This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/29/2023 at 11:33:59 (UTC).

Municipality of Quebradillas v. Teva Pharmaceutical USA, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 11/30/2022 Municipality of Quebradillas filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Teva Pharmaceutical USA, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Puerto Rico District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Jay A. Garcia-Gregory. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:22-CV-01583

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Jay A. Garcia-Gregory

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Municipality of Quebradillas

Defendants

Allergan PLC

Allergan Finance, LLC

Actavis Pharma, Inc.

Teva Pharmaceutical USA, Inc.

Cephalon, Inc.

Actavis PLC

Actavis, Inc.

Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.

Watson Laboratories, Inc.

Actavis, LLC

WATSON PHARMA, INC.

Anda, Inc.

Miami-Luken, Inc.

CVS Health Corporation

Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.

Walgreens Co.

Wal-Mart, Inc.

Other Corporations ABC and 1-100

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Douglas H. Sanders

Attorney at Sanders Phillips Grossman, LLC

Suite 801

Guaynabo, PR 00968

 

Court Documents

3 #1

Summons

#3

(#3) Summons Issued as to Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Allergan Finance, LLC, Allergan PLC, Anda, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, Cephalon, Inc., Miami-Luken, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical USA, Inc., Wal-Mart, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walgreens Co., Watson Laboratories, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg) (Entered: 12/01/2022)

1 #15

Summons Summons

1 #14

Summons Summons

1 #13

Summons Summons

1 #12

Summons Summons

1 #11

Summons Summons

1 #10

Summons Summons

1 #9

Summons Summons

1 #8

Summons Summons

1 #7

Summons Summons

1 #6

Summons Summons

1 #5

Summons Summons

1 #4

Summons Summons

1 #3

Summons Summons

1 #2

Category Sheet Category Sheet

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/16/2022
  • Docket(#4) ORDER: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 137 this case is transferred in the interest of judicial economy to the docket of Senior District Judge Jay A. Garcia-Gregory who presides over several related cases including 28-cv-1533 which was the second such case filed. Signed by Chief Judge Raul M. Arias-Marxuach on 12/6/2022. (ft) Modified on 12/19/2022 to edit typo (ecc). (Entered: 12/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Summons Issued as to Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis, LLC, Allergan Finance, LLC, Allergan PLC, Anda, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, Cephalon, Inc., Miami-Luken, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical USA, Inc., Wal-Mart, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Walgreens Co., Watson Laboratories, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg) (Entered: 12/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Daniel R. Dominguez (arg) (Entered: 12/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $402 receipt number APRDC-8006266.), filed by Municipality of Quebradillas. Service due by 2/28/2023, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet Category Sheet, #3 Summons Summons, #4 Summons Summons, #5 Summons Summons, #6 Summons Summons, #7 Summons Summons, #8 Summons Summons, #9 Summons Summons, #10 Summons Summons, #11 Summons Summons, #12 Summons Summons, #13 Summons Summons, #14 Summons Summons, #15 Summons Summons)(Sanders, Douglas) (Entered: 11/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less