This case was last updated from PACER on 10/13/2021 at 11:05:02 (UTC).

Municipality of San Juan v. Johnson & Johnson et al

Case Summary

On 06/25/2021 Municipality of San Juan filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Johnson Johnson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Ohio Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804). The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-OP-45082

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Dan Aaron Polster (MDL 2804)

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Municipality of San Juan

Defendants

Actavis Inc

Wal-Mart Inc.

Allergan PLC

Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.

Actavis Pharma, Inc.

H.D. Smith LLC doing business as H.D. Smith formerly known as H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co.

McKesson Corporation

Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc

Watson Laboratories Inc.

Actavis plc

Health Mart Systems, Inc.

Cardinal Health Inc.

Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.

Actavis LLC

Janssen Phamaceutica, Inc.

Cephalon Inc.

H.D Smith Holdings, LLC

Walgreens Co.

13 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Efron

Attorney at David Efron Law Offices

Po Box 29314

San Juan, PR 00929-0314

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) E-MAIL NOTIFICATION from the MDL: Minute Order to all involved clerks informing that a transfer of this case to the Northern District of Ohio shall be effective when we receive a certified copy of the Transfer Order from the transferee court. (ab) [Transferred from prd on 6/25/2021.] (Entered: 06/24/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Puerto Rico. Case number 3:21-cv-01254. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) TRANSFER LETTER from the Northern District of Ohio, transferee court, with certified copy of CTO-198 in MDL 2804 and List of Tag Along Action. This case is hereby closed. (Attachments: #1 Certified CTO, #2 Tag Along Actions) (ab) [Transferred from prd on 6/25/2021.] (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) E-MAIL NOTIFICATION from the MDL: Minute Order to all involved clerks informing that a transfer of this case to the Northern District of Ohio shall be effective when we receive a certified copy of the Transfer Order from the transferee court. (ab) [Transferred from prd on 6/25/2021.] (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) E-MAIL NOTIFICATION RE: MDL No. 2804, informing that this case forms part of CTO-198 for transfer to the Northern District of Ohio and that the stay has been lifted. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 6/24/2021. (Attachments: #1 CTO-198, #2 Tag Along Actions) (ab) [Transferred from prd on 6/25/2021.] (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (arg) [Transferred from prd on 6/25/2021.] (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number 0104-7323365.), filed by Municipality of San Juan. Service due by 8/31/2021, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Efron, David) [Transferred from prd on 6/25/2021.] (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where H. D. Smith, LLC doing business as HD Smith formerly known as H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Company is a litigant

Latest cases where H. D. Smith Holdings, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Walgreens Boots Alliance Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases where Walgreen Co. is a litigant