a litigant