This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/03/2022 at 07:58:19 (UTC).

Mungia v. Wright Medical Technology Inc et al

Case Summary

On 04/04/2022 Mungia filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Wright Medical Technology Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arkansas Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Kristine G. Baker. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-00304

  • Filing Date:

    04/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Kristine G. Baker

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Marilyn Mungia

Defendants

Wright Medical Technology Inc

Microport Orthopedics Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Michael J. Blakely, Jr.

Attorney at Pope McGlamry P.C.

3391 Peachtree Road Ne, Suite 300

Atlanta, GA 30326

N. Kirkland Pope

Attorney at Pope McGlamry P.C.

3391 Peachtree Road Ne, Suite 300

Atlanta, GA 30326

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) NOTIFICATION to Counsel from the Clerk of Court regarding MDL 2949, In Re Profemur Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation. Attached are the Order Upon Transfer and Case Management Order No. 1 entered by the Court regarding this matter. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 4/4/2022. (jbh) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

#3

(#3) ORDER FOR FURTHER DOCUMENTATION OF PLAINTIFFS' ALLEGED INJURIES directing that each plaintiff with a case pending in this MDL shall, within 30 days of the date of this Order, provide the information and the supporting documentation required by "Exhibit A." For any cases subsequently filed in the MDL after the date of this Order, the plaintiff is required to complete and submit Exhibit A and the requested materials within 30 days of filing the complaint. Service of the completed Exhibit A and the supporting documentation shall be made electronically, via email, as specified by this Order. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 1/12/2022. (jbh) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

#4

(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Microport Orthopedics Inc, Wright Medical Technology Inc by Marilyn Mungia. (Pope, N.) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Microport Orthopedics Inc, Wright Medical Technology Inc by Marilyn Mungia. (Pope, N.) (Entered: 05/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER FOR FURTHER DOCUMENTATION OF PLAINTIFFS' ALLEGED INJURIES directing that each plaintiff with a case pending in this MDL shall, within 30 days of the date of this Order, provide the information and the supporting documentation required by "Exhibit A." For any cases subsequently filed in the MDL after the date of this Order, the plaintiff is required to complete and submit Exhibit A and the requested materials within 30 days of filing the complaint. Service of the completed Exhibit A and the supporting documentation shall be made electronically, via email, as specified by this Order. Signed by Judge Kristine G. Baker on 1/12/2022. (jbh) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTIFICATION to Counsel from the Clerk of Court regarding MDL 2949, In Re Profemur Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation. Attached are the Order Upon Transfer and Case Management Order No. 1 entered by the Court regarding this matter. Signed at the Direction of the Court on 4/4/2022. (jbh) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Marilyn Mungia. Summons issued and returned to counsel. (Fee of $402 paid. Receipt Number LIT086234.) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jbh) (Entered: 04/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Microport Orthopedics Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where WRIGHT MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Joseph Blakely, Jr.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer N. Kirkland Pope