This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/02/2020 at 10:36:11 (UTC).

Gregory Munoz v. Walmart Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/03/2020 Gregory Munoz filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Walmart Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Fernando M. Olguin and Michael R. Wilner. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-04925

  • Filing Date:

    06/03/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Fernando M. Olguin

Referral Judge

Michael R. Wilner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GREGORY MUNOZ

Defendants

Walmart Inc.

Does 1 to 10

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jonathan J Moon

Attorney at Jonathan Moon Law Offices

18000 Studebaker Road Suite 700

Cerritos, CA 90703

David Wesley Hiller

Attorney at Law Office of David W Hiller

225 South Lake Avenue Suite 300

Pasadena, CA 91101

Defendant Attorneys

Jennifer N Lutz

Attorney at Pettit Kohn Ingrassia Lutz and Dolin PC

11622 El Camifno Real Suite 300

San Diego, CA 92130

Shannon Riyana Finley

Attorney at Pettit Kohn Ingrassia Lutz and Dolin PC

11622 El Camino Real Suite 300

San Diego, CA 92130

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER REMANDING ACTION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The above-captioned action shall be remanded to the Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles, for lack of subject matter jurisdiction pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c). Case Terminated. Made JS-6 (iv) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

#10

(#10) Receipt of Copy of Remand Transmittal Letter from Los Angeles Superior Court, Case No. 20STCV16152, acknowledged on 7/9/2020. (iv) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

#9

(#9) TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles Superior Court. (iv) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 9/3/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

#4

(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (car) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

#3

(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Walmart Inc., (Lutz, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Lutz, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

1 #9

Answer - State Court File

1 #8

Notice of CMC - State Court File

1 #6

Civil Case Cover Sheet - State Court File

1 #5

Complaint - State Court File

1 #4

Proof of Service of Summons - State Court File

1 #3

Summons - State Court File

1 #2

Notice of Lodgment of State Court File

1 #1

Declaration of Shannon R. Finley

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 20STCV16152 Receipt No: ACACDC-26672188 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Shannon R. Finley, #2 Notice of Lodgment of State Court File, #3 Summons - State Court File, #4 Proof of Service of Summons - State Court File, #5 Complaint - State Court File, #6 Civil Case Cover Sheet - State Court File, #7 Case Assignment - State Court File, #8 Notice of CMC - State Court File, #9 Answer - State Court File) (Attorney Jennifer N Lutz added to party Walmart Inc.(pty:dft))(Lutz, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Receipt of Copy of Remand Transmittal Letter from Los Angeles Superior Court, Case No. 20STCV16152, acknowledged on 7/9/2020. (iv) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles Superior Court. (iv) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER REMANDING ACTION by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The above-captioned action shall be remanded to the Superior Court of the State of California for the County of Los Angeles, for lack of subject matter jurisdiction pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1447(c). Case Terminated. Made JS-6 (iv) (Entered: 06/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 9/3/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr) (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2020
  • Docket(#6) TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 06/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Michael R. Wilner. (car) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) filed by Defendant Walmart Inc. Filed in State Court on 6/3/2020 Submitted with Attachment 9 to Notice of Removal #1 .(car) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Gregory Munoz, upon Defendant Walmart Inc. served on 5/4/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corporation registered agent by leaving with Peter Cayetano in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 5/11/2020 Submitted with Attachment 4 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 to, Walmart Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Gregory Munoz. Filed in State Court on 4/28/2020 Submitted with Attachment 5 to Notice of Removal #1 (car) (Entered: 06/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Walmart Inc., (Lutz, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Lutz, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 20STCV16152 Receipt No: ACACDC-26672188 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Shannon R. Finley, #2 Notice of Lodgment of State Court File, #3 Summons - State Court File, #4 Proof of Service of Summons - State Court File, #5 Complaint - State Court File, #6 Civil Case Cover Sheet - State Court File, #7 Case Assignment - State Court File, #8 Notice of CMC - State Court File, #9 Answer - State Court File) (Attorney Jennifer N Lutz added to party Walmart Inc.(pty:dft))(Lutz, Jennifer) (Entered: 06/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WALMART is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Shannon Riyana Finley

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jennifer N Lutz