This case was last updated from PACER on 01/06/2020 at 08:22:35 (UTC).

Munning v. Nordstrom Inc et al

Case Summary

On 11/07/2019 Munning filed a Property - Personal Property Fraud lawsuit against Nordstrom Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Washington Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert S. Lasnik. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01810

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Fraud

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Washington Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert S. Lasnik

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Laurie Munning

Defendants

Nordstrom Inc

Does 1-20

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Che Z Corrington

Attorney at HATTIS & LUKACS PLLC

400 108Th Avenue Ne, Suite 500

Bellevue, WA 98004

Daniel M Hattis

Attorney at HATTIS & LUKACS PLLC

400 108Th Avenue Ne, Suite 500

Bellevue, WA 98004

Stephen P DeNittis

Attorney at DENITTIS OSEFCHEN & PRINCE PC

5 Greentree Centre, 525 Routhe 73 North Ste 410

Marlton, NJ 08053

Shane T Prince

Attorney at DENITTIS OSEFCHEN & PRINCE PC

5 Greentree Centre, 525 Routhe 73 North Ste 410

Marlton, NJ 08053

Defendant Attorneys

Robert J Guite

Attorney at SHEPPARD MULLIN RICHTER & HAMPTON (SF)

4 Embarcadero Center, 17 Fl

San Francisco, CA 94111

Jay T Ramsey

Attorney at SHEPPARD MULLIN RICHTER & HAMPTON LLP

1901 Avenue Of The Stars, Ste 1600

Los Angeles, CA 90067

P Craig Cardon

Attorney at SHEPPARD MULLIN RICHTER & HAMPTON LLP

1901 Avenue Of The Stars, Ste 1600

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Anne Marie Loucks

Attorney at NORDSTROM, INC

Po Box 21865

Seattle, WA 98111-3865

 

Court Documents

#25

(#25) REPLY, filed by Defendant Nordstrom Inc, TO RESPONSE to #11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration or to Dismiss (Guite, Robert) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

#24

(#24) DECLARATION of Che Corrington filed by Plaintiff Laurie Munning re #11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration or to Dismiss (Corrington, Che) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#23

(#23) RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Laurie Munning, to #11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration or to Dismiss. (Corrington, Che) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#22

(#22) NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Anne Marie Loucks. Filed by Defendant Nordstrom Inc. (Loucks, Anne) Changed firm association and address info on 12/12/2019 (DS). (Entered: 12/12/2019)

#18

(#18) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jay T. Ramsey FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Nordstrom Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-6047135 (Loucks, Anne) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

11 #3

Proposed Order

11 #2

Exhibit Exhibits A-F to Declaration of Julie Blume

11 #1

Exhibit Declaration of Julie Blume

#11

(#23) RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Laurie Munning, to #11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration or to Dismiss. (Corrington, Che) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

4 #1

Proof of Service via Mail

#4

(#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Nordstrom Inc (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service via Mail)(Guite, Robert) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

#3

(#3) NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. ad hoc to attorneys DeNittis and Prince. (GT) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

#2

(#2) LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. ad hoc to attorneys DeNittis and Prince. (GT) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

1 #4

Declaration of Julie Blume

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#3) NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. ad hoc to attorneys DeNittis and Prince. (GT) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

29 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#25) REPLY, filed by Defendant Nordstrom Inc, TO RESPONSE to #11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration or to Dismiss (Guite, Robert) (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#24) DECLARATION of Che Corrington filed by Plaintiff Laurie Munning re #11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration or to Dismiss (Corrington, Che) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#23) RESPONSE, by Plaintiff Laurie Munning, to #11 MOTION to Compel Arbitration or to Dismiss. (Corrington, Che) (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#22) NOTICE of Change of Address/Change of Name of Attorney Anne Marie Loucks. Filed by Defendant Nordstrom Inc. (Loucks, Anne) Changed firm association and address info on 12/12/2019 (DS). (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) ORDER re #18 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Jay T Ramsey for Defendant Nordstrom Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) ORDER re #17 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney P Craig Cardon for Defendant Nordstrom Inc, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Anne Marie Loucks on behalf of Defendant Nordstrom Inc. (Loucks, Anne) (Entered: 12/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Jay T. Ramsey FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Nordstrom Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-6047135 (Loucks, Anne) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY P. Craig Cardon FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Defendant Nordstrom Inc (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-6047133 (Loucks, Anne) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) ORDER denying Defendant Nordstrom, Inc.'s #10 Motion to Waive Physical Office Requirement for Counsel Supporting the Application of P. Craig Cardon and Jay T. Ramsey to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Robert S. Lasnik. (TH) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ORDER re #6 Application for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The Court ADMITS Attorney Stephen P DeNittis for Plaintiff Laurie Munning, by Clerk William M McCool. No document associated with this docket entry, text only.NOTE TO COUNSEL: Local counsel agrees to sign all filings and to be prepared to handle the matter, including the trial thereof, in the event the applicant is unable to be present on any date scheduled by the court, pursuant to LCR 83.1(d).(DS) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Shane T. Prince FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Laurie Munning (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-6005513 (Corrington, Che) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) APPLICATION OF ATTORNEY Stephen P. DeNittis FOR LEAVE TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE for Plaintiff Laurie Munning (Fee Paid) Receipt No. 0981-6005495 (Corrington, Che) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) VERIFICATION OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendant Nordstrom Inc (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Declaration of Robert J. Guite, #2 Exhibit B to Declaration of Robert J. Guite, #3 Certificate of Service)(Guite, Robert) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT indicating no Corporate Parents and/or Affiliates. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1. Filed by Nordstrom Inc (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service via Mail)(Guite, Robert) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) NOTICE TO FILER: re #1 Notice of Removal,. Notice of Filing Deficiency** Action Required ** See attached letter for more information and instructions. ad hoc to attorneys DeNittis and Prince. (GT) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • NOTICE Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1, Nordstrom Inc must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement by 11/15/2019. (GT) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. ad hoc to attorneys DeNittis and Prince. (GT) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • Judge Robert S. Lasnik added. (GT) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from KING COUNTY, case number 19-2-26191-9-SEA; (Receipt # 0981-6000426) Attorney Robert J Guite added to party Nordstrom Inc(pty:dft), filed by Nordstrom Inc. (Attachments: #1 Complaint Exhibit A, #2 Jury Demand Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Declaration of Julie Blume)(Guite, Robert) Modified on 11/8/2019 (GT). (Entered: 11/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less