This case was last updated from PACER on 09/12/2021 at 09:54:13 (UTC).

Muniz v. Cloudera, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 07/14/2021 Muniz filed a Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange lawsuit against Cloudera, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is John G. Koeltl. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-06026

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

John G. Koeltl

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Edwin Muniz

Defendants

Cloudera, Inc.

Robert Bearden

Paul Cormier

Peter Fenton

Gary Hu

Kevin Klausmeyer

Jesse A. Lynn

Rose Schooler

Mike Stankey

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Juan Eneas Monteverde

Attorney at Monteverde & Associates

350 Fifth Avenue, Suite 4405

New York, NY 10118

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: Notice is hereby given that pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiff voluntarily dismisses his claims in the above-captioned action against Defendants as moot. This notice of dismissal is being filed with the Court before service by Defendants of either an answer or a motion for summary judgment. The Clerk is directed to close this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 9/9/2021) (mml) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

#14

(#14) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, against the defendant(s) Robert Bearden, Cloudera, Inc., Paul Cormier, Peter Fenton, Gary Hu, Kevin Klausmeyer, Jesse A. Lynn, Rose Schooler, Mike Stankey. Document filed by Edwin Muniz. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Monteverde, Juan) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

#13

(#13) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Gary Hu waiver sent on 7/16/2021, answer due 9/14/2021. Document filed by Edwin Muniz..(Monteverde, Juan) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

#12

(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Mike Stankey waiver sent on 7/16/2021, answer due 9/14/2021. Document filed by Edwin Muniz..(Monteverde, Juan) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

#11

(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Rose Schooler waiver sent on 7/16/2021, answer due 9/14/2021. Document filed by Edwin Muniz..(Monteverde, Juan) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

#10

(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Jesse A. Lynn waiver sent on 7/16/2021, answer due 9/14/2021. Document filed by Edwin Muniz..(Monteverde, Juan) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

#9

(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Kevin Klausmeyer waiver sent on 7/16/2021, answer due 9/14/2021. Document filed by Edwin Muniz..(Monteverde, Juan) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

#8

(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Peter Fenton waiver sent on 7/16/2021, answer due 9/14/2021. Document filed by Edwin Muniz..(Monteverde, Juan) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Paul Cormier waiver sent on 7/16/2021, answer due 9/14/2021. Document filed by Edwin Muniz..(Monteverde, Juan) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

#6

No Description Available

#5

No Description Available

#4

(#4) ORDER: The parties are hereby ordered to appear for initial conference on September 10, 2021 at 10:00 a.m., which will be held via the following call-in number: Call-in number: 888-363-4749 Access code: 7518680 To ensure that the call proceeds smoothly and to avoid disruption, the Court directs those calling in (other than counsel) to mute their telephones. (As further set forth in this Order.) Initial Conference set for 9/10/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge John G. Koeltl. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/19/2021) (cf) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

#3

(#3) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:21-cv-05924. Document filed by Edwin Muniz..(Monteverde, Juan) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Monteverde, Juan) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Robert Bearden, Cloudera, Inc., Paul Cormier, Peter Fenton, Gary Hu, Kevin Klausmeyer, Jesse A. Lynn, Rose Schooler, Mike Stankey. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24790011)Document filed by Edwin Muniz..(Monteverde, Juan) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: Notice is hereby given that pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Plaintiff voluntarily dismisses his claims in the above-captioned action against Defendants as moot. This notice of dismissal is being filed with the Court before service by Defendants of either an answer or a motion for summary judgment. The Clerk is directed to close this case. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 9/9/2021) (mml) (Entered: 09/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, against the defendant(s) Robert Bearden, Cloudera, Inc., Paul Cormier, Peter Fenton, Gary Hu, Kevin Klausmeyer, Jesse A. Lynn, Rose Schooler, Mike Stankey. Document filed by Edwin Muniz. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Monteverde, Juan) (Entered: 09/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketMinute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Initial Conference set for 9/10/2021 adjourned to 11/2/2021 at 04:00 PM before Judge John G. Koeltl. Dial-in: 888 363-4749, with access code 8140049. (Fletcher, Donnie) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Gary Hu waiver sent on 7/16/2021, answer due 9/14/2021. Document filed by Edwin Muniz..(Monteverde, Juan) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Mike Stankey waiver sent on 7/16/2021, answer due 9/14/2021. Document filed by Edwin Muniz..(Monteverde, Juan) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Rose Schooler waiver sent on 7/16/2021, answer due 9/14/2021. Document filed by Edwin Muniz..(Monteverde, Juan) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Jesse A. Lynn waiver sent on 7/16/2021, answer due 9/14/2021. Document filed by Edwin Muniz..(Monteverde, Juan) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Kevin Klausmeyer waiver sent on 7/16/2021, answer due 9/14/2021. Document filed by Edwin Muniz..(Monteverde, Juan) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Peter Fenton waiver sent on 7/16/2021, answer due 9/14/2021. Document filed by Edwin Muniz..(Monteverde, Juan) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Paul Cormier waiver sent on 7/16/2021, answer due 9/14/2021. Document filed by Edwin Muniz..(Monteverde, Juan) (Entered: 07/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (vba) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge John G. Koeltl. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (vba) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketCASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:21-cv-05924-JGK. Notice of Assignment to follow. (vba) (Entered: 07/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER: The parties are hereby ordered to appear for initial conference on September 10, 2021 at 10:00 a.m., which will be held via the following call-in number: Call-in number: 888-363-4749 Access code: 7518680 To ensure that the call proceeds smoothly and to avoid disruption, the Court directs those calling in (other than counsel) to mute their telephones. (As further set forth in this Order.) Initial Conference set for 9/10/2021 at 10:00 AM before Judge John G. Koeltl. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/19/2021) (cf) (Entered: 07/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketCASE REFERRED TO Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein as possibly related to 21cv5924. (pc) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(pc) (Entered: 07/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:21-cv-05924. Document filed by Edwin Muniz..(Monteverde, Juan) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Monteverde, Juan) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Robert Bearden, Cloudera, Inc., Paul Cormier, Peter Fenton, Gary Hu, Kevin Klausmeyer, Jesse A. Lynn, Rose Schooler, Mike Stankey. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-24790011)Document filed by Edwin Muniz..(Monteverde, Juan) (Entered: 07/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Cloudera, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Juan Eneas Monteverde