This case was last updated from PACER on 08/01/2021 at 09:04:29 (UTC).

Municipality of San Juan v. Johnson & Johnson et al

Case Summary

On 06/02/2021 Municipality of San Juan filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Johnson Johnson. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District. The Judge overseeing this case is Francisco A. Besosa. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:21-CV-01254

  • Filing Date:

    06/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Francisco A. Besosa

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Municipality of San Juan

Defendants

Allergan PLC

Actavis, Inc.

Actavis Pharma, Inc.

McKesson Corporation

Ortho-McNeil-Jansen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Endo Health Solutions, Inc.

Anda, Inc.

Actavis PLC

Health Mart Systems, Inc.

H.D. Smith, LLC d/b/a H.D. Smith, F/K/A H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug, Co.

Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Actavis LLC

Cardinal Health, Inc.

Watson Laboratories, Inc.

Cephalon, Inc.

H.D. Smith Holdings, LLC

Johnson & Johnson

Wal-Mart, Inc. F/K/A Wal-Mart Stores

Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

13 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

David Efron

Attorney at David Efron Law Offices

Po Box 29314

San Juan, PR 00929-0314

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketCase Transferred Out to Northern District of Ohio. E-mail sent to: InterdistrictTransfer_OHND@ohnd.uscourts.gov. Extraction Completed. (ab) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) TRANSFER LETTER from the Northern District of Ohio, transferee court, with certified copy of CTO-198 in MDL 2804 and List of Tag Along Action. This case is hereby closed. (Attachments: #1 Certified CTO, #2 Tag Along Actions) (ab) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) E-MAIL NOTIFICATION from the MDL: Minute Order to all involved clerks informing that a transfer of this case to the Northern District of Ohio shall be effective when we receive a certified copy of the Transfer Order from the transferee court. (ab) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) E-MAIL NOTIFICATION RE: MDL No. 2804, informing that this case forms part of CTO-198 for transfer to the Northern District of Ohio and that the stay has been lifted. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 6/24/2021. (Attachments: #1 CTO-198, #2 Tag Along Actions) (ab) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (arg) (Entered: 06/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number 0104-7323365.), filed by Municipality of San Juan. Service due by 8/31/2021, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet)(Efron, David) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where H. D. Smith Holdings, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where H.D. Smith, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Anda, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Health Mart Systems, Inc. is a litigant